This case was last updated from Muskogee County Courts on 04/29/2022 at 16:54:52 (UTC).

ARROW EXTERMINATORS INC. V. TINA MORTON, ET. AL.

Case Summary

On 07/17/2018 ARROW EXTERMINATORS INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against TINA MORTON. This case was filed in Muskogee County Courts, Muskogee County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is STOUT, WELDON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0779

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Muskogee, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

STOUT, WELDON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARROW EXTERMINATORS INC.

Defendants

MORTON, GREGORY LANE

MORTON, TINA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2018
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • HearingEvent: DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT $1713.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AMOUNT OF $1605.00 + COSTS. WS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DOES NOT APPEAR; JUDGMENT GRANTED TO PLAIN IN THE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CM/PLAIN APPEARS/PRO SE; DEFENDANT WAS SERVED BUT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SHERIFFS RETURN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AJE: COST DUE TO CARD ALLOCATION FEE; Amount: $ 2.70

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -1.24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AJE: MONIES DUE THE FOLLOWING AGENCY(IES) REDUCED; Amount: $ -1.13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF WAIVER OF JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SMALL CLAIMS AFFIDAVIT & ORDER ISSUED SHERIFF IN COUNTY; Amount: $ 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AFFIDAVIT & ORDER; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less