This case was last updated from Oklahoma Court of Criminal Appeals on 03/01/2022 at 05:20:42 (UTC).

Tammy Casto, Petitioner, v. Hon Stephen Pazzo, Respondent,

Case Summary

On 07/12/2021 Tammy Casto, Petitioner filed an Other lawsuit against Hon Stephen Pazzo, Respondent. This case was filed in Oklahoma Court of Criminal Appeals, Oklahoma Court of Criminal Appeals located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-698

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, Oklahoma

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Casto, Tammy

Respondent

Pazzo, Hon Stephen

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Steidley, Janice

319 West 1St Stp.O. Box 98

Claremore, OK 74017

Respondent Attorney

Rogers County District Attorney

Courthouse219 S. Missouri St. Claremore

 

Court Documents

PETITION FOR WRIT OF PROHIBITION, DESIGNATION OF RECORD, AND REQUEST FOR CONTINUED STAY PENDING DECISION REGARDING THE COURT'S 07/01/2021 RULING

07/12/2021: PETITION FOR WRIT OF PROHIBITION, DESIGNATION OF RECORD, AND REQUEST FOR CONTINUED STAY PENDING DECISION REGARDING THE COURT'S 07/01/2021 RULING

PETITIONER'S ENTRY OF APPEARANCE- JANICE STEIDLEY

07/21/2021: PETITIONER'S ENTRY OF APPEARANCE- JANICE STEIDLEY

PETITIONER'S MOTION TO AMEND PETITION FOR WRIT OF PROHIBITION, DESIGNATION OF RECORD, AND REQUEST FOR CONTINUED STAY PENDING DECISION REGARDING THE COURT'S 07/01/2021 RULING

07/21/2021: PETITIONER'S MOTION TO AMEND PETITION FOR WRIT OF PROHIBITION, DESIGNATION OF RECORD, AND REQUEST FOR CONTINUED STAY PENDING DECISION REGARDING THE COURT'S 07/01/2021 RULING

PETITIONER'S BRIEF IN CHIEF

07/21/2021: PETITIONER'S BRIEF IN CHIEF

JE: ORDER KUEHN PJ, ROWLAND VPJ, LUMPKIN J, LEWIS J, HUDSON J COPIES TO HON. STEPHEN PAZZO, DIST COURT CLERK AND ATTORNEYS ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR WRIT OF PROHIBITION PETITIONER HAS NOT SHOWN SHE IS ENTITLED TO EXTRAORDINARY RELIEF WHERE THE ISSUE

07/27/2021: JE: ORDER KUEHN PJ, ROWLAND VPJ, LUMPKIN J, LEWIS J, HUDSON J COPIES TO HON. STEPHEN PAZZO, DIST COURT CLERK AND ATTORNEYS ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR WRIT OF PROHIBITION PETITIONER HAS NOT SHOWN SHE IS ENTITLED TO EXTRAORDINARY RELIEF WHERE THE ISSUE COULD HAVE BEEN REVIEWED ON APPEAL HAD PETITIONER FILED A DIRECT APPEAL OF THE TERMS OF PROBATION IMPOSED AS A PART JUDGE PAZZO'S ORDER DEFERRING IMPOSITION OF J&S. PETITIONER REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF A WRIT OF PROHIBITION IS DENIED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: OPIN; Description: JE: ORDER; KUEHN PJ, ROWLAND VPJ, LUMPKIN J, LEWIS J, HUDSON J; COPIES TO HON. STEPHEN PAZZO, DIST COURT CLERK AND ATTORNEYS; ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR WRIT OF PROHIBITION; PETITIONER HAS NOT SHOWN SHE IS ENTITLED TO EXTRAORDINARY RELIEF WHERE THE ISSUE COULD HAVE BEEN REVIEWED ON APPEAL HAD PETITIONER FILED A DIRECT APPEAL OF THE TERMS OF PROBATION IMPOSED AS A PART JUDGE PAZZO'S ORDER DEFERRING IMPOSITION OF J&S. PETITIONER REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF A WRIT OF PROHIBITION IS DENIED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: ATBC; Description: PETITIONER'S BRIEF IN CHIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITIONER'S MOTION TO AMEND PETITION FOR WRIT OF PROHIBITION, DESIGNATION OF RECORD, AND REQUEST FOR CONTINUED STAY PENDING DECISION REGARDING THE COURT'S 07/01/2021 RULING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITIONER'S ENTRY OF APPEARANCE- JANICE STEIDLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketCode: TEND; Description: PETITIONER'S AMENDED PETITION FOR WRIT OF PROHIBITION, DESIGNATION OF RECORD, AND REQUEST FOR CONTINUED STAY PENDING DECISION REGARDING THE COURT'S 07/01/2021 RULING-TENDERED FOR FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PETF; Description: PETITION FOR WRIT OF PROHIBITION, DESIGNATION OF RECORD, AND REQUEST FOR CONTINUED STAY PENDING DECISION REGARDING THE COURT'S 07/01/2021 RULING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCode: PAY; Description: RECEIPT # 80908 ON 07/12/2021. PAYOR: JANICE STEIDLEY TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 50.00. LINE ITEMS: $50.00 ON [WRIT OF] PROHIBITION INITIAL FILING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCode: CASE; Description: [WRIT OF] PROHIBITION INITIAL FILING

    Read MoreRead Less