This case was last updated from Oklahoma Supreme Court on 05/13/2022 at 11:01:02 (UTC).

Johnny Baggs, Lara Baggs, Plaintiffs/Appellees, vs Kathy Louis Martin, Defendant/Appellant, and Steven Brad Noah, and Claudie Ray Noah, Defendants.

Case Summary

On 06/14/2021 Johnny Baggs, Lara Baggs, Plaintiffs/Appellees filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against Kathy Louis Martin, Defendant/Appellant, and Steven Brad Noah, and Claudie Ray Noah, Defendants. This case was filed in Oklahoma Supreme Court, Oklahoma Supreme Court located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9636

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Statewide, Oklahoma

 

Party Details

Appellant

Martin, Kathie Louis

Appellees

Baggs, Johnny

Baggs, Laura

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Lynch, Blake E

Attorney at Wagner & Lynch

P.O. Box 310

Wilburton, OK 74578

Other Attorneys

JORDAN, SARAH M

P.O. Box 905

Poteau, OK 74953

 

Court Documents

PETITION IN ERROR FILED BY LYNCH FOR MARTIN - DEFT/APLNT

06/14/2021: PETITION IN ERROR FILED BY LYNCH FOR MARTIN - DEFT/APLNT

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE BY BLAKE E. LYNCH

06/14/2021: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE BY BLAKE E. LYNCH

APLNT'S RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

07/07/2021: APLNT'S RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

JE: CT NOTES APLNT'S RESP TO CT'S SHOW CAUSE ORDER. RESP FAILS TO ADVISE OF DATE WH/APLNT REC'D ACTUAL NOTICE ETC. APLNT TO SHOW CAUSE, ON OR BEFORE 7-27-21, WHY TH/APPEAL SH/NOT BE DSMD AS UNTIMELY ETC. FACTS NOT OF REC MUST BE VERIFIED BY AFD. FAIL

07/12/2021: JE: CT NOTES APLNT'S RESP TO CT'S SHOW CAUSE ORDER. RESP FAILS TO ADVISE OF DATE WH/APLNT REC'D ACTUAL NOTICE ETC. APLNT TO SHOW CAUSE, ON OR BEFORE 7-27-21, WHY TH/APPEAL SH/NOT BE DSMD AS UNTIMELY ETC. FACTS NOT OF REC MUST BE VERIFIED BY AFD. FAILURE TO COMPLY W/TH/ORDER MAY RESULT IN DSML W/OUT FURTHER NOTICE. C/ATTYS

APLNT'S RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

08/13/2021: APLNT'S RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

JE: APLNT'S RESP TO CT'S SH/CAUSE ORDER SATISFIES CT'S TIMELINESS INQUIRY. APPEAL OF 10-21-20 AND 5-11-21 ORDERS SH/PROCEED. ETC. CONCUR: DARBY, CJ, KANE, VCJ, KAUGER, EDMONDSON, COMBS, GURICH, JJ. DISSENT: WINCHESTER, ROWE, KUEHN, JJ. C/ATTYS

10/04/2021: JE: APLNT'S RESP TO CT'S SH/CAUSE ORDER SATISFIES CT'S TIMELINESS INQUIRY. APPEAL OF 10-21-20 AND 5-11-21 ORDERS SH/PROCEED. ETC. CONCUR: DARBY, CJ, KANE, VCJ, KAUGER, EDMONDSON, COMBS, GURICH, JJ. DISSENT: WINCHESTER, ROWE, KUEHN, JJ. C/ATTYS

DESIGNATION OF RECORD

10/22/2021: DESIGNATION OF RECORD

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE BY SARAH M. JORDAN

11/10/2021: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE BY SARAH M. JORDAN

RESPONSE TO PETITION

11/10/2021: RESPONSE TO PETITION

COUNTER-DESIGNATION OF RECORD

11/10/2021: COUNTER-DESIGNATION OF RECORD

NOTICE OF COMPLETION W/INDEX

11/23/2021: NOTICE OF COMPLETION W/INDEX

BRIEF IN CHIEF

02/28/2022: BRIEF IN CHIEF

JE: APLEE'S 4-8-22 AEAB IS STRICKEN FR/REC FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY W/OKLA SUP CT RULES 1.11. APLEE TO FILE, NLT 4-26-22, ORIG AND 14 BOUND COPIES OF AEAB. BRIEFS SH/BE SECURELY BOUND AND FASTENED ALONG LEFT SIDE W/SPIRAL OR PLASTIC FINGER SPINE BINDING

04/11/2022: JE: APLEE'S 4-8-22 AEAB IS STRICKEN FR/REC FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY W/OKLA SUP CT RULES 1.11. APLEE TO FILE, NLT 4-26-22, ORIG AND 14 BOUND COPIES OF AEAB. BRIEFS SH/BE SECURELY BOUND AND FASTENED ALONG LEFT SIDE W/SPIRAL OR PLASTIC FINGER SPINE BINDING AND SH/BE BOUND SO AS TO BE FLAT UPON OPENING. CT FURTHER NOTES TH/ITEMS ATTACHED AS EXHS TO APLEE'S 4-8-22 BRIEF ARE NOT ITEMS PERMITTED BY RULE 1.11(I). AN APPENDIX TO A BRIEF IS LIMITED TO ITEMS LISTED IN RULE1.11(I) OF OKLA SUP CT RULES. ANY APPENDIX TO BRIEF MUST ONLY INCLUDE ITEMS LISTED IN RULE 1.11(I). APLNT W/HAVE 20 DAYS FR/FILING OF BOUND AEAB TO FILE ATRB. N/ATTYS

RESPONSE BRIEF OF APLEE

04/18/2022: RESPONSE BRIEF OF APLEE

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: AEAB; Description: RESPONSE BRIEF OF APLEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JE: APLEE'S 4-8-22 AEAB IS STRICKEN FR/REC FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY W/OKLA SUP CT RULES 1.11. APLEE TO FILE, NLT 4-26-22, ORIG AND 14 BOUND COPIES OF AEAB. BRIEFS SH/BE SECURELY BOUND AND FASTENED ALONG LEFT SIDE W/SPIRAL OR PLASTIC FINGER SPINE BINDING AND SH/BE BOUND SO AS TO BE FLAT UPON OPENING. CT FURTHER NOTES TH/ITEMS ATTACHED AS EXHS TO APLEE'S 4-8-22 BRIEF ARE NOT ITEMS PERMITTED BY RULE 1.11(I). AN APPENDIX TO A BRIEF IS LIMITED TO ITEMS LISTED IN RULE1.11(I) OF OKLA SUP CT RULES. ANY APPENDIX TO BRIEF MUST ONLY INCLUDE ITEMS LISTED IN RULE 1.11(I). APLNT W/HAVE 20 DAYS FR/FILING OF BOUND AEAB TO FILE ATRB. N/ATTYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: RESPONSE BRIEF OF APLEE (NOT BOUND)************STRICKEN PER ORDER DATED 4-11-22************

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: ATBC; Description: BRIEF IN CHIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JE: ETC. UNLESS ATBC FILED BY 2-28-22, APPEAL WILL BE SUBJECT TO DSML ETC. N/ATTYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NTCP; Description: NOTICE OF COMPLETION W/INDEX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: DSRC; Description: COUNTER-DESIGNATION OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RESP; Description: RESPONSE TO PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE BY SARAH M. JORDAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: DSRC; Description: DESIGNATION OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JE: CT NOTES APLNT HAS NOT RESP TO CT'S ORDER TO ADVISE DATE APLNT RECD NOTICE OF 5-11-21 ORDER. APLNT TO SH/CAUSE NLT 8-13-21 WHY APPEAL SH/NOT BE DSMD AS UNTIMELY ETC. FACTS OF REC MUST BE VERIFIED BY AFF. FAILURE TO COMPLY MAY RESULT IN DSML ETC. N/ATTYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JE: CT NOTES APLNT'S RESP TO CT'S SHOW CAUSE ORDER. RESP FAILS TO ADVISE OF DATE WH/APLNT REC'D ACTUAL NOTICE ETC. APLNT TO SHOW CAUSE, ON OR BEFORE 7-27-21, WHY TH/APPEAL SH/NOT BE DSMD AS UNTIMELY ETC. FACTS NOT OF REC MUST BE VERIFIED BY AFD. FAILURE TO COMPLY W/TH/ORDER MAY RESULT IN DSML W/OUT FURTHER NOTICE. C/ATTYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: APLNT'S RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JE: APLNT TO SH/CAUSE, NLT 7-7-21, WHY APPEALS FR/BOTH ORDERS ETC SH/NOT BE DSMD AS UNTIMELY. ETC. APLNT TO ADVISE DATE APLNT RECEIVED ACTUAL NOTICE OF FILING OF ORDERS APPEALED AND INCLUDE ANY DOC ESTABLISHING NOTICE. ETC. FAILURE TO RESP MAY RESULT IN DSML. N/ATTYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE BY BLAKE E. LYNCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PETF; Description: PETITION IN ERROR FILED BY LYNCH FOR MARTIN - DEFT/APLNT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketCode: PAY; Description: RECEIPT # 80641 ON 06/14/2021. PAYOR: BLAKE E LYNCH TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 200.00. LINE ITEMS: $200.00 ON DISTRICT COURT FINAL ORDER OR JUDGMENT INITIAL FILING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketCode: CASE; Description: DISTRICT COURT FINAL ORDER OR JUDGMENT INITIAL FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketCode: MAIL; Description: PETITION MAILED DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketCode: DOOA; Description: DATE OF ORDER APPEALED

    Read MoreRead Less