This case was last updated from Rogers County Courts on 02/08/2023 at 06:13:31 (UTC).

American Express National Bank, Plaintiff, v. Susan Morgan, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 01/24/2020 American Express National Bank, Plaintiff, filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Susan Morgan, Defendant. This case was filed in Rogers County Courts, Rogers County Courthouse located in Statewide, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Condren, Sheila A.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0-48

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Rogers, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Condren, Sheila A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

American Express National Bank

Defendant

Morgan, Susan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHILDERS, JODI H

Attorney at Hood & Stacy P A

P O Box 271, Info@Hoodandstacy.Com

Bentonville, AR 72712

 

Court Documents

PETITION

01/24/2020: PETITION

ROGERS COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE RETURN OF SERVICE WITH COPY OF SUMMONS ATTACHED (DIANA SULLIVAN - NOT SERVED)

04/27/2020: ROGERS COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE RETURN OF SERVICE WITH COPY OF SUMMONS ATTACHED (DIANA SULLIVAN - NOT SERVED)

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE

07/10/2020: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE

ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO EXACT SERVICE

07/10/2020: ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO EXACT SERVICE

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

01/11/2021: DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

06/10/2021: DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2021
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE;; Party Details

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: DWOP; Description: DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE;; Party Details

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: DWOP; Description: DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: O; Description: ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO EXACT SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: MO; Description: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RET; Description: ROGERS COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE RETURN OF SERVICE WITH COPY OF SUMMONS ATTACHED (DIANA SULLIVAN - NOT SERVED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2020-609462 ON 01/24/2020. PAYOR: HOOD & STACY PA TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 239.14. LINE ITEMS: CS-2020-48: $160.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. CS-2020-48: $6.00 ON AC23 LAW LIBRARY FEE CIVIL AND CRIMINAL. CS-2020-48: $1.66 ON AC31 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND. CS-2020-48: $5.00 ON AC58 OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES. CS-2020-48: $1.55 ON AC59 COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND. CS-2020-48: $7.00 ON AC64 DISPUTE MEDIATION FEES CIVIL ONLY. CS-2020-48: $0.45 ON AC65 STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND, INTERPRETER SVCS. CS-2020-48: $2.48 ON AC67 DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND. CS-2020-48: $25.00 ON AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND. CS-2020-48: $10.00 ON AC81 LENGTHY TRIAL FUND. CS-2020-48: $10.00 ON AC88 SHERIFFS SERVICE FEE FOR COURT HOUSE SECURITY. CS-2020-48: $10.00 ON AC89 COURT CLERK'S RECORDS MANAGEMENT AND PRESERVATION FEE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OCIS HAS AUTOMATICALLY ASSIGNED JUDGE CONDREN, SHEILA A. TO THIS CASE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCode: SMIP; Description: SUMMONS ISSUED - PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCode: CONTRACT; Description: BREACH OF AGREEMENT - CONTRACT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL RELIEF LESS THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: BREACH OF AGREEMENT - CONTRACT(CONTRACT); Filed By: American Express National Bank

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less