This case was last updated from Pawnee County Courts on 05/20/2022 at 05:04:37 (UTC).

ATWOOD RENTALS INC. V. UNKNOWN OCCUPANT, ET. AL.

Case Summary

On 02/18/2021 ATWOOD RENTALS INC filed a Property - Repossession lawsuit against UNKNOWN OCCUPANT. This case was filed in Pawnee County Courts, Pawnee County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is PICKERILL, PATRICK M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0020

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Repossession

  • County, State:

    Pawnee, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

PICKERILL, PATRICK M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ATWOOD RENTALS INC.

Defendants

MEYER, AMI

UNKNOWN OCCUPANT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

HINDS, COLLIN M.

1611 S. Denver Ave.

Tulsa, OK 74119

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE PROOF OF PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE RETURN OF PERSONAL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: REPLEVIN, NOT SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE RETURNED ORIGINAL ORDER FOR WRIT OF EXECUTION IN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE CORRECTED ORDER FOR WRIT OF EXECUTION IN REPLEVIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • HearingEvent: COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUE SUMMONS; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE & ENTER PETITION FOR REPLEVIN; Amount: $ 150.00

    Read MoreRead Less