This case was last updated from Ottawa County Courts on 05/20/2022 at 09:21:46 (UTC).

AMERICAS CAR MART MIAMI V. HOLLY GARDENHIRE, ET. AL.

Case Summary

On 01/29/2021 AMERICAS CAR MART MIAMI filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HOLLY GARDENHIRE. This case was filed in Ottawa County Courts, Ottawa County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is BAIRD, BECKY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0021

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Ottawa, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

BAIRD, BECKY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAS CAR MART MIAMI

Defendants

GARDENHIRE, MICHAEL

GARDENHIRE, HOLLY

 

Court Documents

ISSUE AFFIDAVIT OF CLAIM W/ORDER

01/29/2021: ISSUE AFFIDAVIT OF CLAIM W/ORDER

VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE

02/24/2021: VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE

CM BRB: PLAIN PRESENT, DEFENDANTS FAIL TO APPEAR

03/02/2021: CM BRB: PLAIN PRESENT, DEFENDANTS FAIL TO APPEAR

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2021
  • HearingEvent: DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SMALL CLAIMS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DEFAULT JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JOINT AND SEVERABLE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: BEGINNING 4-1-2021 UNTL THE JUDGMENT IS PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDERED TO PAY $100 PER MONTH TO THE PLAIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OF $2323.33 + $68 CC + $65 PS. THE DEFENDANTS ARE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JUDGMENT. COURT GRANTS DEFAULT JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFTER BEING PROPERLY SERVED. CASE COMES ON FOR MONEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CM BRB: PLAIN PRESENT, DEFENDANTS FAIL TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: MAILING FEE FOR RETURN OF JOURNAL ENTRY; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUE AFFIDAVIT OF CLAIM W/ORDER; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUE AFFIDAVIT OF CLAIM W/ORDER; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less