This case was last updated from Canadian County Courts on 03/21/2022 at 14:38:43 (UTC).

4 SEASONS SEAMLESS GUTTERS AND MORE, LLC, Plaintiff, VS. STORM SHIELD ROOFING AND RESTORATION, INC, AND CHAD DAVIS, Defendants.

Case Summary

On 03/24/2021 4 SEASONS SEAMLESS GUTTERS AND MORE, LLC, Plaintiff filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against STORM SHIELD ROOFING AND RESTORATION, INC, AND CHAD DAVIS, Defendants. This case was filed in Canadian County Courts, Canadian County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-364

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Canadian, Oklahoma

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

4 SEASONS SEAMLESS GUTTERS AND MORE, LLC

Defendants

DAVIS, CHAD

STORM SHIELD ROOFING AND RESTORATION, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OSBY, MARK W

Attorney at WHEATLEY SEGLER & OSBY LLC

Po Box 850126

Yukon, OK 73085

 

Court Documents

ORDER ISSUED TO THE ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE ON CHAD DAVIS

03/24/2021: ORDER ISSUED TO THE ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE ON CHAD DAVIS

ALIAS ORDER ISSUED TO THE ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE ON STORM SHIELD ROOFING AND RESTORATION, INC

04/16/2021: ALIAS ORDER ISSUED TO THE ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE ON STORM SHIELD ROOFING AND RESTORATION, INC

RETURN OF NON SERVICE ON ORIGINAL ORDER//FILED *STORM SHIELD ROOFING AND RESTORATION, INC-NOT SERVED*

04/16/2021: RETURN OF NON SERVICE ON ORIGINAL ORDER//FILED *STORM SHIELD ROOFING AND RESTORATION, INC-NOT SERVED*

ORDER ISSUED TO THE ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE ON STORM SHIELD ROOFING AND RESTORATION, INC

03/24/2021: ORDER ISSUED TO THE ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE ON STORM SHIELD ROOFING AND RESTORATION, INC

ALIAS ORDER ISSUED TO THE ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE ON CHAD DAVIS

04/16/2021: ALIAS ORDER ISSUED TO THE ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE ON CHAD DAVIS

SMALL CLAIMS INITIAL FILING.SMALL CLAIMS AFFIDAVIT//FILED $1,678.29 FOR SERVICES PROVIDED

03/24/2021: SMALL CLAIMS INITIAL FILING.SMALL CLAIMS AFFIDAVIT//FILED $1,678.29 FOR SERVICES PROVIDED

RETURN OF NON SERVICE ON ORIGINAL ORDER//FILED *CHAD DAVIS-NOT SERVED*

04/16/2021: RETURN OF NON SERVICE ON ORIGINAL ORDER//FILED *CHAD DAVIS-NOT SERVED*

SIXTH ALIAS ORDER ISSUED BY PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER

02/07/2022: SIXTH ALIAS ORDER ISSUED BY PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER

SIXTH ALIAS ORDER ISSUED BY PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER

02/07/2022: SIXTH ALIAS ORDER ISSUED BY PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER

FIFTH ALIAS ORDER RETURN FILED UNSERVED ON: CHAD DAVIS

02/07/2022: FIFTH ALIAS ORDER RETURN FILED UNSERVED ON: CHAD DAVIS

FIFTH ALIAS ORDER RETURN FILED UNSERVED ON: STORM SHIELD ROOFING

02/07/2022: FIFTH ALIAS ORDER RETURN FILED UNSERVED ON: STORM SHIELD ROOFING

FIFTH ALIAS ORDER ISSUED TO ATTY

11/29/2021: FIFTH ALIAS ORDER ISSUED TO ATTY

FIFTH ALIAS ORDER ISSUED TO ATTY

11/29/2021: FIFTH ALIAS ORDER ISSUED TO ATTY

FOURT ALIAS ORDER ISSUED TO ATTY FOR SVC ON CHAD DAVIS

08/27/2021: FOURT ALIAS ORDER ISSUED TO ATTY FOR SVC ON CHAD DAVIS

FOURTH ALIAS ORDER ISSUED TO ATTY FOR SVC ON STORM SHIELD ROOFING AND RESTORATION, INC

08/27/2021: FOURTH ALIAS ORDER ISSUED TO ATTY FOR SVC ON STORM SHIELD ROOFING AND RESTORATION, INC

THIRD ALIAS ORDER ISSUED TO ATTY FOR SVC ON CHAD DAVIS

07/16/2021: THIRD ALIAS ORDER ISSUED TO ATTY FOR SVC ON CHAD DAVIS

THIRD ALIAS ORDER ISSUED TO ATTY FOR SVC ON STORM SHIELD ROOFING AND RESTORATION INC

07/16/2021: THIRD ALIAS ORDER ISSUED TO ATTY FOR SVC ON STORM SHIELD ROOFING AND RESTORATION INC

SECOND ALIAS ORDER RETURN FILED UNSERVED ON: CHAD DAVIS

07/16/2021: SECOND ALIAS ORDER RETURN FILED UNSERVED ON: CHAD DAVIS

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2022
  • HearingEvent: HEARING // SMALL CLAIMS - SIXTH ALIAS; Party: 4 SEASONS SEAMLESS GUTTERS AND MORE, LLC; Docket: Khristan K. Strubhar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • HearingEvent: HEARING // SMALL CLAIMS - FIFTH ALIAS; Party: 4 SEASONS SEAMLESS GUTTERS AND MORE, LLC; Docket: Barbara Hatfield

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: CRT MIN. PLAIN APPEARS THROUGH ATTORNEY OF RECORD. DEFENDANTS FAIL TO APPEAR. ALIAS TO ISSUE. JUDGE HATFIELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: AOIP; Description: SIXTH ALIAS ORDER ISSUED BY PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER; Party: 4 SEASONS SEAMLESS GUTTERS AND MORE, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: AOIP; Description: SIXTH ALIAS ORDER ISSUED BY PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER; Party: 4 SEASONS SEAMLESS GUTTERS AND MORE, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: SMU; Description: FIFTH ALIAS ORDER RETURN FILED UNSERVED ON: CHAD DAVIS; Party: DAVIS, CHAD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: SMU; Description: FIFTH ALIAS ORDER RETURN FILED UNSERVED ON: STORM SHIELD ROOFING; Party: STORM SHIELD ROOFING AND RESTORATION, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: AOIP; Description: FIFTH ALIAS ORDER ISSUED TO ATTY; Party: 4 SEASONS SEAMLESS GUTTERS AND MORE, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: AOIP; Description: FIFTH ALIAS ORDER ISSUED TO ATTY; Party: 4 SEASONS SEAMLESS GUTTERS AND MORE, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • HearingEvent: HEARING // SMALL CLAIMS - THIRD ALIAS; Party: 4 SEASONS SEAMLESS GUTTERS AND MORE, LLC; Docket: Barbara Hatfield

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2021-664084 ON 03/24/2021. PAYOR: WHEATLEY, SEGLER & OSBY, LLC TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 58.00. LINE ITEMS: SC-2021-364: $45.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. SC-2021-364: $6.00 ON AC23 LAW LIBRARY FEE CIVIL AND CRIMINAL. SC-2021-364: $7.00 ON AC64 DISPUTE MEDIATION FEES CIVIL ONLY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OCIS HAS AUTOMATICALLY ASSIGNED JUDGE JUDGE NOT LISTED TO THIS CASE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: SMIP; Description: ORDER ISSUED TO THE ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE ON STORM SHIELD ROOFING AND RESTORATION, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: SMIP; Description: ORDER ISSUED TO THE ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE ON CHAD DAVIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketCode: AFDC1; Description: AFFIDAVIT; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketCode: SCINDEBT1; Description: INDEBTEDNESS less than $5000.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SMALL CLAIMS INITIAL FILING.SMALL CLAIMS AFFIDAVIT//FILED $1,678.29 FOR SERVICES PROVIDED; Count: 1; Party: 4 SEASONS SEAMLESS GUTTERS AND MORE, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: INDEBTEDNESS less than $5000.00.(SCINDEBT1); Filed By: 4 SEASONS SEAMLESS GUTTERS AND MORE, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less