This case was last updated from Oklahoma Court of Criminal Appeals on 07/11/2022 at 18:37:31 (UTC).

STATE OF OKLAHOMA, Petitioner, v. Hon. Tracy Priddy, Respondent,

Case Summary

On 08/20/2021 STATE OF OKLAHOMA, Petitioner filed an Other lawsuit against Hon Tracy Priddy, Respondent. This case was filed in Oklahoma Court of Criminal Appeals, Oklahoma Court of Criminal Appeals located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-874

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, Oklahoma

 

Party Details

Petitioner

STATE OF OKLAHOMA

Respondent

Priddy, Hon. Tracy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Mcknight, Marianna

500 S. Denver Ave, Suite 800

Tulsa, OK 74013

Other Attorneys

O'carroll, Richard

2171 N. Vancouver Ave.

Tulsa, OK 74127

 

Court Documents

STATES OF OKLAHOMAS PETITION FOR WRIT OF PROHIBITION

08/20/2021: STATES OF OKLAHOMAS PETITION FOR WRIT OF PROHIBITION

BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR WRIT OF PROHBITION

08/20/2021: BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR WRIT OF PROHBITION

PROSPECTIVE REAL PARTY IN INTEREST'S SPECIAL ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND MOTION TO STRIKE PETITIONER'S APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF PROHIBITION

09/01/2021: PROSPECTIVE REAL PARTY IN INTEREST'S SPECIAL ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND MOTION TO STRIKE PETITIONER'S APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF PROHIBITION

JE: ORDER ROWLAND PJ: I CONCUR IN RESULT BECAUSE DISTRICT COURT RELIEF WAS GRANTED BEFORE MATLOFF V. WALACE WAS THE LAW. HOWEVER I CONTINUE TO BELIEVE STATE JURISDICTION IS NOT PREEMPTED WHERE IT APPEARSS THE APPLICABLE FEDERAL STATUE OF LIMITS HAS E

09/03/2021: JE: ORDER ROWLAND PJ: I CONCUR IN RESULT BECAUSE DISTRICT COURT RELIEF WAS GRANTED BEFORE MATLOFF V. WALACE WAS THE LAW. HOWEVER I CONTINUE TO BELIEVE STATE JURISDICTION IS NOT PREEMPTED WHERE IT APPEARSS THE APPLICABLE FEDERAL STATUE OF LIMITS HAS EXPIRED. SEE MY DISSENT IN PERALES V. STATE NO. F-18-383 (8-12-21 NOT FOR PUB), HUDSON VPJ, LUMPKIN J, LEWIS J, ORDER DECLINING JURISDICTION. AS IT PERTAINS TO THE EXTRAORDINARY RELIEF PETITIONER IS CURRENTLY SEEKING RELIEF HAS NOT BEEN DENIED BY DISTRICT COURT

DESIGNATION OF RECORD

09/03/2021: DESIGNATION OF RECORD

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketCode: RRCD; Description: RECORD RETURNED TO DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketCode: RCCT; Description: RECORD TO COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketCode: ORGR; Description: ORIGINAL RECORD- BOUND VOLUME, 110 PAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketCode: ORGR; Description: ORIGINAL RECORD- BOUND VOLUME, 32 PAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: DSRC; Description: DESIGNATION OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: DISN; Description: JE: ORDER ROWLAND PJ: I CONCUR IN RESULT BECAUSE DISTRICT COURT RELIEF WAS GRANTED BEFORE MATLOFF V. WALACE WAS THE LAW. HOWEVER I CONTINUE TO BELIEVE STATE JURISDICTION IS NOT PREEMPTED WHERE IT APPEARSS THE APPLICABLE FEDERAL STATUE OF LIMITS HAS EXPIRED. SEE MY DISSENT IN PERALES V. STATE NO. F-18-383 (8-12-21 NOT FOR PUB), HUDSON VPJ, LUMPKIN J, LEWIS J, ORDER DECLINING JURISDICTION. AS IT PERTAINS TO THE EXTRAORDINARY RELIEF PETITIONER IS CURRENTLY SEEKING RELIEF HAS NOT BEEN DENIED BY DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PROSPECTIVE REAL PARTY IN INTEREST'S SPECIAL ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND MOTION TO STRIKE PETITIONER'S APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF PROHIBITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: BFSP; Description: BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR WRIT OF PROHBITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PETF; Description: STATES OF OKLAHOMAS PETITION FOR WRIT OF PROHIBITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketCode: PAY; Description: RECEIPT # 81255 ON 08/20/2021. PAYOR: MARIANNA MCKNIGHT TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 0.00. LINE ITEMS: $0.00 ON [WRIT OF] PROHIBITION INITIAL FILING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketCode: CASE; Description: [WRIT OF] PROHIBITION INITIAL FILING

    Read MoreRead Less