This case was last updated from Oklahoma Court of Criminal Appeals on 04/24/2022 at 04:42:36 (UTC).

RAYMOND ANTHONY FIFER, Petitioner, v. STATE OF OKLAHOMA, Respondent,

Case Summary

On 12/14/2020 RAYMOND ANTHONY FIFER, Petitioner filed an Other lawsuit against STATE OF OKLAHOMA, Respondent. This case was filed in Oklahoma Court of Criminal Appeals, Oklahoma Court of Criminal Appeals located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******-923

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, Oklahoma

 

Party Details

Appellant and Petitioner

FIFER, RAYMOND ANTHONY

Appellee and Respondent

STATE OF OKLAHOMA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Petitioner Attorneys

Blumert, Bonnie Jean

320 Robert S. Kerr Suite 400

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Holden, Amanda Nannette

Assistant Public Defender, 320 Robert S. Kerr Suite 400

Okahoma City, OK 73102

Appellee and Respondent Attorneys

Oklahoma County District Attorney

505 County Office Bldg., 320 Robert S. Kerr Ave.

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Attorney General Of Oklahoma

Other Attorneys

Dunn, Emily Joyce

Assistant Public Defender, 320 Robert S. Kerr Ste 400

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAL

12/14/2020: NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAL

APLNTS NOTICE OF CHANGE OF COUNSEL-AMANDA N. HOLDEN

03/02/2021: APLNTS NOTICE OF CHANGE OF COUNSEL-AMANDA N. HOLDEN

PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERIOTIORARI

03/02/2021: PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERIOTIORARI

APLNTS NOTICE FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO BRIEF

05/03/2021: APLNTS NOTICE FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO BRIEF

NOTICE OF COMPLETION OF RECORD ON APPEAL

03/05/2021: NOTICE OF COMPLETION OF RECORD ON APPEAL

RECORD ORDERED FROM DISTRICT COURT

03/05/2021: RECORD ORDERED FROM DISTRICT COURT

BRIEF FOR AND ON BEHALF OF PETITIONER

06/03/2021: BRIEF FOR AND ON BEHALF OF PETITIONER

PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO BRIEF

04/05/2021: PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO BRIEF

JE: SUMMARY OPINION DENYING CERTIORARI ~~~~~ WRIT DENIED, JUDGMENT AFFIRMED ~~~~~ LUMPKIN J CONCUR: ROWLAND PJ, HUDSON VPJ CONCUR IN RESULTS: LEWIS J COPIES TO AG, HON. KATHRYN R. SAVAGE, DIST COURT CLERK, OPD, DA OKC, PRESS, TPD, OIDS, NOT FOR PUB

08/19/2021: JE: SUMMARY OPINION DENYING CERTIORARI ~~~~~ WRIT DENIED, JUDGMENT AFFIRMED ~~~~~ LUMPKIN J CONCUR: ROWLAND PJ, HUDSON VPJ CONCUR IN RESULTS: LEWIS J COPIES TO AG, HON. KATHRYN R. SAVAGE, DIST COURT CLERK, OPD, DA OKC, PRESS, TPD, OIDS, NOT FOR PUB

MANDATE ISSUED

08/19/2021: MANDATE ISSUED

RETURN OF COURT CLERK

08/23/2021: RETURN OF COURT CLERK

RECEIPT FOR MANDATE

08/23/2021: RECEIPT FOR MANDATE

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketCode: RRCD; Description: RECORD RETURNED TO DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RCMD; Description: RECEIPT FOR MANDATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RTCC; Description: RETURN OF COURT CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: MAND; Description: MANDATE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketCode: 1007; Description: AFFIRMED (SUMMARY OPINION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: OPIN; Description: JE: SUMMARY OPINION DENYING CERTIORARI ~~~~~ WRIT DENIED, JUDGMENT AFFIRMED ~~~~~ LUMPKIN J; CONCUR: ROWLAND PJ, HUDSON VPJ; CONCUR IN RESULTS: LEWIS J; COPIES TO AG, HON. KATHRYN R. SAVAGE, DIST COURT CLERK, OPD, DA OKC, PRESS, TPD, OIDS, NOT FOR PUB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketCode: RCCT; Description: RECORD TO COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketCode: CSTC; Description: CAUSE SUBMITTED TO COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: ATBC; Description: BRIEF FOR AND ON BEHALF OF PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketCode: XATBC; Description: JE: ORDER KUEHN PJ, COPIES TO ATTYS, ORDER GRANTING SECOND AND FINAL EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE BRIEF DUE 6-3-21

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RODC; Description: RECORD ORDERED FROM DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NTCP; Description: NOTICE OF COMPLETION OF RECORD ON APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PETF; Description: PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERIOTIORARI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: APLNTS NOTICE OF CHANGE OF COUNSEL-AMANDA N. HOLDEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: DSRC; Description: DESIGNATION OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NTIA; Description: NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUED CERTIFICATE OF APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketCode: PAY; Description: RECEIPT # 79368 ON 12/14/2020. PAYOR: BONNIE JEAN BLUMERT TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 0.00. LINE ITEMS: $0.00 ON CERTIORARI INITIAL FILING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketCode: CASE; Description: CERTIORARI INITIAL FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketCode: DOOA; Description: DATE OF ORDER APPEALED

    Read MoreRead Less