This case was last updated from Pawnee County Courts on 04/29/2022 at 17:04:41 (UTC).

ARMSTRONG BANK V. MATTHEW RYAN MCDANIEL

Case Summary

On 06/10/2021 ARMSTRONG BANK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MATTHEW RYAN MCDANIEL. This case was filed in Pawnee County Courts, Pawnee County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is PICKERILL, PATRICK M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0030

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Pawnee, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

PICKERILL, PATRICK M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARMSTRONG BANK

Defendant

MCDANIEL, MATTHEW RYAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2021
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • HearingEvent: DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: BOTH PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: $55.00, INTEREST ACCRUING AT A RATE OF 6.75%. COPY TO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: $1054.86, PLUS COURT COSTS OF $58.00, SERVICE FEES OF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DEFAULT JUDGMENT TO PLAIN IN THE AMOUNT OF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: NOT APPEAR. THE COURT ORDERS; SERVICE IS GOOD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: APPEARING PRO SE FOR ARMSTRONG BANK. DEFENDANT DOES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ALIAS SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAIN MANDY EDWARDS

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUE ALIAS SMALL CLAIMS AFFIDAVIT & ORDER-RTP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: NOT. NO, SERVICE, PLAIN TO REISSUE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: APPEARING PRO SE FOR ARMSTRONG BANK. DEFENDANT APPEARS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAIN MANDY EDWARDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COMES ON FOR HEARING THIS 12TH DAY OF JULY, 2021 FOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CM-PMP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUE SMALL CLAIMS AFFIDAVIT; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less