This case was last updated from Oklahoma Supreme Court on 10/18/2021 at 18:28:09 (UTC).

Terrell G. Lewis, Petitioner, vs Twin Cities Ready Mix, Inc.; Wausau Insurance Group; and The Oklahoma Workers' Compensation Court of Existing Claims, Respondents.

Case Summary

On 06/09/2021 Terrell G Lewis, Petitioner filed a Labor - Wage Claim lawsuit against Twin Cities Ready Mix, Inc Wausau Insurance Group and The Oklahoma Workers' Compensation Court of Existing Claims, Respondents. This case was filed in Oklahoma Supreme Court, Oklahoma Supreme Court located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9631

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wage Claim

  • County, State:

    Statewide, Oklahoma

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Lewis, Terrell G

Respondents

Twin Cities Ready Mix, Inc

Wausau Insurance Group

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Jones, Susan H

Attorney at Toon Law Firm

1619 S. Peoria

Tulsa, OK 74120

Respondent Attorney

Kendrick, Bert

12603 S. 67Th East Ave

Bixby, OK 74008

Other Attorneys

Paczkowski, Robert

P.O. Box 7218

London, KY 40742

 

Court Documents

PETITION FOR REVIEW (AND PRELIMINARY STATEMENT) FILED BY JONES FOR LEWIS-PETR

06/09/2021: PETITION FOR REVIEW (AND PRELIMINARY STATEMENT) FILED BY JONES FOR LEWIS-PETR

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE BY SUSAN H. JONES

06/09/2021: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE BY SUSAN H. JONES

DESIGNATION OF RECORD

06/09/2021: DESIGNATION OF RECORD

AMENDED PETITION FOR REVIEW ( AND PRELIMINARY STATEMENT)

06/24/2021: AMENDED PETITION FOR REVIEW ( AND PRELIMINARY STATEMENT)

JE: ETC. UNLESS RESP IS FILED BY 7-21-21, AEAB W/BE LIMITED TO ADDRESSING ARGUMENTS RAISED BY PETRS. PETRS SH/COMPLY W/BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET FORTH BY OKLA SUP CT RULES REGARDLESS OF NON-FILING OR FILING OF A RESP BY RSPNTS. N/ATTYS

07/06/2021: JE: ETC. UNLESS RESP IS FILED BY 7-21-21, AEAB W/BE LIMITED TO ADDRESSING ARGUMENTS RAISED BY PETRS. PETRS SH/COMPLY W/BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET FORTH BY OKLA SUP CT RULES REGARDLESS OF NON-FILING OR FILING OF A RESP BY RSPNTS. N/ATTYS

JE: CT NOTES PETR'S FILING OF APIE FOR REVIEW ON 6-24-21, ATTACHING UNCERTIFIED COPIES OF ORDERS APPEALED. FILING FAILS TO COMPLY W/TH/CT'S ORDER OF 6-18-21. PETR TO FILE APIE FOR REVIEW, ON OR BEFORE 7-22-21, ATTACHING AS EXHIBIT A TO AMENDED PET FI

07/06/2021: JE: CT NOTES PETR'S FILING OF APIE FOR REVIEW ON 6-24-21, ATTACHING UNCERTIFIED COPIES OF ORDERS APPEALED. FILING FAILS TO COMPLY W/TH/CT'S ORDER OF 6-18-21. PETR TO FILE APIE FOR REVIEW, ON OR BEFORE 7-22-21, ATTACHING AS EXHIBIT A TO AMENDED PET FILE STAMPED CERT COPIES, SIGNED BY CT CLERK, OF ORDERS APPEALED. ETC. UNLESS APIE W/ATTACHED CERT COPIES OF ORDERS FILED BY 7-22-21, TH/APPEAL W/BE SUBJECT TO DISMISSAL W/OUT FURTHER NOTICE. RSPNT W/HAVE 20 DAYS FROM FILING OF 2ND AMENDED PET FOR REVIEW TO FILE A RESP. ETC. N/ATTYS DC CLERK

SECOND AMENDED PETITION FOR REVIEW

07/20/2021: SECOND AMENDED PETITION FOR REVIEW

NOTICE OF COMPLETION

07/28/2021: NOTICE OF COMPLETION

BRIEF IN CHIEF OF PETITIONER

08/20/2021: BRIEF IN CHIEF OF PETITIONER

RSPNTS' COMBINED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME IN WHICH TO FILE ANSWER BRIEF AND LEAVE TO FILE APPELLATE RESPONSIVE PLEADING OUT OF TIME

09/01/2021: RSPNTS' COMBINED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME IN WHICH TO FILE ANSWER BRIEF AND LEAVE TO FILE APPELLATE RESPONSIVE PLEADING OUT OF TIME

JE: RSPNTS' RESP TO PET FOR REVIEW W/DUE 8-9-21. ETC. RSPNTS' UNTIMELY REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESP TO PET FOR REVIEW DENIED. RSPNTS' AEAB W/BE LIMITED TO ADDRESSING ARGUMENTS RAISED BY PETRS. RSPNTS' MOT FOR TIME TO FILE AEAB GRANTED.

09/02/2021: JE: RSPNTS' RESP TO PET FOR REVIEW W/DUE 8-9-21. ETC. RSPNTS' UNTIMELY REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESP TO PET FOR REVIEW DENIED. RSPNTS' AEAB W/BE LIMITED TO ADDRESSING ARGUMENTS RAISED BY PETRS. RSPNTS' MOT FOR TIME TO FILE AEAB GRANTED. AEAB SH/BE FILED NLT 9-24-21. RSPNTS TO FILE ENTRY OF APPEARANCE ETC NLT 9-17-21. RSPNTS M/USE THEIR ADDRESS OF CHOICE WH/ENTERING AN APPEARANCE. C/ATTYS

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE BY BERT KENDRICK

09/16/2021: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE BY BERT KENDRICK

ANSWER BRIEF OF RESPONDENTS TWIN CITIES READY MIX, INC. AND WAUSAU INSURANCE GROUP

09/24/2021: ANSWER BRIEF OF RESPONDENTS TWIN CITIES READY MIX, INC. AND WAUSAU INSURANCE GROUP

CORRECTIONS TO THE ANSWER BRIEF OF RESPONDENTS TWIN CITIES READY MIX, INC. AND WAUSAU INSURANCE GROUP

10/04/2021: CORRECTIONS TO THE ANSWER BRIEF OF RESPONDENTS TWIN CITIES READY MIX, INC. AND WAUSAU INSURANCE GROUP

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CORRECTIONS TO THE ANSWER BRIEF OF RESPONDENTS TWIN CITIES READY MIX, INC. AND WAUSAU INSURANCE GROUP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: AEAB; Description: ANSWER BRIEF OF RESPONDENTS TWIN CITIES READY MIX, INC. AND WAUSAU INSURANCE GROUP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE BY BERT KENDRICK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JE: RSPNTS' RESP TO PET FOR REVIEW W/DUE 8-9-21. ETC. RSPNTS' UNTIMELY REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESP TO PET FOR REVIEW DENIED. RSPNTS' AEAB W/BE LIMITED TO ADDRESSING ARGUMENTS RAISED BY PETRS. RSPNTS' MOT FOR TIME TO FILE AEAB GRANTED. AEAB SH/BE FILED NLT 9-24-21. RSPNTS TO FILE ENTRY OF APPEARANCE ETC NLT 9-17-21. RSPNTS M/USE THEIR ADDRESS OF CHOICE WH/ENTERING AN APPEARANCE. C/ATTYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: RSPNTS' COMBINED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME IN WHICH TO FILE ANSWER BRIEF AND LEAVE TO FILE APPELLATE RESPONSIVE PLEADING OUT OF TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: ATBC; Description: BRIEF IN CHIEF OF PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NTCP; Description: NOTICE OF COMPLETION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SECOND AMENDED PETITION FOR REVIEW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JE: CT NOTES PETR'S FILING OF APIE FOR REVIEW ON 6-24-21, ATTACHING UNCERTIFIED COPIES OF ORDERS APPEALED. FILING FAILS TO COMPLY W/TH/CT'S ORDER OF 6-18-21. PETR TO FILE APIE FOR REVIEW, ON OR BEFORE 7-22-21, ATTACHING AS EXHIBIT A TO AMENDED PET FILE STAMPED CERT COPIES, SIGNED BY CT CLERK, OF ORDERS APPEALED. ETC. UNLESS APIE W/ATTACHED CERT COPIES OF ORDERS FILED BY 7-22-21, TH/APPEAL W/BE SUBJECT TO DISMISSAL W/OUT FURTHER NOTICE. RSPNT W/HAVE 20 DAYS FROM FILING OF 2ND AMENDED PET FOR REVIEW TO FILE A RESP. ETC. N/ATTYS DC CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JE: ETC. UNLESS RESP IS FILED BY 7-21-21, AEAB W/BE LIMITED TO ADDRESSING ARGUMENTS RAISED BY PETRS. PETRS SH/COMPLY W/BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET FORTH BY OKLA SUP CT RULES REGARDLESS OF NON-FILING OR FILING OF A RESP BY RSPNTS. N/ATTYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: APIE; Description: AMENDED PETITION FOR REVIEW ( AND PRELIMINARY STATEMENT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketCode: MAIL; Description: AMENDED PETITION MAILED DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETR TO FILE APIE, NLT 7-2-21, ATTACHING ETC CERT COPY OF ORDER APPEALED. ETC. N/ATTYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: DSRC; Description: DESIGNATION OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE BY SUSAN H. JONES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PETF; Description: PETITION FOR REVIEW (AND PRELIMINARY STATEMENT) FILED BY JONES FOR LEWIS-PETR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketCode: PAY; Description: RECEIPT # 80604 ON 06/09/2021. BY MAIL PAYOR: SUSAN H JONES TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 200.00. LINE ITEMS: $200.00 ON WORKERS' COMPENSATION COURT INITIAL FILING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketCode: CASE; Description: WORKERS' COMPENSATION COURT INITIAL FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketCode: MAIL; Description: PETITION MAILED DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketCode: DOOA; Description: DATE OF ORDER APPEALED

    Read MoreRead Less