This case was last updated from Oklahoma Court of Criminal Appeals on 03/15/2022 at 03:29:24 (UTC).

STATE OF OKLAHOMA, Petitioner, v. Kenneth Randall Chandler, Respondent,

Case Summary

On 06/14/2021 STATE OF OKLAHOMA, Petitioner filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Kenneth Randall Chandler, Respondent. This case was filed in Oklahoma Court of Criminal Appeals, Oklahoma Court of Criminal Appeals located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-565

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • County, State:

    Statewide, Oklahoma

 

Party Details

Petitioner

STATE OF OKLAHOMA

Respondent

Chandler, Kenneth Randall

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Mcknight, Marianna

500 S. Denver Ave, Suite 800

Tulsa, OK 74013

Respondent Attorneys

Henson, Rob V

601 S. Boulder, Suite 600

Tulsa, OK 74119

Herron, Nicole Dawn

Assistant Public Defender, 423 S. Boulder, Ste. 300

Tulsa, OK 74103

 

Court Documents

PETITION IN ERROR

06/14/2021: PETITION IN ERROR

PETITIONER'S MOTION TO STAY AND ABATE PROCEEDINGS

06/14/2021: PETITIONER'S MOTION TO STAY AND ABATE PROCEEDINGS

PETITIONER'S BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STAY AND ABATE PROCEEDINGS

06/14/2021: PETITIONER'S BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STAY AND ABATE PROCEEDINGS

JE: KUEHN PJ, COPIES TO ATTYS, DC CLERK, HON. TRACY PRIDDY, ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS, MOTIO FOR STAY IS GRANTED. PROCEEDINGS ARE STAYED PENDING FURTHER ORDER OF THIS COURT. PETITIONER SHALL FILE A NOTICE IN THIS COURT WITHIN 10 DAYS OF THE RESOLUTIO

06/22/2021: JE: KUEHN PJ, COPIES TO ATTYS, DC CLERK, HON. TRACY PRIDDY, ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS, MOTIO FOR STAY IS GRANTED. PROCEEDINGS ARE STAYED PENDING FURTHER ORDER OF THIS COURT. PETITIONER SHALL FILE A NOTICE IN THIS COURT WITHIN 10 DAYS OF THE RESOLUTION OF BOSSE AND OR WALLACE.

LETTER FROM ROB V. HENSON RE: NOT ATTORNEY FOR RESPONDENT PLEASE REMOVE

08/05/2021: LETTER FROM ROB V. HENSON RE: NOT ATTORNEY FOR RESPONDENT PLEASE REMOVE

NOTICE OF COMPLETION OF RECORD ON APPEAL

06/21/2021: NOTICE OF COMPLETION OF RECORD ON APPEAL

RECORD ORDERED FROM DISTRICT COURT

06/21/2021: RECORD ORDERED FROM DISTRICT COURT

PETITIONER'S NOTICE W/DISTRICT COURT DOCKET SHEET ATTACHED

08/19/2021: PETITIONER'S NOTICE W/DISTRICT COURT DOCKET SHEET ATTACHED

PETITIONER'S MOTION TO MAINTAIN STAY

09/03/2021: PETITIONER'S MOTION TO MAINTAIN STAY

PETITIONER'S BRIEF IN SUPPORT MOTION TO MAINTAIN STAY

09/03/2021: PETITIONER'S BRIEF IN SUPPORT MOTION TO MAINTAIN STAY

JE: ORDER ROWLAND PJ, HUDSON VPJ, LUMPKIN J, LEWIS J, COPIES TO ATTYS, DC CLERK, HON. TRACY PRIDDY, ORDER LIFTING STAY REVERSING ORDER GRANTING POST CONVICTION RELIEF AND REMANDING FOR FURHTER PROCEEDINGS. THE CONVICTION IN THIS MATTER WAS FINAL BEFO

09/15/2021: JE: ORDER ROWLAND PJ, HUDSON VPJ, LUMPKIN J, LEWIS J, COPIES TO ATTYS, DC CLERK, HON. TRACY PRIDDY, ORDER LIFTING STAY REVERSING ORDER GRANTING POST CONVICTION RELIEF AND REMANDING FOR FURHTER PROCEEDINGS. THE CONVICTION IN THIS MATTER WAS FINAL BEFORE THE 7-9-20 DECISION IN MCGIRT AND THE USSC HOLDING IN MCGIRT DOES NOT APPLY. THE DISTRICT COURTS ORDER GRANTING RELIEF IS HEREBY REVERSED AND REMANDED FOR FURTHER PROCEEDINGS CONSISTENT WITH THIS ORDER AND OUR RULING IN MATLOFF.

MANDATE ISSUED

09/15/2021: MANDATE ISSUED

RETURN OF COURT CLERK

10/18/2021: RETURN OF COURT CLERK

RECEIPT FOR MANDATE

10/18/2021: RECEIPT FOR MANDATE

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RCMD; Description: RECEIPT FOR MANDATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RTCC; Description: RETURN OF COURT CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketCode: RRCD; Description: RECORD RETURNED TO DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: MAND; Description: MANDATE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketCode: 3013; Description: REVERSED AND REMANDED (ORDER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: OPIN; Description: JE: ORDER ROWLAND PJ, HUDSON VPJ, LUMPKIN J, LEWIS J, COPIES TO ATTYS, DC CLERK, HON. TRACY PRIDDY, ORDER LIFTING STAY REVERSING ORDER GRANTING POST CONVICTION RELIEF AND REMANDING FOR FURHTER PROCEEDINGS. THE CONVICTION IN THIS MATTER WAS FINAL BEFORE THE 7-9-20 DECISION IN MCGIRT AND THE USSC HOLDING IN MCGIRT DOES NOT APPLY. THE DISTRICT COURTS ORDER GRANTING RELIEF IS HEREBY REVERSED AND REMANDED FOR FURTHER PROCEEDINGS CONSISTENT WITH THIS ORDER AND OUR RULING IN MATLOFF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITIONER'S BRIEF IN SUPPORT MOTION TO MAINTAIN STAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITIONER'S MOTION TO MAINTAIN STAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITIONER'S NOTICE W/DISTRICT COURT DOCKET SHEET ATTACHED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LETTER FROM ROB V. HENSON RE: NOT ATTORNEY FOR RESPONDENT PLEASE REMOVE

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RODC; Description: RECORD ORDERED FROM DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NTCP; Description: NOTICE OF COMPLETION OF RECORD ON APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE'S EXHIBITS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITIONER'S BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STAY AND ABATE PROCEEDINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITIONER'S MOTION TO STAY AND ABATE PROCEEDINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PETF; Description: PETITION IN ERROR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUE CERTIFICATE OF APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketCode: PAY; Description: RECEIPT # 80647 ON 06/14/2021. PAYOR: STATE OF OKLAHOMA TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 0.00. LINE ITEMS: $0.00 ON POST CONVICTION INITIAL FILING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketCode: CASE; Description: POST CONVICTION INITIAL FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketCode: DOOA; Description: DATE OF ORDER APPEALED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mcknight, Marianna