This case was last updated from Oklahoma Court of Criminal Appeals on 05/19/2022 at 15:53:24 (UTC).

Shelton Keyyan Adkins, Petitioner, v. STATE OF OKLAHOMA, Respondent,

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 Shelton Keyyan Adkins, Petitioner filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against STATE OF OKLAHOMA, Respondent. This case was filed in Oklahoma Court of Criminal Appeals, Oklahoma Court of Criminal Appeals located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2-79

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • County, State:

    Statewide, Oklahoma

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Adkins, Shelton Keyyan

Lawton, OK 73501

Respondent

STATE OF OKLAHOMA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Adkins, Shelton Keyyan

#693461, 8607 Se Flower Mound Rd

Lawton, OK 73501

Respondent Attorney

Oklahoma County District Attorney

505 County Office Bldg., 320 Robert S. Kerr Ave.

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

 

Court Documents

RESPONSE TO DENIAL OF POST-CONVICTION APPEAL OUT OF TIME PETITION IN ERROR/BRIEF IN SUPPORT

01/21/2022: RESPONSE TO DENIAL OF POST-CONVICTION APPEAL OUT OF TIME PETITION IN ERROR/BRIEF IN SUPPORT

POST CONVICTIONNOTICE OF COMPLETION OF RECORD ON APPEAL

01/27/2022: POST CONVICTIONNOTICE OF COMPLETION OF RECORD ON APPEAL

RECORD ORDERED FROM DISTRICT COURT

01/27/2022: RECORD ORDERED FROM DISTRICT COURT

JE: ORDER ROWLAND PJ, HUDSON VPJ, LUMPKIN J, LEWIS J, MUSSEMAN J, COPIES TO ATTYS, DC CLERK, HON. CINDY H. TRUONG, ORDER AFFIRMING DENIAL OF APPLICATION FOR POST CONVICTION RELIEF AND APPEAL OUT OF TIME. PETITIONER HAS FAILED TO ESTABLISH ENTITLEMENT

04/13/2022: JE: ORDER ROWLAND PJ, HUDSON VPJ, LUMPKIN J, LEWIS J, MUSSEMAN J, COPIES TO ATTYS, DC CLERK, HON. CINDY H. TRUONG, ORDER AFFIRMING DENIAL OF APPLICATION FOR POST CONVICTION RELIEF AND APPEAL OUT OF TIME. PETITIONER HAS FAILED TO ESTABLISH ENTITLEMENT TO ANY RELKIEF IN THIS POST CONVICTION PROCEEDING. PETITIONERS POST CONVICTION APPEAL. FOR AN APPEAL IS DENIED.

MANDATE ISSUED

04/13/2022: MANDATE ISSUED

RETURN OF COURT CLERK

04/15/2022: RETURN OF COURT CLERK

RECEIPT FOR MANDATE

04/15/2022: RECEIPT FOR MANDATE

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketCode: RRCD; Description: RECORD RETURNED TO DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RCMD; Description: RECEIPT FOR MANDATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RTCC; Description: RETURN OF COURT CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: MAND; Description: MANDATE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketCode: 1003; Description: AFFIRMED AND DENIED (ORDER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: OPIN; Description: JE: ORDER ROWLAND PJ, HUDSON VPJ, LUMPKIN J, LEWIS J, MUSSEMAN J, COPIES TO ATTYS, DC CLERK, HON. CINDY H. TRUONG, ORDER AFFIRMING DENIAL OF APPLICATION FOR POST CONVICTION RELIEF AND APPEAL OUT OF TIME. PETITIONER HAS FAILED TO ESTABLISH ENTITLEMENT TO ANY RELKIEF IN THIS POST CONVICTION PROCEEDING. PETITIONERS POST CONVICTION APPEAL. FOR AN APPEAL IS DENIED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketCode: RCCT; Description: RECORD TO COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketCode: ORGR; Description: ORIGINAL RECORD - 64 PAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RODC; Description: RECORD ORDERED FROM DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NTCP; Description: POST CONVICTIONNOTICE OF COMPLETION OF RECORD ON APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PETF; Description: RESPONSE TO DENIAL OF POST-CONVICTION APPEAL OUT OF TIME PETITION IN ERROR/BRIEF IN SUPPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUE CERTIFICATE OF APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: PAY; Description: RECEIPT # 82637 ON 01/21/2022. PAYOR: SHELTON KEYYAN ADKINS TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 0.00. LINE ITEMS: $0.00 ON POST CONVICTION INITIAL FILING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: PAUP; Description: PAUPER AFFIDAVIT FOR ADKINS, SHELTON KEYYAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: CASE; Description: POST CONVICTION INITIAL FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketCode: DOOA; Description: DATE OF ORDER APPEALED

    Read MoreRead Less