This case was last updated from Oklahoma Court of Criminal Appeals on 03/31/2022 at 07:14:54 (UTC).

STATE OF OKLAHOMA, Petitioner, v. GREGORY JOHN HAROLD BUSHYHEAD, Respondent,

Case Summary

On 07/15/2021 STATE OF OKLAHOMA, Petitioner filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against GREGORY JOHN HAROLD BUSHYHEAD, Respondent. This case was filed in Oklahoma Court of Criminal Appeals, Oklahoma Court of Criminal Appeals located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-712

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • County, State:

    Statewide, Oklahoma

 

Party Details

Petitioner

STATE OF OKLAHOMA

Respondent

BUSHYHEAD, GREGORY JOHN HAROLD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Mcknight, Marianna

500 S. Denver Ave, Suite 800

Tulsa, OK 74013

Respondent Attorney

Monroe, Stanley

15 W. 6Th St., Ste 2800

Tulsa, OK 74119

 

Court Documents

PETITION IN ERROR

07/15/2021: PETITION IN ERROR

PETITIONERS MOTION TO STAY AND ABATE PROCEEDINGS

07/15/2021: PETITIONERS MOTION TO STAY AND ABATE PROCEEDINGS

BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONERS MOTION TO STAY AND ABATE PROCEEDINGS

07/15/2021: BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONERS MOTION TO STAY AND ABATE PROCEEDINGS

JE: ORDER KUEHN PJ COPIES TO TRACY PRIDDY, DIST COURT CLERK AND ATTORNEYS ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS THE STATE'S MOTION FOR A STAY IS GRANTED. PROCEEDINGS ARE STAYED PENDING FURTHER ORDER OF THIS COURT. THE STATE SHALL FILE A NOTICE IN THIS COURT WITH

07/22/2021: JE: ORDER KUEHN PJ COPIES TO TRACY PRIDDY, DIST COURT CLERK AND ATTORNEYS ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS THE STATE'S MOTION FOR A STAY IS GRANTED. PROCEEDINGS ARE STAYED PENDING FURTHER ORDER OF THIS COURT. THE STATE SHALL FILE A NOTICE IN THIS COURT WITHIN 10 DAYS OF THE RESOLUTION OF BOSSE AND/OR WALLACE

PETITIONERS NOTICE WITH ATTACHED DISTRICT COURT & COURT OF CRIMINAL APPEALS DOCKET SHEET

08/19/2021: PETITIONERS NOTICE WITH ATTACHED DISTRICT COURT & COURT OF CRIMINAL APPEALS DOCKET SHEET

JE: ORDER ROWLAND PJ, HUDSON VPJ, LUMPKIN J, LEWIS J, COPIES TO ATTYS, DC CLERK, HON. TRACY PRIDDY, ORDER LIFTING STAY REVERSEING ORDER GRANTING POST CONVICTION RELIEF AND REMANDING FOR FURHTER PROCEEDINGS. THE CONVICTION IN THIS MATTER WAS FINAL BEF

09/15/2021: JE: ORDER ROWLAND PJ, HUDSON VPJ, LUMPKIN J, LEWIS J, COPIES TO ATTYS, DC CLERK, HON. TRACY PRIDDY, ORDER LIFTING STAY REVERSEING ORDER GRANTING POST CONVICTION RELIEF AND REMANDING FOR FURHTER PROCEEDINGS. THE CONVICTION IN THIS MATTER WAS FINAL BEFORE THE 7-9-20 DECISION IN MCGIRT AND THE USSC HOLDING IN MCGIRT DOES NOT APPLY. THE DISTRICT COURTS ORDER GRANTING RELIEF IS HEREBY REVERSED AND REMANDED FOR FURTHER PROCEEDINGS CONSISTENT WITH THIS ORDER AND OUR RULING IN MATLOFF.

MANDATE ISSUED

09/15/2021: MANDATE ISSUED

RETURN OF COURT CLERK

10/18/2021: RETURN OF COURT CLERK

RECEIPT FOR MANDATE

10/18/2021: RECEIPT FOR MANDATE

NOTICE OF COMPLETION OF RECORD ON APPEAL

07/19/2021: NOTICE OF COMPLETION OF RECORD ON APPEAL

RECORD ORDERED FROM DISTRICT COURT

07/19/2021: RECORD ORDERED FROM DISTRICT COURT

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RCMD; Description: RECEIPT FOR MANDATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RTCC; Description: RETURN OF COURT CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketCode: RRCD; Description: RECORD RETURNED TO DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: MAND; Description: MANDATE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketCode: 3013; Description: REVERSED AND REMANDED (ORDER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: OPIN; Description: JE: ORDER ROWLAND PJ, HUDSON VPJ, LUMPKIN J, LEWIS J, COPIES TO ATTYS, DC CLERK, HON. TRACY PRIDDY, ORDER LIFTING STAY REVERSEING ORDER GRANTING POST CONVICTION RELIEF AND REMANDING FOR FURHTER PROCEEDINGS. THE CONVICTION IN THIS MATTER WAS FINAL BEFORE THE 7-9-20 DECISION IN MCGIRT AND THE USSC HOLDING IN MCGIRT DOES NOT APPLY. THE DISTRICT COURTS ORDER GRANTING RELIEF IS HEREBY REVERSED AND REMANDED FOR FURTHER PROCEEDINGS CONSISTENT WITH THIS ORDER AND OUR RULING IN MATLOFF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITIONERS NOTICE WITH ATTACHED DISTRICT COURT & COURT OF CRIMINAL APPEALS DOCKET SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketCode: RCCT; Description: RECORD TO COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketCode: ORGR; Description: ORIGINAL RECORD - 90 PAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: ORDR; Description: JE: ORDER; KUEHN PJ; COPIES TO TRACY PRIDDY, DIST COURT CLERK AND ATTORNEYS; ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS; THE STATE'S MOTION FOR A STAY IS GRANTED. PROCEEDINGS ARE STAYED PENDING FURTHER ORDER OF THIS COURT. THE STATE SHALL FILE A NOTICE IN THIS COURT WITHIN 10 DAYS OF THE RESOLUTION OF BOSSE AND/OR WALLACE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RODC; Description: RECORD ORDERED FROM DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NTCP; Description: NOTICE OF COMPLETION OF RECORD ON APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONERS MOTION TO STAY AND ABATE PROCEEDINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITIONERS MOTION TO STAY AND ABATE PROCEEDINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PETF; Description: PETITION IN ERROR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUED CERTIFCATE OF APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketCode: PAY; Description: RECEIPT # 80942 ON 07/15/2021. PAYOR: STATE OF OKLAHOMA TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 0.00. LINE ITEMS: $0.00 ON POST CONVICTION INITIAL FILING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketCode: CASE; Description: POST CONVICTION INITIAL FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketCode: DOOA; Description: DATE OF ORDER APPEALED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mcknight, Marianna