This case was last updated from Oklahoma Court of Civil Appeals on 11/10/2022 at 20:04:30 (UTC).

Karen L. Pollet, Plaintiff/Appellant, vs J.C. Humphrey Abstract Company and Guarantee Abstract Company d/b/a Guarantee Abstract and Insurance Company, Defendants/Appellees.

Case Summary

On 08/29/2022 Karen L Pollet, Plaintiff/Appellant, filed a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit against J C Humphrey Abstract Company and Guarantee Abstract Company d/b/a Guarantee Abstract and Insurance Company, Defendants/Appellees. This case was filed in Oklahoma Court of Civil Appeals, Oklahoma Court of Civil Appeals - Oklahoma City located in Texas, Oklahoma. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0660

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Statewide, Oklahoma

 

Party Details

Appellant

Pollet, Karen L.

Appellees

Guarantee Abstract Company

J.C. Humphrey Abstract Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

KLEIN, BRUCE F

Attorney at BRUCE F KLEIN PLLC

222 N W 13Th

Okla City, OK 73103

Other Attorneys

STEVENS, KIMBERLY A

P.O. Box 26350

Oklahoma City, OK 73126

 

Court Documents

PETITION IN ERROR FILED BY KLEIN FOR POLLET - PLNTF/APLNT

08/29/2022: PETITION IN ERROR FILED BY KLEIN FOR POLLET - PLNTF/APLNT

JE: CT NOTES ON 8-29-22, APLNT SBMTD ORIG AND 4 COPIES OF REC, INCLUDING AS TAB 8 COPY OF TRANS OF PROCEEDINGS HELD 5-9-22. APLNT DID NOT FILE ORIG TRANS SIGNED AND CERT BY CT REP. 8-29-22 REC STRICKEN FR/REC W/LEAVE GRANTED TO RESUBMIT REC TO INCLUD

08/30/2022: JE: CT NOTES ON 8-29-22, APLNT SBMTD ORIG AND 4 COPIES OF REC, INCLUDING AS TAB 8 COPY OF TRANS OF PROCEEDINGS HELD 5-9-22. APLNT DID NOT FILE ORIG TRANS SIGNED AND CERT BY CT REP. 8-29-22 REC STRICKEN FR/REC W/LEAVE GRANTED TO RESUBMIT REC TO INCLUDE ORIG TRANS SIGNED AND CERT BY CT REP. APLNT MAY CALL AND MAKE ARRANGEMENTS ETC TO RETRIEVE ALL COPIES OF REC TO BE RESUBMITTED. APLNT TO RESUBMIT REC W/4 COPIES NLT 9-21-22. APLEES WILL HAVE 20 DAYS FR/FILING OF RESUBMITTED REC TO FILE RESP AND ANY SUPP REC. C/ATTYS DC CLERK DC JUDGE

APLEES JC HUMPHREY ABSTRACT COMPANY AND GUARANTEE ABSTRACT COMPANY'S RESPONSE TO PETITION IN ERROR

09/15/2022: APLEES JC HUMPHREY ABSTRACT COMPANY AND GUARANTEE ABSTRACT COMPANY'S RESPONSE TO PETITION IN ERROR

ASSIGNED TO COURT OF CIVIL APPEALS, OKLAHOMA CITY N/ATTYS

09/21/2022: ASSIGNED TO COURT OF CIVIL APPEALS, OKLAHOMA CITY N/ATTYS

JE: OPINION-----------------------AFFIRMED---------------------PRINCE, PJ. CONCUR: MITCHELL, VCJ, SWINTON, J--------------------SUMMARY------------------C/ATTYS DC JUDGE

10/21/2022: JE: OPINION-----------------------AFFIRMED---------------------PRINCE, PJ. CONCUR: MITCHELL, VCJ, SWINTON, J--------------------SUMMARY------------------C/ATTYS DC JUDGE

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketCode: 1004; Description: AFFIRMED (OPINION)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: COPN; Description: JE: OPINION-----------------------AFFIRMED---------------------PRINCE, PJ. CONCUR: MITCHELL, VCJ, SWINTON, J--------------------SUMMARY------------------C/ATTYS DC JUDGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: CCAO; Description: ASSIGNED TO COURT OF CIVIL APPEALS, OKLAHOMA CITY; N/ATTYS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RESP; Description: APLEES JC HUMPHREY ABSTRACT COMPANY AND GUARANTEE ABSTRACT COMPANY'S RESPONSE TO PETITION IN ERROR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketCode: TRAN; Description: TRANSCRIPT OF MOTION TO DISMISS O+4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketCode: TREC; Description: APPELLANT'S RECORD-SUMMARY DISPOSITION O+4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JE: CT NOTES ON 8-29-22, APLNT SBMTD ORIG AND 4 COPIES OF REC, INCLUDING AS TAB 8 COPY OF TRANS OF PROCEEDINGS HELD 5-9-22. APLNT DID NOT FILE ORIG TRANS SIGNED AND CERT BY CT REP. 8-29-22 REC STRICKEN FR/REC W/LEAVE GRANTED TO RESUBMIT REC TO INCLUDE ORIG TRANS SIGNED AND CERT BY CT REP. APLNT MAY CALL AND MAKE ARRANGEMENTS ETC TO RETRIEVE ALL COPIES OF REC TO BE RESUBMITTED. APLNT TO RESUBMIT REC W/4 COPIES NLT 9-21-22. APLEES WILL HAVE 20 DAYS FR/FILING OF RESUBMITTED REC TO FILE RESP AND ANY SUPP REC. C/ATTYS DC CLERK DC JUDGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: APPELLANT'S CERTIFICATION OF RECORD (O+4)***************STRICKEN PER ORDER OF 8-30-22***************

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PETF; Description: PETITION IN ERROR FILED BY KLEIN FOR POLLET - PLNTF/APLNT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketCode: PAY; Description: RECEIPT # 84198 ON 08/29/2022. PAYOR: BRUCE F KLEIN TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 200.00. LINE ITEMS: $200.00 ON SUMMARY DISPOSITION INITIAL FILING.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketCode: CASE; Description: SUMMARY DISPOSITION INITIAL FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketCode: DOOA; Description: DATE OF ORDER APPEALED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less