This case was last updated from Oklahoma Court of Criminal Appeals on 05/25/2022 at 10:29:19 (UTC).

Tommy James Millsap, Petitioner, v. STATE OF OKLAHOMA, Respondent,

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 Tommy James Millsap, Petitioner filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against STATE OF OKLAHOMA, Respondent. This case was filed in Oklahoma Court of Criminal Appeals, Oklahoma Court of Criminal Appeals located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2-82

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • County, State:

    Statewide, Oklahoma

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Millsap, Tommy James

Helena, OK 73741

Respondent

STATE OF OKLAHOMA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Millsap, Tommy James

#243868, 216 N. Murray St

Helena, OK 73741

Respondent Attorney

Carter County District Attorney

Courthouse, 20 B. St. Sw Ardmore

 

Court Documents

PETITION IN ERROR WITH BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONER

01/21/2022: PETITION IN ERROR WITH BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONER

NOTICE OF COMPLETION OF RECORD ON APPEAL (CF-2003-314)

05/16/2022: NOTICE OF COMPLETION OF RECORD ON APPEAL (CF-2003-314)

NOTICE OF COMPLETION OF RECORD ON APPEAL (CF-2012-138)

05/16/2022: NOTICE OF COMPLETION OF RECORD ON APPEAL (CF-2012-138)

RECORD ORDERED FROM DISTRICT COURT

05/16/2022: RECORD ORDERED FROM DISTRICT COURT

PETITIONER'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS

05/19/2022: PETITIONER'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITIONER'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketCode: RCCT; Description: RECORD TO COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketCode: TRAN; Description: TRANSCRIPT - 12/22/21 - 5 PAGES (COPY TO AG)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketCode: ORGR; Description: ORIGINAL RECORD(CF-98-338) - 6 PAGES (COPY TO AG)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketCode: ORGR; Description: ORIGINAL RECORD(CF-12-138) - 6 PAGES (COPY TO AG)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketCode: ORGR; Description: ORIGINAL RECORD(CF-03-314) - 6 PAGES (COPY TO AG)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RODC; Description: RECORD ORDERED FROM DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NTCP; Description: NOTICE OF COMPLETION OF RECORD ON APPEAL (CF-2012-138)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NTCP; Description: NOTICE OF COMPLETION OF RECORD ON APPEAL (CF-2003-314)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketCode: NTCP; Description: NOTICE OF COMPLETION OF RECORD ON APPEAL (CF-1998-338)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PETF; Description: PETITION IN ERROR WITH BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUE CERTIFICATE OF APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: PAY; Description: RECEIPT # 82640 ON 01/21/2022. PAYOR: TOMMY JAMES MILLSAP TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 0.00. LINE ITEMS: $0.00 ON POST CONVICTION INITIAL FILING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: PAUP; Description: PAUPER AFFIDAVIT FOR MILLSAP, TOMMY JAMES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: CASE; Description: POST CONVICTION INITIAL FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketCode: DOOA; Description: DATE OF ORDER APPEALED

    Read MoreRead Less