This case was last updated from Oklahoma Court of Criminal Appeals on 07/03/2022 at 11:23:08 (UTC).

Michael D. Rodriguez, Petitioner, v. STATE OF OKLAHOMA, Respondent,

Case Summary

On 01/18/2022 Michael D Rodriguez, Petitioner filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against STATE OF OKLAHOMA, Respondent. This case was filed in Oklahoma Court of Criminal Appeals, Oklahoma Court of Criminal Appeals located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2-71

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    Statewide, Oklahoma

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Rodriguez, Michael D.

Hodgen, OK 74939

Respondent

STATE OF OKLAHOMA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Rodriguez, Michael D.

#172560, 53468 Mineral Springs Rd

Hodgen, OK 74939

Respondent Attorney

Oklahoma County District Attorney

505 County Office Bldg., 320 Robert S. Kerr Ave.

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

 

Court Documents

MOTION TO AMEND THE RECORD TO INCLUDE FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION SWORN AFFIDAVIT, ETC

01/18/2022: MOTION TO AMEND THE RECORD TO INCLUDE FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION SWORN AFFIDAVIT, ETC

PETITIONER'S MOTION TO COURT FOR PETITIONER TO BE APPOINTED APPELLATE COUNSEL FROM THE NORMAN INDIGENT DEFENSE SYSTEM

01/20/2022: PETITIONER'S MOTION TO COURT FOR PETITIONER TO BE APPOINTED APPELLATE COUNSEL FROM THE NORMAN INDIGENT DEFENSE SYSTEM

PETITIONER'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS

02/14/2022: PETITIONER'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS

LETTER FROM PETITIONER

03/07/2022: LETTER FROM PETITIONER

PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

03/07/2022: PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

PETITIONER'S SWORN AFFIDAVIT

03/07/2022: PETITIONER'S SWORN AFFIDAVIT

JE: ORDER ROWLAND PJ, HUDSON VPJ, LUMPKIN J, LEWIS J, COPIES TO ATTYS, DC CLERK, HON. CINDY H. TRUONG, ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR EXTRAORDINARY RELIEF. THE COURT DECLINS JURISDICTION AND DISMISSED THIS MATTER. PETITIONERS MOTIONS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

03/15/2022: JE: ORDER ROWLAND PJ, HUDSON VPJ, LUMPKIN J, LEWIS J, COPIES TO ATTYS, DC CLERK, HON. CINDY H. TRUONG, ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR EXTRAORDINARY RELIEF. THE COURT DECLINS JURISDICTION AND DISMISSED THIS MATTER. PETITIONERS MOTIONS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME AND APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL ARE ALSO DENIED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: DISN; Description: JE: ORDER ROWLAND PJ, HUDSON VPJ, LUMPKIN J, LEWIS J, COPIES TO ATTYS, DC CLERK, HON. CINDY H. TRUONG, ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR EXTRAORDINARY RELIEF. THE COURT DECLINS JURISDICTION AND DISMISSED THIS MATTER. PETITIONERS MOTIONS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME AND APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL ARE ALSO DENIED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITIONER'S SWORN AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LETTER FROM PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITIONER'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketCode: TEND; Description: PETITIONER'S MOTION TO AMEND AND/OR SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD TO INCLUDE SWORN FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION AFFIDAVIT AND OTHER AFFIDAVIT TO SHOW CAUSE FOR AN ALLEGATION OF INEFFECTIVE ASSISTANCE OF COUNSEL-TENDERED FOR FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITIONER'S MOTION TO COURT FOR PETITIONER TO BE APPOINTED APPELLATE COUNSEL FROM THE NORMAN INDIGENT DEFENSE SYSTEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PETF; Description: MOTION TO AMEND THE RECORD TO INCLUDE FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION SWORN AFFIDAVIT, ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: PAY; Description: RECEIPT # 82621 ON 01/18/2022. PAYOR: MICHAEL D. RODRIGUEZ TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 0.00. LINE ITEMS: $0.00 ON [WRIT OF] MANDAMUS INITIAL FILING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: PAUP; Description: PAUPER AFFIDAVIT FOR RODRIGUEZ, MICHAEL D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: CASE; Description: [WRIT OF] MANDAMUS INITIAL FILING

    Read MoreRead Less