This case was last updated from Oklahoma County Courts on 05/20/2023 at 21:56:14 (UTC).

Albert Njenda, INDIVIDUALLY, AND Elvis Mbonteh, INDIVIDUALLY Plaintiff, v. Lauren Hayes, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 08/30/2022 Albert Njenda, INDIVIDUALLY, AND Elvis Mbonteh, INDIVIDUALLY Plaintiff, filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Lauren Hayes, Defendant. This case was filed in Oklahoma County Courts, Oklahoma County Courthouse located in Tulsa, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Dishman, C. Brent. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4239

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Oklahoma, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Dishman, C. Brent

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Mbonteh, Elvis

Njenda, Albert

Defendant

Hayes, Lauren

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GARRETT, BRYAN G

Defendant Attorneys

Jones, Nicole R

Mckenney, Shanda

 

Court Documents

PETITION

08/30/2022: PETITION

SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: LAUREN HAYES PERSONALLY ON 9/1/22

09/06/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: LAUREN HAYES PERSONALLY ON 9/1/22

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT LAUREN A. HAYES

09/28/2022: ANSWER OF DEFENDANT LAUREN A. HAYES

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE- NICOLE R JONES AND SAFF OF ANGELA D AILLES ATTORNEY FOR DEF

09/28/2022: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE- NICOLE R JONES AND SAFF OF ANGELA D AILLES ATTORNEY FOR DEF

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

11/30/2022: DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: DISMISSED - WITH PREJUDICE; Other; Party Details; Defendant: Hayes, Lauren

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: DISPCVDMWP; Description: DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; Count: 1; Party: Hayes, Lauren

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: EAA; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE- NICOLE R JONES AND SAFF OF ANGELA D AILLES ATTORNEY FOR DEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: A; Description: ANSWER OF DEFENDANT LAUREN A. HAYES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: SMS; Description: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: LAUREN HAYES PERSONALLY ON 9/1/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2022-5257272 ON 08/30/2022. PAYOR: BRYAN G GARRETT PLLC TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 252.14. LINE ITEMS: CJ-2022-4239: $173.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. CJ-2022-4239: $6.00 ON AC23 LAW LIBRARY FEE CIVIL AND CRIMINAL. CJ-2022-4239: $1.66 ON AC31 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND. CJ-2022-4239: $5.00 ON AC58 OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES. CJ-2022-4239: $1.55 ON AC59 COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND. CJ-2022-4239: $7.00 ON AC64 DISPUTE MEDIATION FEES CIVIL ONLY. CJ-2022-4239: $0.45 ON AC65 STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND, INTERPRETER SVCS. CJ-2022-4239: $2.48 ON AC67 DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND. CJ-2022-4239: $25.00 ON AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND. CJ-2022-4239: $10.00 ON AC81 LENGTHY TRIAL FUND. CJ-2022-4239: $10.00 ON AC88 SHERIFFS SERVICE FEE FOR COURT HOUSE SECURITY. CJ-2022-4239: $10.00 ON AC89 COURT CLERK'S RECORDS MANAGEMENT AND PRESERVATION FEE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OCIS HAS AUTOMATICALLY ASSIGNED JUDGE DISHMAN, C. BRENT TO THIS CASE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: P; Description: PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketCode: SMF; Description: SUMMONS FEE (CLERKS FEE); Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketCode: LTF; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 163.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketCode: AUTONEG; Description: AUTO NEGLIGENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL RELIEF MORE THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: AUTO NEGLIGENCE(AUTONEG); Filed By: Njenda, Albert

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less