This case was last updated from Oklahoma County Courts on 02/01/2023 at 03:51:20 (UTC).

Anjan Kumar M.D. and Anupama Kumar, Plaintiff, v. Michael Donaghy and Michelle Donaghy, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 06/23/2022 Anjan Kumar M D and Anupama Kumar, Plaintiff, filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Michael Donaghy and Michelle Donaghy, Defendant. This case was filed in Oklahoma County Courts, Oklahoma County Courthouse located in Statewide, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Pipes, Robert Trent. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3787

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Oklahoma, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Pipes, Robert Trent

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kumar, Anjan M.D.

Kumar, Anupama

Defendants

Donaghy, Michael

Donaghy, Michelle

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Wiggins, John

210 Park Avenue

Okc, OK 73102

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: MICHAEL DONAGHY WITH MEGAN DONAGHY ON 6/23/22

06/27/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: MICHAEL DONAGHY WITH MEGAN DONAGHY ON 6/23/22

ANSWER

07/11/2022: ANSWER

SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: MICHAEL DONAGHY WITH MEGAN DONOGHY AS DAUGHTER ON 6/23/22

06/27/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: MICHAEL DONAGHY WITH MEGAN DONOGHY AS DAUGHTER ON 6/23/22

MOTION FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCING

07/22/2022: MOTION FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCING

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

09/09/2022: DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: DISMISSED - WITH PREJUDICE; Other; Party Details; Defendant: Donaghy, Michelle

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: DISMISSED - WITH PREJUDICE; Other; Party Details; Defendant: Donaghy, Michael

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: DISPCVDMWP; Description: DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; Count: 1; Party: Donaghy, Michelle

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: DISPCVDMWP; Description: DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; Count: 1; Party: Donaghy, Michael

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • HearingEvent: Pltf's Motion for Pretrial Conferencing; Docket: Robert Trent Pipes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: JUDGE PIPES/ MOTION DOCKET/ STRICKEN SETTLED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: MO; Description: MOTION FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: A; Description: ANSWER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: SMS; Description: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: MICHAEL DONAGHY WITH MEGAN DONOGHY AS DAUGHTER ON 6/23/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: SMS; Description: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: MICHAEL DONAGHY WITH MEGAN DONAGHY ON 6/23/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketCode: TORTP; Description: TORT- PERSONAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL RELIEF LESS THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: TORT- PERSONAL(TORTP); Filed By: Kumar, Anjan M.D.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less