This case was last updated from Oklahoma Supreme Court on 06/28/2022 at 11:41:24 (UTC).

Paccar Inc. dba Peterbilt Motors Company, Petitioner, vs. Honorable Mark R. Campbell, District Judge of Bryan County, Respondent, and Jeffery Brown and Nicki Brown, Individually and as Husband and Wife, Real Parties in Interest.

Case Summary

On 04/12/2022 Paccar Inc dba Peterbilt Motors Company, Petitioner filed an Other lawsuit against Honorable Mark R Campbell, District Judge of Bryan County, Respondent, and Jeffery Brown and Nicki Brown, Individually and as Husband and Wife, Real Parties in Interest. This case was filed in Oklahoma Supreme Court, Oklahoma Supreme Court located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0325

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, Oklahoma

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Paccar Inc

Respondent

Campbell, Hon Mark R

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Thomas, Drew M

8750 North Central Expressway, Suite 1600

Dallas, TX 75231

Cook, Rodney L.

324 N. Robinson Ave. Suite 100

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

ELLIS, HARVEY D

Attorney at Crowe & Dunlevy

324 N Robinson Ave, Suite 100

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Estes, David H

8750 North Central Expressway, Suite 1600

Dallas, TX 75231

Kiefner, Lauren Elizabeth

324 N. Robinson Ave., Suite 100

Okc, OK 73102

Other Attorneys

Gallagher, Scott

One West Main St.

Ardmore, OK 73401

Tracy, E Todd

The Tracy Firm, 4701 Bengal Street

Dallas, TX 75235

Little, Dan

One West Main

Ardmore, OK 73401

OLIVER, STEVE

One West Main

Ardmore, OK 73401

 

Court Documents

PETR'S APPLICATION TO ASSUME ORIGINAL JURISDICTION AND PETITION FOR WRIT OF PROHIBITION AND/OR MANDAMUS FILED BY ELLIS FOR PACCAR-PETR

04/12/2022: PETR'S APPLICATION TO ASSUME ORIGINAL JURISDICTION AND PETITION FOR WRIT OF PROHIBITION AND/OR MANDAMUS FILED BY ELLIS FOR PACCAR-PETR

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE BY HARVEY D. ELLIS

04/12/2022: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE BY HARVEY D. ELLIS

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE BY RODNEY L. COOK

04/12/2022: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE BY RODNEY L. COOK

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE BY LAUREN E. KIEFNER

04/12/2022: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE BY LAUREN E. KIEFNER

PETR'S MOTION TO ASSOCIATE COUNSEL-DREW M. THOMAS

04/12/2022: PETR'S MOTION TO ASSOCIATE COUNSEL-DREW M. THOMAS

PETR'S MOTION TO ASSOCIATE COUNSEL-DAVID H. ESTES

04/12/2022: PETR'S MOTION TO ASSOCIATE COUNSEL-DAVID H. ESTES

BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PETR'S APPLICATION

04/12/2022: BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PETR'S APPLICATION

NOTICE OF ORIGINAL JURISDICTION SUPREME COURT PROCEEDING

04/12/2022: NOTICE OF ORIGINAL JURISDICTION SUPREME COURT PROCEEDING

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE BY DAVID H. ESTES

04/21/2022: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE BY DAVID H. ESTES

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE BY DREW M. THOMAS

04/21/2022: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE BY DREW M. THOMAS

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE BY DAN LITTLE

05/02/2022: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE BY DAN LITTLE

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE BY SCOTT GALLAGHER

05/02/2022: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE BY SCOTT GALLAGHER

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE BY STEVE OLIVER

05/02/2022: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE BY STEVE OLIVER

REAL PARTIES IN INTEREST'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PETR'S APPLICATION TO ASSUME ORIGINAL JURISDICTION

05/02/2022: REAL PARTIES IN INTEREST'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PETR'S APPLICATION TO ASSUME ORIGINAL JURISDICTION

JE: APPL TO ASSUME ORIG JURIS DENIED. CONCUR: DARBY, CJ., WINCHESTER, EDMONDSON, GURICH, KUEHN, JJ. DISSENT: KAUGER, COMBS, ROWE, JJ. NOT PART: KANE, VCJ. N/ATTYS DC JUDGE

05/23/2022: JE: APPL TO ASSUME ORIG JURIS DENIED. CONCUR: DARBY, CJ., WINCHESTER, EDMONDSON, GURICH, KUEHN, JJ. DISSENT: KAUGER, COMBS, ROWE, JJ. NOT PART: KANE, VCJ. N/ATTYS DC JUDGE

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: DISN; Description: JE: APPL TO ASSUME ORIG JURIS DENIED. CONCUR: DARBY, CJ., WINCHESTER, EDMONDSON, GURICH, KUEHN, JJ. DISSENT: KAUGER, COMBS, ROWE, JJ. NOT PART: KANE, VCJ. N/ATTYS DC JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • HearingEvent: Oral Presentation Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketCode: OPHLD; Description: ORAL PRESENTATION HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RESP; Description: REAL PARTIES IN INTEREST'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PETR'S APPLICATION TO ASSUME ORIGINAL JURISDICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE BY STEVE OLIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE BY SCOTT GALLAGHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE BY DAN LITTLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE BY DREW M. THOMAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE BY DAVID H. ESTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketCode: ORAP; Description: ORAL PRESENTATION SCHEDULED FOR 05/12/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: APPENDIX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: ATBC; Description: BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PETR'S APPLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETR'S MOTION TO ASSOCIATE COUNSEL-DAVID H. ESTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETR'S MOTION TO ASSOCIATE COUNSEL-DREW M. THOMAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE BY LAUREN E. KIEFNER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE BY RODNEY L. COOK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE BY HARVEY D. ELLIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: AAJP; Description: PETR'S APPLICATION TO ASSUME ORIGINAL JURISDICTION AND PETITION FOR WRIT OF PROHIBITION AND/OR MANDAMUS FILED BY ELLIS FOR PACCAR-PETR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketCode: PAY; Description: RECEIPT # 83181 ON 04/12/2022. PAYOR: HARVEY D ELLIS TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 200.00. LINE ITEMS: $200.00 ON [WRIT OF] PROHIBITION INITIAL FILING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketCode: CASE; Description: [WRIT OF] PROHIBITION INITIAL FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer OLIVER, STEVE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LITTLE, DAN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GALLAGHER, SCOTT