This case was last updated from Oklahoma Court of Civil Appeals on 05/13/2022 at 01:13:28 (UTC).

Red Hills Wind Project, LLC, Plaintiff/Appellant, vs. Sarah Batterton, Roger Mills County Assessor, Defendant/Appellee.

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 Red Hills Wind Project, LLC, Plaintiff/Appellant filed a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit against Sarah Batterton, Roger Mills County Assessor, Defendant/Appellee. This case was filed in Oklahoma Court of Civil Appeals, Oklahoma Court of Civil Appeals - Tulsa located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0166

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Statewide, Oklahoma

 

Party Details

Appellant

RED HILLS WIND PROJECT, LLC

Appellee

Batterton, Sarah

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Hoge, Arthur F.

1900 Nw Expressway, Suite 1400

Oklahoma City, OK 73118

Appellee Attorneys

HARTWIG, W JASON

Attorney at TISDAL & O'HARA

13808 Wireless Way

Oklahoma City, OK 73134

TISDAL, MART

Attorney at TISDAL & O'HARA, PLLC

814 Frisco Avenue, Po Box 1387

Clinton, OK 73601

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketCode: CCAT; Description: ASSIGNED TO COURT OF CIVIL APPEALS, TULSA; N/ATTYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketCode: TRAN; Description: TRANSCRIPT DEC. 23, 2021 - 28 PAGES (SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD ON ACCELERATED APPEALS) (FILED TH/DATE IN COMP. APPEAL SD-120165)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: MAIL DATED 1-26-22 TO JASON HARTWIG RETURNED THIS DATE (RETURN TO SENDER-NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED-UNABLE TO FORWARD) REMAILED THIS DATE TO ADDRESS ON HARTWIG'S ENTRY OF APPEARANCE THAT CAME IN AFTER THIS MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketCode: RESP; Description: RESPONSE TO PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE BY MART TISDAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE BY W. JASON HARTWIG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketCode: COMP; Description: JE: TH/CASES (120165, 120166) ARE H/BY MADE COMP CASES. CASES W/CONTAIN SEP RECORDS AND W/BE BRIEFED SEP (BRIEFING IN TH/SUMMARY DISPO APPEALS IS ONLY IF ALLOWED BY CT), BUT WH/AT ISSUE, CASES SH/BE ASSIGNED TO SAME REVIEWING CT FOR DISPO. N/ATTYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JE: APLNT'S REQ FOR EXT OF TIME TO FILE TRANSCRIPT GRANTED DUE TO CIRCUMSTANCES BEYOND APLNT'S CONTROL. APLNT SH/FILE TRANSCRIPT NLT 2-28-22. N/ATTYS DC JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: APLNT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE TRANSCRIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TREC; Description: APPELLANT'S RECORD-SUMMARY DISPOSITION O+4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE BY ARTHUR F. HOGE, III

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: PETF; Description: PETITION IN ERROR FILED BY HOGE FOR RED HILLS WIND PROJECT-PLNTF/APLNT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: PAY; Description: RECEIPT # 82645 ON 01/21/2022. PAYOR: ARTHUR F HOGE III TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 200.00. LINE ITEMS: $200.00 ON SUMMARY DISPOSITION INITIAL FILING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: CASE; Description: SUMMARY DISPOSITION INITIAL FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketCode: DOOA; Description: DATE OF ORDER APPEALED

    Read MoreRead Less