This case was last updated from Oklahoma Court of Criminal Appeals on 06/29/2022 at 10:26:23 (UTC).

Thomas Baker III, Petitioner, v. STATE OF OKLAHOMA, Respondent,

Case Summary

On 01/20/2022 Thomas Baker III, Petitioner filed an Other lawsuit against STATE OF OKLAHOMA, Respondent. This case was filed in Oklahoma Court of Criminal Appeals, Oklahoma Court of Criminal Appeals located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2-76

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, Oklahoma

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Baker, Thomas III

Respondent

STATE OF OKLAHOMA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Gungoll, Timothy James

P.O. Box 3046

Enid, OK 73702

Respondent Attorneys

Garfield County District Attorneys Office

114 W. Broadway

Enid, OK 73701

Attorney General Of Oklahoma

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAL

01/20/2022: NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAL

NOTICE OF FILING MELISSA K. ATKINSON, CSR

01/27/2022: NOTICE OF FILING MELISSA K. ATKINSON, CSR

AMENDED DESIGNATION OF RECORD

03/02/2022: AMENDED DESIGNATION OF RECORD

NOTICE OF COMPLETION OF RECORD FOR APPEAL FROM DISTRICT COURT

04/04/2022: NOTICE OF COMPLETION OF RECORD FOR APPEAL FROM DISTRICT COURT

RECORD ORDERED FROM DISTRICT COURT

04/04/2022: RECORD ORDERED FROM DISTRICT COURT

PETITION IN ERROR

04/07/2022: PETITION IN ERROR

APPELLANT'S BRIEF IN CHIEF

06/02/2022: APPELLANT'S BRIEF IN CHIEF

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: ATBC; Description: APPELLANT'S BRIEF IN CHIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketCode: TRAN; Description: TRANSCRIPT - 6/25/21 - 20 PAGES (COPY TO AG)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketCode: TRAN; Description: TRANSCRIPT - 6/10/21 - 19 PAGES (COPY TO AG)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketCode: TRAN; Description: TRANSCRIPT - 4/12/21 - 13 PAGES (COPY TO AG)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketCode: TRAN; Description: TRANSCRIPT - 4/12/21 - 9 PAGES (COPY TO AG)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketCode: TRAN; Description: TRANSCRIPT - 3/25/21 - 15 PAGES (COPY TO AG)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketCode: ORGR; Description: ORIGINAL RECORD - 198 PAGES (COPY TO AG)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PETF; Description: PETITION IN ERROR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RODC; Description: RECORD ORDERED FROM DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NTCP; Description: NOTICE OF COMPLETION OF RECORD FOR APPEAL FROM DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AMENDED DESIGNATION OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: NOTICE OF FILING MELISSA K. ATKINSON, CSR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: DSRC; Description: DESIGNATION OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NTIA; Description: NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUE CERTIFICATE OF APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: PAY; Description: RECEIPT # 82630 ON 01/20/2022. PAYOR: TIMOTHY JAMES GUNGOLL TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 50.00. LINE ITEMS: $50.00 ON CERTIORARI INITIAL FILING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: CASE; Description: CERTIORARI INITIAL FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketCode: DOOA; Description: DATE OF ORDER APPEALED (PC-2021-1491)

    Read MoreRead Less