This case was last updated from Jackson County Courts on 04/10/2022 at 16:53:19 (UTC).

A-1 GLASS & MIRROR LLC V. TERRY PUTNEY

Case Summary

On 07/28/2021 A-1 GLASS MIRROR LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against TERRY PUTNEY. This case was filed in Jackson County Courts, Jackson County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is HALL, RAFE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0194

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Jackson, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

HALL, RAFE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

A-1 GLASS & MIRROR LLC

Defendant

PUTNEY, TERRY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2021
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • HearingEvent: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT MINUTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 08/06/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: RETURNED APPLICATION WITH ORDER - SERVED TERRY PUTNAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT CLERK PRESERVATION FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% CASA, COJC, CHS TO DISTRICT COURT REV FUND; Amount: $ 2.48

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% CASA, COJC, CHS TO REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.66

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE - OUT OF COUNTY; Amount: $ 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUED APPLICATION WITH ORDER; Amount: $ 150.00

    Read MoreRead Less