This case was last updated from Oklahoma Court of Criminal Appeals on 04/30/2022 at 04:43:38 (UTC).

Robert Joe Strange, Petitioner, v. STATE OF OKLAHOMA, Respondent,

Case Summary

On 05/26/2021 Robert Joe Strange, Petitioner filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against STATE OF OKLAHOMA, Respondent. This case was filed in Oklahoma Court of Criminal Appeals, Oklahoma Court of Criminal Appeals located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-487

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • County, State:

    Statewide, Oklahoma

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Strange, Robert Joe

Helena, OK 73741

Respondent

STATE OF OKLAHOMA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Strange, Robert Joe

580251, 216 N. Murray St.

Helena, OK 73741

Respondent Attorney

Caddo County District Attorney

110 Sw 2Nd St., Ste. 108

Anadarko, OK 73005

 

Court Documents

PETITION IN ERROR

05/26/2021: PETITION IN ERROR

RECORD ORDERED FROM DISTRICT COURT

06/10/2021: RECORD ORDERED FROM DISTRICT COURT

PETITIONERS MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION FILED IN THE DISTRICT COURT WITH ATTACHMENTS

06/28/2021: PETITIONERS MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION FILED IN THE DISTRICT COURT WITH ATTACHMENTS

US DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE PROCESS RECEIPT & RETURN WITH ATTACHED PAUPER AFFIDAVIT AND "INDIAN STATUS" WITH ATTACHEMENTS

08/02/2021: US DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE PROCESS RECEIPT & RETURN WITH ATTACHED PAUPER AFFIDAVIT AND "INDIAN STATUS" WITH ATTACHEMENTS

NOTICE OF COMPLETION OF RECORD ON APPEAL

06/10/2021: NOTICE OF COMPLETION OF RECORD ON APPEAL

JE: ORDER ROWLAND PJ, HUDSON VPJ, LUMPKIN J, LEWIS J, COPIES TO ATTYS, DC CLERK, HON. DAVID A STEPHENS, ORDER AFFIRMING DENIAL OF POST CONVICTION RELIEF. THE CONVICTION IN THIS MATTER WERE FINAL BEFORE 7-9-20 DECISION IN MCGIRT AND THE USSC HOLDINGS

10/05/2021: JE: ORDER ROWLAND PJ, HUDSON VPJ, LUMPKIN J, LEWIS J, COPIES TO ATTYS, DC CLERK, HON. DAVID A STEPHENS, ORDER AFFIRMING DENIAL OF POST CONVICTION RELIEF. THE CONVICTION IN THIS MATTER WERE FINAL BEFORE 7-9-20 DECISION IN MCGIRT AND THE USSC HOLDINGS IN MCGIRT DOES NOT APPLY.

MANDATE ISSUED

10/05/2021: MANDATE ISSUED

RETURN OF COURT CLERK

10/12/2021: RETURN OF COURT CLERK

RECEIPT FOR MANDATE

10/12/2021: RECEIPT FOR MANDATE

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketCode: RRCD; Description: RECORD RETURNED TO DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RCMD; Description: RECEIPT FOR MANDATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RTCC; Description: RETURN OF COURT CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: MAND; Description: MANDATE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketCode: 1003; Description: AFFIRMED (ORDER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: OPIN; Description: JE: ORDER ROWLAND PJ, HUDSON VPJ, LUMPKIN J, LEWIS J, COPIES TO ATTYS, DC CLERK, HON. DAVID A STEPHENS, ORDER AFFIRMING DENIAL OF POST CONVICTION RELIEF. THE CONVICTION IN THIS MATTER WERE FINAL BEFORE 7-9-20 DECISION IN MCGIRT AND THE USSC HOLDINGS IN MCGIRT DOES NOT APPLY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: US DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE PROCESS RECEIPT & RETURN WITH ATTACHED PAUPER AFFIDAVIT AND "INDIAN STATUS" WITH ATTACHEMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITIONERS MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION FILED IN THE DISTRICT COURT WITH ATTACHMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketCode: RCCT; Description: RECORD TO COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketCode: ORGR; Description: ORIGINAL RECORD - 24 PAGES (COPY TO AG)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RODC; Description: RECORD ORDERED FROM DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NTCP; Description: NOTICE OF COMPLETION OF RECORD ON APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PETF; Description: PETITION IN ERROR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUE CERTIFICATE OF APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketCode: PAY; Description: RECEIPT # 80508 ON 05/26/2021. PAYOR: ROBERT JOE STRANGE TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 0.00. LINE ITEMS: $0.00 ON POST CONVICTION INITIAL FILING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketCode: PAUP; Description: PAUPER AFFIDAVIT FOR STRANGE, ROBERT JOE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketCode: CASE; Description: POST CONVICTION INITIAL FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCode: DOOA; Description: DATE OF ORDER APPEALED

    Read MoreRead Less