This case was last updated from Oklahoma Court of Criminal Appeals on 05/30/2022 at 17:48:33 (UTC).

STATE OF OKLAHOMA, Petitioner, v. TERRY JAVON NEPEON KING, Respondent,

Case Summary

On 11/05/2021 STATE OF OKLAHOMA, Petitioner filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against TERRY JAVON NEPEON KING, Respondent. This case was filed in Oklahoma Court of Criminal Appeals, Oklahoma Court of Criminal Appeals located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1232

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • County, State:

    Statewide, Oklahoma

 

Party Details

Petitioner

STATE OF OKLAHOMA

Respondent

KING, TERRY JAVON NEPEON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Mcknight, Marianna

500 S. Denver Ave, Suite 800

Tulsa, OK 74013

Respondent Attorney

Baldwin, Kasey Joan

Public Defender'S Office, 423 S. Boulder, Ste. 300

Tulsa, OK 74103

 

Court Documents

PETITION IN ERROR

11/05/2021: PETITION IN ERROR

BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF APPELLANT'S STATE APPEAL

11/05/2021: BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF APPELLANT'S STATE APPEAL

NOTICE OF COMPLETION OF RECORD ON APPEAL

12/06/2021: NOTICE OF COMPLETION OF RECORD ON APPEAL

RECORD ORDERED FROM DISTRICT COURT

12/06/2021: RECORD ORDERED FROM DISTRICT COURT

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketCode: CSTC; Description: CAUSE SUBMITTED TO COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketCode: RCCT; Description: RECORD TO COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketCode: ORGR; Description: ORIGINAL RECORD - 38 PAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RODC; Description: RECORD ORDERED FROM DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NTCP; Description: NOTICE OF COMPLETION OF RECORD ON APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketCode: AEAB; Description: APLEES RESPONSE BRIEF IN RESPONSE TO APLNTS APPEAL OF POST-CONVICTION RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: BFSP; Description: BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF APPELLANT'S STATE APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PETF; Description: PETITION IN ERROR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUE CERTIFICATE OF APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketCode: PAY; Description: RECEIPT # 81958 ON 11/05/2021. PAYOR: MARIANNA MCKNIGHT TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 0.00. LINE ITEMS: $0.00 ON POST CONVICTION INITIAL FILING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketCode: CASE; Description: POST CONVICTION INITIAL FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketCode: DOOA; Description: DATE OF ORDER APPEALED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mcknight, Marianna