This case was last updated from Oklahoma Court of Criminal Appeals on 03/31/2022 at 04:28:27 (UTC).

Jestin Tafolla a/k/a Bebo, Petitioner, v. STATE OF OKLAHOMA, Respondent,

Case Summary

On 06/21/2021 Jestin Tafolla a/k/a Bebo, Petitioner filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against STATE OF OKLAHOMA, Respondent. This case was filed in Oklahoma Court of Criminal Appeals, Oklahoma Court of Criminal Appeals located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-627

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • County, State:

    Statewide, Oklahoma

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Tafolla a/k/a Bebo, Jestin

Respondent

STATE OF OKLAHOMA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Monroe, Stanley

15 W. 6Th St., Ste 2800

Tulsa, OK 74119

Respondent Attorney

Tulsa County District Attorney

500 S Denver Ave W#900

Tulsa, OK 74103

 

Court Documents

PETITION IN ERROR

06/21/2021: PETITION IN ERROR

APPEAL OF DENIAL OF APPLICATION FOR POST CONVICTION RELIEFE AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT

06/21/2021: APPEAL OF DENIAL OF APPLICATION FOR POST CONVICTION RELIEFE AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT

JE: ORDER ROWLAND PJ, HUDSON VPJ, LUMPKIN J, LEWIS J COPIES TO HON. MICHELLE KEELY, DIST COURT CLERK AND ATTORNEYS ORDER AFFIRMING DENIAL OF APPLICATION FOR POST-CONVICTION RELIEF PETITIONER HAS FAILED TO ESTABLISH THAT HE IS ENTITLED TO POST-CONVICT

09/29/2021: JE: ORDER ROWLAND PJ, HUDSON VPJ, LUMPKIN J, LEWIS J COPIES TO HON. MICHELLE KEELY, DIST COURT CLERK AND ATTORNEYS ORDER AFFIRMING DENIAL OF APPLICATION FOR POST-CONVICTION RELIEF PETITIONER HAS FAILED TO ESTABLISH THAT HE IS ENTITLED TO POST-CONVICTION RELIEF, THE ORDER OF THE DIST COURT, DENYING PETITIONER'S APPLICATION FOR POST-CONVICTION RELIEF IS AFFIRMED.

MANDATE ISSUED

09/29/2021: MANDATE ISSUED

RETURN OF COURT CLERK

10/22/2021: RETURN OF COURT CLERK

RECEIPT FOR MANDATE

10/22/2021: RECEIPT FOR MANDATE

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RCMD; Description: RECEIPT FOR MANDATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RTCC; Description: RETURN OF COURT CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketCode: RRCD; Description: RECORD RETURNED TO DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: MAND; Description: MANDATE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketCode: 1003; Description: AFFIRMED (ORDER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: OPIN; Description: JE: ORDER; ROWLAND PJ, HUDSON VPJ, LUMPKIN J, LEWIS J; COPIES TO HON. MICHELLE KEELY, DIST COURT CLERK AND ATTORNEYS; ORDER AFFIRMING DENIAL OF APPLICATION FOR POST-CONVICTION RELIEF; PETITIONER HAS FAILED TO ESTABLISH THAT HE IS ENTITLED TO POST-CONVICTION RELIEF, THE ORDER OF THE DIST COURT, DENYING PETITIONER'S APPLICATION FOR POST-CONVICTION RELIEF IS AFFIRMED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketCode: RCCT; Description: RECORD TO COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketCode: ORGR; Description: ORIGINAL RECORD - 55 PAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: BFSP; Description: APPEAL OF DENIAL OF APPLICATION FOR POST CONVICTION RELIEFE AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PETF; Description: PETITION IN ERROR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUED CERTIFICATE OF APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketCode: PAY; Description: RECEIPT # 80743 ON 06/21/2021. PAYOR: STANLEY MONROE TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 50.00. LINE ITEMS: $50.00 ON POST CONVICTION INITIAL FILING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketCode: CASE; Description: POST CONVICTION INITIAL FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketCode: DOOA; Description: DATE OF ORDER APPEALED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Monroe, Stanley