This case was last updated from Oklahoma Court of Criminal Appeals on 07/21/2022 at 03:02:58 (UTC).

WILLIE EDWARD GRAYSON, Appellant, v. STATE OF OKLAHOMA, Appellee,

Case Summary

On 01/18/2022 WILLIE EDWARD GRAYSON, Appellant filed an Other lawsuit against STATE OF OKLAHOMA, Appellee. This case was filed in Oklahoma Court of Criminal Appeals, Oklahoma Court of Criminal Appeals located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2-72

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, Oklahoma

 

Party Details

Appellant

GRAYSON, WILLIE EDWARD

Appellee

STATE OF OKLAHOMA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Low, Elizabeth Anne

Asst. Public Defender, 320 Robert S Kerr Ave Ste 400

Okc, OK 73102

Bovos, Hallie Elizabeth

Assistan Public Defender, 320 Robert S. Kerr Ave., Suite 400

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Appellee Attorneys

Oklahoma County District Attorney

505 County Office Bldg., 320 Robert S. Kerr Ave.

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Attorney General Of Oklahoma

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAL

01/18/2022: NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAL

LETTER FROM DIST COURT CLERK TO OPD- RE: ITEMS NOT PRESENTLY CONTAINED

03/16/2022: LETTER FROM DIST COURT CLERK TO OPD- RE: ITEMS NOT PRESENTLY CONTAINED

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF COUNSEL-HALLIE ELIZABETH BOVOS

04/04/2022: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF COUNSEL-HALLIE ELIZABETH BOVOS

APLNTS MOTION TO DISMISS APPEAL W/ATTACHED WAIVER OF APPEAL

04/04/2022: APLNTS MOTION TO DISMISS APPEAL W/ATTACHED WAIVER OF APPEAL

NOTICE OF COMPLETION OF RECORD ON APPEAL

04/11/2022: NOTICE OF COMPLETION OF RECORD ON APPEAL

RECORD ORDERED FROM DISTRICT COURT

04/11/2022: RECORD ORDERED FROM DISTRICT COURT

MANDATE ISSUED

04/15/2022: MANDATE ISSUED

RETURN OF COURT CLERK

04/20/2022: RETURN OF COURT CLERK

RECEIPT FOR MANDATE

04/20/2022: RECEIPT FOR MANDATE

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketCode: RRCD; Description: RECORD RETURNED TO DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RCMD; Description: RECEIPT FOR MANDATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RTCC; Description: RETURN OF COURT CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: MAND; Description: MANDATE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketCode: 5005; Description: DISMISSED (ORDER SHEET)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketCode: DISN; Description: JE: ORDER; CONCUR: ROWLAND PJ, HUDSON VPJ, LUMPKIN J, LEWIS J, MUSSEMAN J; COPIES TO HON. AMY PALUMBO, DIST COURT CLERK AND ATTORNEYS; ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL; APLNT REQUEST THAT THE PROSECUTION OF THE APPEAL CEASE, AND ACKNOWLEDGES THAT ONCE DISMISSED, THE APPEAL CANNOT BE REINSTATE. APLNTS APPEAL IS DISMISSED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketCode: TRAN; Description: TRANSCRIPT - 1/7/22 - 26 PAGES (COPY TO AG)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketCode: ORGR; Description: ORIGINAL RECORD - 199 PAGES (COPY TO AG)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RODC; Description: RECORD ORDERED FROM DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NTCP; Description: NOTICE OF COMPLETION OF RECORD ON APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: APLNTS MOTION TO DISMISS APPEAL W/ATTACHED WAIVER OF APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF COUNSEL-HALLIE ELIZABETH BOVOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LETTER FROM DIST COURT CLERK TO OPD- RE: ITEMS NOT PRESENTLY CONTAINED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: DSRC; Description: DESIGNATION OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NTIA; Description: NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUED CERTIFICATE OF APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: PAY; Description: RECEIPT # 82622 ON 01/18/2022. PAYOR: ELIZABETH ANNE LOW TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 0.00. LINE ITEMS: $0.00 ON REVOCATION INITIAL FILING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: CASE; Description: REVOCATION INITIAL FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketCode: DOOA; Description: DATE OF ORDER APPEALED

    Read MoreRead Less