This case was last updated from Oklahoma Court of Criminal Appeals on 07/03/2022 at 11:06:35 (UTC).

JAKUS ADAM WEAR, Petitioner, v. STATE OF OKLAHOMA, Respondent,

Case Summary

On 01/18/2022 JAKUS ADAM WEAR, Petitioner filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against STATE OF OKLAHOMA, Respondent. This case was filed in Oklahoma Court of Criminal Appeals, Oklahoma Court of Criminal Appeals located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2-70

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • County, State:

    Statewide, Oklahoma

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WEAR, JAKUS ADAM

Respondent

STATE OF OKLAHOMA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Barnett, Adam S.

Assistant Public Defender, 500 W. Archer St

Tulsa, OK 74105

Respondent Attorney

Tulsa County District Attorney

500 S Denver Ave W#900

Tulsa, OK 74103

 

Court Documents

PETITION IN ERROR

01/18/2022: PETITION IN ERROR

PETITIONERS BRIEF IN SUPPORT

01/18/2022: PETITIONERS BRIEF IN SUPPORT

PETITIONERS NOTICE OF POST CONVICTION APPEAL

01/18/2022: PETITIONERS NOTICE OF POST CONVICTION APPEAL

NOTICE OF COMPLETION OF RECORD ON APPEAL

01/26/2022: NOTICE OF COMPLETION OF RECORD ON APPEAL

RECORD ORDERED FROM DISTRICT COURT

01/26/2022: RECORD ORDERED FROM DISTRICT COURT

JE ORDER ROWLAND PJ, HUDSON VPJ, LUMPKIN J,LEWIS J, COPIES TO ATTYS, DC CLERK, HON. TRACY PRIDDY, ORDER ORDER AFFIRMING DENIAL OF POST CONVICTION RELIEF. THE CONVICTION IN THIS MATTER WER FINAL BEFORE THE 7-9-20 DECISION IN MCGIRT AND THE USSC HOLDIN

03/01/2022: JE ORDER ROWLAND PJ, HUDSON VPJ, LUMPKIN J,LEWIS J, COPIES TO ATTYS, DC CLERK, HON. TRACY PRIDDY, ORDER ORDER AFFIRMING DENIAL OF POST CONVICTION RELIEF. THE CONVICTION IN THIS MATTER WER FINAL BEFORE THE 7-9-20 DECISION IN MCGIRT AND THE USSC HOLDING IN MCGIRT DOESN NOT APPLY.

MANDATE ISSUED

03/01/2022: MANDATE ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketCode: RRCD; Description: RECORD RETURNED TO DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: MAND; Description: MANDATE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketCode: 1003; Description: AFFIRMED (ORDER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: OPIN; Description: JE; ORDER ROWLAND PJ, HUDSON VPJ, LUMPKIN J,LEWIS J, COPIES TO ATTYS, DC CLERK, HON. TRACY PRIDDY, ORDER ORDER AFFIRMING DENIAL OF POST CONVICTION RELIEF. THE CONVICTION IN THIS MATTER WER FINAL BEFORE THE 7-9-20 DECISION IN MCGIRT AND THE USSC HOLDING IN MCGIRT DOESN NOT APPLY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketCode: RCCT; Description: RECORD TO COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketCode: ORGR; Description: ORIGINAL RECORD - 45 PAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RODC; Description: RECORD ORDERED FROM DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NTCP; Description: NOTICE OF COMPLETION OF RECORD ON APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITIONERS NOTICE OF POST CONVICTION APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: BFSP; Description: PETITIONERS BRIEF IN SUPPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PETF; Description: PETITION IN ERROR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUED CERTIFICATE OF APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: PAY; Description: RECEIPT # 82619 ON 01/18/2022. PAYOR: ADAM S. BARNETT TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 0.00. LINE ITEMS: $0.00 ON POST CONVICTION INITIAL FILING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: CASE; Description: POST CONVICTION INITIAL FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketCode: DOOA; Description: DATE OF ORDER APPEALED

    Read MoreRead Less