This case was last updated from Tulsa County Courts on 06/25/2022 at 04:00:17 (UTC).

Amyx Hugo Llc, Plaintiff, v. ANTHONY BOLANOS, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 12/01/2021 Amyx Hugo Llc, Plaintiff filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ANTHONY BOLANOS, Defendant. This case was filed in Tulsa County Courts, Tulsa County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1885

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Tulsa, Oklahoma

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Amyx Hugo Llc

Defendant

BOLANOS, ANTHONY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BURKE, TAYLOR A

525 S. Main, Suite 800

Tulsa, OK 74103

CASH, ADRIENNE

525 S. Main Street, Suite 800

Tulsa, OK 74103

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT

12/01/2021: AFFIDAVIT

SUMMONS & ORDER

12/01/2021: SUMMONS & ORDER

FORCIBLE ENTRY AND DETAINER SERVED - SERV ANTHONY BOLANOS BY SERVING MARTIN PEREZ 12/5/21

12/10/2021: FORCIBLE ENTRY AND DETAINER SERVED - SERV ANTHONY BOLANOS BY SERVING MARTIN PEREZ 12/5/21

JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

12/15/2021: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: JEJ; Description: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • HearingEvent: HEARING; Docket: Deborrah Ludi Leitch

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: DEFAULT JUDGEMENT; Default Judgment; Party Details; Defendant: BOLANOS, ANTHONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketCode: DISPCVDJ; Description: LUDI LEITCH, DEBORRAH: PLAIN ATTORNEY TAYLOR BURKE APPEARED. DEFENDANT APPEARED NOT AFTER VALID SERVICE. DEFAULT-JUDGMENT GRANTED TO THE PLAIN AS FOLLOWS: (1) THE PRINCIPAL JUDGMENT AMOUNT SET FORTH HEREIN, (2) POSSESSION OF THE PREMISES (3) COURT COSTS AND ATTORNEY FEES OF $350.00 AGAINST THE NAMED DEFENDANT. JUDGE SIGNED FINAL J.E. --- PRINCIPAL JUDGMENT AMOUNT = $1060.00; Count: 1; Party: BOLANOS, ANTHONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: FEDS; Description: FORCIBLE ENTRY AND DETAINER SERVED - SERV ANTHONY BOLANOS BY SERVING MARTIN PEREZ 12/5/21; Party: BOLANOS, ANTHONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2021-4296055 ON 12/01/2021. PAYOR: BARBER & BARTZ PC TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 58.00. LINE ITEMS: SC-2021-11885: $45.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. SC-2021-11885: $6.00 ON AC23 LAW LIBRARY FEE CIVIL AND CRIMINAL. SC-2021-11885: $7.00 ON AC64 DISPUTE MEDIATION FEES CIVIL ONLY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OCIS HAS AUTOMATICALLY ASSIGNED JUDGE SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE TO THIS CASE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMONS & ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketCode: A/; Description: AMOUNT IN DEBT OF <..$..> $1060.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketCode: SMIP; Description: SUMMONS ISSUED - PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: AFDC1; Description: AFFIDAVIT; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketCode: SCFED1; Description: FORCIBLE ENTRY & DETAINER less than $5000.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SMALL CLAIMS INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: FORCIBLE ENTRY & DETAINER less than $5000.00.(SCFED1); Filed By: Amyx Hugo Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CASH, ADRIENNE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BURKE, TAYLOR A.