This case was last updated from Pushmataha County Courts on 05/25/2022 at 07:58:57 (UTC).

Ameristate Bank, Plaintiff, v. Caleb Gibson, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 06/23/2021 Ameristate Bank, Plaintiff filed a Property - Repossession lawsuit against Caleb Gibson, Defendant. This case was filed in Pushmataha County Courts, Pushmataha County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is DeBerry, Michael D.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1-43

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Repossession

  • County, State:

    Pushmataha, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

DeBerry, Michael D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ameristate Bank

Defendant

Gibson, Caleb

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tucker, Nicholas

 

Court Documents

CIVIL RELIEF LESS THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.

06/23/2021: CIVIL RELIEF LESS THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.

SUMMONS FEE (CLERKS FEE)

06/23/2021: SUMMONS FEE (CLERKS FEE)

NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR ORDER OF DELIVERY OF PROPERTY AND RIGHT TO OBJECT

06/23/2021: NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR ORDER OF DELIVERY OF PROPERTY AND RIGHT TO OBJECT

RETURN SERVED TO CALEB W GIBSON

06/25/2021: RETURN SERVED TO CALEB W GIBSON

ORDER FOR DELIVERY

08/05/2021: ORDER FOR DELIVERY

UNDERTAKING IN REPLEVIN

08/05/2021: UNDERTAKING IN REPLEVIN

NOTICE OF HEARING

03/16/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING

NO PARTIES APPEARED CASE IS DISMISSED

04/08/2022: NO PARTIES APPEARED CASE IS DISMISSED

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: DISMISSED; Judge; Party Details; Defendant: Gibson, Caleb

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: NO PARTIES APPEARED CASE IS DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • HearingEvent: DISPOSITION HEARING DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NOH; Description: NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketCode: RET; Description: RETURN OF SERVICE- SERVED TO CALEB GIBSON- 8-20-2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: UNDERTAKING IN REPLEVIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: O; Description: ORDER FOR DELIVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RET; Description: RETURN SERVED TO CALEB W GIBSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2021-90173 ON 06/23/2021. PAYOR: SHANNON REASOR LAW OFFICE TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 239.14. LINE ITEMS: CS-2021-43: $160.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. CS-2021-43: $6.00 ON AC23 LAW LIBRARY FEE CIVIL AND CRIMINAL. CS-2021-43: $1.66 ON AC31 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND. CS-2021-43: $5.00 ON AC58 OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES. CS-2021-43: $1.55 ON AC59 COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND. CS-2021-43: $7.00 ON AC64 DISPUTE MEDIATION FEES CIVIL ONLY. CS-2021-43: $0.45 ON AC65 STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND, INTERPRETER SVCS. CS-2021-43: $2.48 ON AC67 DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND. CS-2021-43: $25.00 ON AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND. CS-2021-43: $10.00 ON AC81 LENGTHY TRIAL FUND. CS-2021-43: $10.00 ON AC88 SHERIFFS SERVICE FEE FOR COURT HOUSE SECURITY. CS-2021-43: $10.00 ON AC89 COURT CLERK'S RECORDS MANAGEMENT AND PRESERVATION FEE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OCIS HAS AUTOMATICALLY ASSIGNED JUDGE DEBERRY, MICHAEL D. TO THIS CASE.

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketCode: REPLE; Description: REPLEVIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL RELIEF LESS THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: REPLEVIN(REPLE); Filed By: Ameristate Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TUCKER, NICHOLAS