This case was last updated from Lincoln County Courts on 06/21/2022 at 12:20:39 (UTC).

AMERICAN LOANS V. ASHLEY NICOLE WHITE

Case Summary

On 10/05/2021 AMERICAN LOANS filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against ASHLEY NICOLE WHITE. This case was filed in Lincoln County Courts, Lincoln County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is MUELLER, EMILY J.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0134

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Lincoln, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

MUELLER, EMILY J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN LOANS

Defendant

WHITE, ASHLEY NICOLE

 

Court Documents

ISSUE AND FILE AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER

10/05/2021: ISSUE AND FILE AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER

BENCH WARRANT ISSUED $490.39 CASH ONLY BOND: FILED

05/12/2022: BENCH WARRANT ISSUED $490.39 CASH ONLY BOND: FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: BENCH WARRANT ISSUED; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office; Amount: $ 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • HearingEvent: AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • HearingEvent: BENCH WARRANT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: BENCH WARRANT ISSUED $490.39 CASH ONLY BOND: FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • HearingEvent: AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: MAY 12, 2022 AT 9:00 AM FOR DEFENDANT TO HIRE ATTORNEY:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OR BOND. DEFENDANT ARRAIGNED ON CENTEMPT CONTINUED TO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CM: JUDGE MUELLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PERSONAL SERVICE BY PPS: FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • HearingEvent: AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JUDGE MUELLER; COURT MINUTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PROOF OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT: FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ACT: FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATUS REPORT PURSUANT TO SERVICE MEMBERS CIVIL RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: E PORT SHOWING NO MILITARY SERVICE: FILED; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE: FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COSTS; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUE AND FILE AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less