This case was last updated from Oklahoma Court of Criminal Appeals on 06/15/2022 at 05:11:26 (UTC).

STATE OF OKLAHOMA, Appellant, v. SHAY COLE FARMER, Appellee,

Case Summary

On 10/19/2021 STATE OF OKLAHOMA, Appellant filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against SHAY COLE FARMER, Appellee. This case was filed in Oklahoma Court of Criminal Appeals, Oklahoma Court of Criminal Appeals located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1126

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, Oklahoma

 

Party Details

Appellant

STATE OF OKLAHOMA

Appellee

FARMER, SHAY COLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Mcknight, Marianna

500 S. Denver Ave, Suite 800

Tulsa, OK 74013

Appellee Attorney

Lee, Stephen

115 West 3Rd St., Suite 406

Tulsa, OK 74103

Other Attorneys

Keller, Kevin John

500 S. Denver, Suite 900

Tulsa, OK 74103

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAL

10/19/2021: NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAL

JE: ORDER ROWLAND PJ, COPIES TO ATTYS, DC CLERK, HON. CLIFFORD J. SMITH, NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO ACCEERLATED DOCKET AND ORDER SCHEDULING FILING DEADLINES AND ORAL ARGUMENT. 1-3-22 DUE DATE FOR OF FILING BY COURT REPORTERS OF ALL DESIGNATED TRANSCRIOT

10/25/2021: JE: ORDER ROWLAND PJ, COPIES TO ATTYS, DC CLERK, HON. CLIFFORD J. SMITH, NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO ACCEERLATED DOCKET AND ORDER SCHEDULING FILING DEADLINES AND ORAL ARGUMENT. 1-3-22 DUE DATE FOR OF FILING BY COURT REPORTERS OF ALL DESIGNATED TRANSCRIOTS & EXHIBITS DUE DATE FOR NOTICE OF COMPLETION. 1-3-22 DUE DATE FOR FILING PETITION IN ERROR, APPELLANTS BRIEF (APPLICATION FOR ACCEERLATED DOCKET). THE DUE DATE FOR FILING APPELLEES BRIEF(RESPONSE TO APPLICATION FOR ACCELERATED DOCKET) IS 60 DAYS FROM THE DATE THE APPELLANTS BRIEF IS FILED. WITHOUT RECEIVING PRIOR APPROVAL OF THE COURT THE REPLY BRIEF ARE NOT AUTHORIZED IN ACCELERATED APPEALS. ORAL ARGUMENT IS SCHEDULED FOR 10 AM ON THURSDAY 6-2-22 IN THE COURTROOM OF COURT OF CRIMINAL APPEAL

NOTICE OF FILING- TAISHA IRONS, CSR

10/25/2021: NOTICE OF FILING- TAISHA IRONS, CSR

PETITION IN ERROR

12/15/2021: PETITION IN ERROR

NOTICE OF COMPLETION OF RECORD ON APPEAL

01/10/2022: NOTICE OF COMPLETION OF RECORD ON APPEAL

RECORD ORDERED FROM DISTRICT COURT

01/10/2022: RECORD ORDERED FROM DISTRICT COURT

BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF APPELLANTS STATE APPEAL

03/01/2022: BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF APPELLANTS STATE APPEAL

JE: ORDER ROWLAND PJ COPIES TO HON. CLIFFORD J. SMITH, DIST COURT CLERK AND ATTORNEYS ORDER STRIKING BRIEF OF APPELLANT, DIRECTING APPELLANT TO FILE BRIEF IN PROPER ACCELERATED DOCKET FORMAT, SETTING NEW FILING DEADLINES, AND RESCHEDULING ORAL ARGUME

04/04/2022: JE: ORDER ROWLAND PJ COPIES TO HON. CLIFFORD J. SMITH, DIST COURT CLERK AND ATTORNEYS ORDER STRIKING BRIEF OF APPELLANT, DIRECTING APPELLANT TO FILE BRIEF IN PROPER ACCELERATED DOCKET FORMAT, SETTING NEW FILING DEADLINES, AND RESCHEDULING ORAL ARGUMENT AS THE BRIEF THE STATE FILED ON 03/01/2022, DOES NOT CONFORM WITH THESE RULES OR WITH THE COURT'S DIRECTIVE OF 10/25/2021, AND AS THE STATE HAS NEITHER SOUGHT NOR BEEN GRANTED LEAVE TO FILE A STANDARD BRIEF UNDER THE PROCEDURES PROVIDED AT RULE 11.5(A)(3)(1), THE COURT FINDS THE STATE'S BRIEF SHOULD BE STRICKEN AND THE STATE DIRECTED TO FILE A PROPER BRIEF IN ACCELERATED DOCKET FORMAT. IT IS THEREFORE THE ORDER OF THIS COURT THAT THE STATE IS HEREBY DIRECTED TO FILE A PROPER BRIEF IN ACCELERATED DOCKET FORMAT (FORM 13.14, APPL. FOR ACCEL. DOCKET-FAST TRACK) ON OR BEFORE 04/13/2022. FAILURE TO FILE THIS BRIEF/APPLICATION FOR ACCELERATED DOCKET AS DIRECTED MAY RESULT IN DISMISSAL OF THIS APPEAL. APLEE'S RESPONSE BRIEF IS DUE 60 DAYS FROM THE DATE APLNTS BRIEF IS FILED. FURTHER, ORAL ARGUMENT SCHEDULED FOR 06/02/2022 AT 10:00 AM, IS RESCHEDULED FOR THURSDAY, 07/07/2022 AT 11:00 AM.

APLNTS MOTION TO DISMISS APPEAL

04/13/2022: APLNTS MOTION TO DISMISS APPEAL

APLNTS AFFIDAVIT

04/13/2022: APLNTS AFFIDAVIT

JE: ORDER ROWLAND PJ COPIES TO HON. CLIFFORD J. SMITH, DIST COURT CLERK AND ATTORENYS ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS APPEAL IT IS THEREFORE THE ORDER OF THIS COURT THAT APLNTS MOTION TO DISMISS APPEAL IS DENIED. APLNTS BRIEF MUST BE FILED ON OR BEFO

04/19/2022: JE: ORDER ROWLAND PJ COPIES TO HON. CLIFFORD J. SMITH, DIST COURT CLERK AND ATTORENYS ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS APPEAL IT IS THEREFORE THE ORDER OF THIS COURT THAT APLNTS MOTION TO DISMISS APPEAL IS DENIED. APLNTS BRIEF MUST BE FILED ON OR BEFORE 04/25/2022. FAILURE TO FILE THIS BRIEF/APPLICATION FOR ACCELERATED DOCKET AS DIRECTED MAY RESULT IN DISMISSAL OF THIS APPEAL. APLEE'S RESPONSE BRIEF IS DUE 60 DAYS FROM THE DATE APLNTS BRIEF IS FILED. THE ORAL ARGUMENT PREVIOUSLY SET FOR 07/07/2022, AT 11:00 AM SHALL PROCEED AS SCHEDULED.

JE: ORDER ROWLAND PJ, HUDSON VPJ, LUMPKIN J, LEWIS J, MUSSEMAN J, COPIE TO TTYS, DC CLERK, HON. CLIFFORD SMITH, ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL AND STIKING ORAL ARGUMENT. THIS COURT DENIED APPELLANTS MOTION TO DISMISS THE APPAL AND DIRECTED APPELLANT TO FILE

05/18/2022: JE: ORDER ROWLAND PJ, HUDSON VPJ, LUMPKIN J, LEWIS J, MUSSEMAN J, COPIE TO TTYS, DC CLERK, HON. CLIFFORD SMITH, ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL AND STIKING ORAL ARGUMENT. THIS COURT DENIED APPELLANTS MOTION TO DISMISS THE APPAL AND DIRECTED APPELLANT TO FILE A BRIEF/APPLICATION FOR ACCELERATED DOCKET ON OR BEFORE 4-25-22. NO SUCH BRIEF WAS FILED. WE CONSIDER APPEAL ABANDONED AND IT IS HEREBT DISMISSED. ORAL ARUGMENT SCHEDULED FOR 7-7-22 IS LICKWISE STRICKEN.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: DISN; Description: JE: ORDER ROWLAND PJ, HUDSON VPJ, LUMPKIN J, LEWIS J, MUSSEMAN J, COPIES TO ATTYS, DC CLERK, HON. CLIFFORD SMITH, ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL AND STIKING ORAL ARGUMENT. THIS COURT DENIED APPELLANTS MOTION TO DISMISS THE APPEAL AND DIRECTED APPELLANT TO FILE A BRIEF/APPLICATION FOR ACCELERATED DOCKET ON OR BEFORE 4-25-22. NO SUCH BRIEF WAS FILED. WE CONSIDER APPEAL ABANDONED AND IT IS HEREBT DISMISSED. ORAL ARUGMENT SCHEDULED FOR 7-7-22 IS LICKWISE STRICKEN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: ORDR; Description: JE: ORDER; ROWLAND PJ; COPIES TO HON. CLIFFORD J. SMITH, DIST COURT CLERK AND ATTORENYS; ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS APPEAL; IT IS THEREFORE THE ORDER OF THIS COURT THAT APLNTS MOTION TO DISMISS APPEAL IS DENIED. APLNTS BRIEF MUST BE FILED ON OR BEFORE 04/25/2022. FAILURE TO FILE THIS BRIEF/APPLICATION FOR ACCELERATED DOCKET AS DIRECTED MAY RESULT IN DISMISSAL OF THIS APPEAL. APLEE'S RESPONSE BRIEF IS DUE 60 DAYS FROM THE DATE APLNTS BRIEF IS FILED. THE ORAL ARGUMENT PREVIOUSLY SET FOR 07/07/2022, AT 11:00 AM SHALL PROCEED AS SCHEDULED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: APLNTS AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: APLNTS MOTION TO DISMISS APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: ORDR; Description: JE: ORDER; ROWLAND PJ; COPIES TO HON. CLIFFORD J. SMITH, DIST COURT CLERK AND ATTORNEYS; ORDER STRIKING BRIEF OF APPELLANT, DIRECTING APPELLANT TO FILE BRIEF IN PROPER ACCELERATED DOCKET FORMAT, SETTING NEW FILING DEADLINES, AND RESCHEDULING ORAL ARGUMENT; AS THE BRIEF THE STATE FILED ON 03/01/2022, DOES NOT CONFORM WITH THESE RULES OR WITH THE COURT'S DIRECTIVE OF 10/25/2021, AND AS THE STATE HAS NEITHER SOUGHT NOR BEEN GRANTED LEAVE TO FILE A STANDARD BRIEF UNDER THE PROCEDURES PROVIDED AT RULE 11.5(A)(3)(1), THE COURT FINDS THE STATE'S BRIEF SHOULD BE STRICKEN AND THE STATE DIRECTED TO FILE A PROPER BRIEF IN ACCELERATED DOCKET FORMAT. IT IS THEREFORE THE ORDER OF THIS COURT THAT THE STATE IS HEREBY DIRECTED TO FILE A PROPER BRIEF IN ACCELERATED DOCKET FORMAT (FORM 13.14, APPL. FOR ACCEL. DOCKET-FAST TRACK) ON OR BEFORE 04/13/2022. FAILURE TO FILE THIS BRIEF/APPLICATION FOR ACCELERATED DOCKET AS DIRECTED MAY RESULT IN DISMISSAL OF THIS APPEAL. APLEE'S RESPONSE BRIEF IS DUE 60 DAYS FROM THE DATE APLNTS BRIEF IS FILED. FURTHER, ORAL ARGUMENT SCHEDULED FOR 06/02/2022 AT 10:00 AM, IS RESCHEDULED FOR THURSDAY, 07/07/2022 AT 11:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketCode: RCCT; Description: RECORD TO COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF APPELLANTS STATE APPEAL ** STRICKEN PER THE ORDER 04/04/2022 ** ** CODE CHANGED **

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TRAN; Description: TRANSCRIPT - 10/5/21 - 12 PAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TRAN; Description: TRANSCRIPT - 9/8/21 - 7 PAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: ORGR; Description: ORIGINAL RECORD - 104 PAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NTCP; Description: NOTICE OF COMPLETION OF RECORD ON APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PETF; Description: PETITION IN ERROR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: NOTICE OF FILING- TAISHA IRONS, CSR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: ORAG; Description: JE: ORDER ROWLAND PJ, COPIES TO ATTYS, DC CLERK, HON. CLIFFORD J. SMITH, NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO ACCEERLATED DOCKET AND ORDER SCHEDULING FILING DEADLINES AND ORAL ARGUMENT. 1-3-22 DUE DATE FOR OF FILING BY COURT REPORTERS OF ALL DESIGNATED TRANSCRIOTS & EXHIBITS DUE DATE FOR NOTICE OF COMPLETION. 1-3-22 DUE DATE FOR FILING PETITION IN ERROR, APPELLANTS BRIEF (APPLICATION FOR ACCEERLATED DOCKET). THE DUE DATE FOR FILING APPELLEES BRIEF(RESPONSE TO APPLICATION FOR ACCELERATED DOCKET) IS 60 DAYS FROM THE DATE THE APPELLANTS BRIEF IS FILED. WITHOUT RECEIVING PRIOR APPROVAL OF THE COURT THE REPLY BRIEF ARE NOT AUTHORIZED IN ACCELERATED APPEALS. ORAL ARGUMENT IS SCHEDULED FOR 10 AM ON THURSDAY 6-2-22 IN THE COURTROOM OF COURT OF CRIMINAL APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: DSRC; Description: DESIGNATION OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NTIA; Description: NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUE CERTIFICATE OF APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketCode: PAY; Description: RECEIPT # 81762 ON 10/19/2021. PAYOR: MARIANNA MCKNIGHT TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 0.00. LINE ITEMS: $0.00 ON STATE APPEALS INITIAL FILING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketCode: CASE; Description: STATE APPEALS INITIAL FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketCode: DOOA; Description: DATE OF ORDER APPEALED

    Read MoreRead Less