This case was last updated from Oklahoma Supreme Court on 04/30/2022 at 04:28:17 (UTC).

International Chemical Company, Plaintiff/Appellee, vs. B&G Futures, Inc., Steve Dipietro and Chirag Vyas, individually, Defendants/Appellants.

Case Summary

On 04/30/2021 International Chemical Company, Plaintiff/Appellee filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against B G Futures, Inc , Steve Dipietro and Chirag Vyas, individually, Defendants/Appellants. This case was filed in Oklahoma Supreme Court, Oklahoma Supreme Court located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9554

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Statewide, Oklahoma

 

Party Details

Appellants

B & G FUTURES, INC

DIPIETRO, STEVE

Vyas, Chirag

Appellee

INTERNATIONAL CHEMICAL COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

LIMEKILLER, DAVID PAUL

Gable Gotwals, 110 North Elgin Avenue Suite 200

Tulsa, OK 74120

PITTMAN, RYAN A

Gable Gotwals, 110 North Elgin Avenue Suite 200

Tulsa, OK 74120

Appellee Attorneys

Campbell, Stuart D

Attorney at Doerner,Saunders,Daniel & Anderson LLP

700 Williams Center Tower Ii, Two West Second Street

Tulsa, OK 74103

BRIGHTMIRE, JON E

Attorney at Doerner,Saunders,Daniel & Anderson LLP

Williams Center Tower Ii, Two W. 2Nd St., Suite 700

Tulsa, OK 74103

Other Attorneys

MATTHEWS, JAMES S JR

3524 Northwest 50Th Street

Oklahoma City, OK 73112

Myers, Lauren Rachel

Attorney at Doerner, Saunders, Daniel & Anderson LLp

Two West Second St., Suite 700

Tulsa, OK 74103

 

Court Documents

PETITION IN ERROR FILED BY PITTMAN FOR B&G FUTURES ET AL-DEFS/APLNTS

04/30/2021: PETITION IN ERROR FILED BY PITTMAN FOR B&G FUTURES ET AL-DEFS/APLNTS

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE BY RYAN A. PITTMAN AND DAVID P. LIMEKILLER

04/30/2021: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE BY RYAN A. PITTMAN AND DAVID P. LIMEKILLER

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE BY STUART D. CAMPBELL AND JON E. BRIGHTMIRE

05/18/2021: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE BY STUART D. CAMPBELL AND JON E. BRIGHTMIRE

APLEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS APPEAL

05/18/2021: APLEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS APPEAL

APPELLANTS' RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO APPELLEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS APPEAL

06/02/2021: APPELLANTS' RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO APPELLEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS APPEAL

JE: APLEE'S MOT TO DSMS APPEAL DENIED. A DIST CT H/AUTHORITY TO CONSTRUE ITS JUDGMENT TO RESOLVE CONTROVERSY OVER ITS MEANING AND EFFECT. ETC. APPEAL OF 4-22-21 ORDER DENYING APLNTS' MOT TO CLARIFY JUDGMENT SH/PROCEED. CONCUR: KANE, VCJ., KAUGER, WIN

06/21/2021: JE: APLEE'S MOT TO DSMS APPEAL DENIED. A DIST CT H/AUTHORITY TO CONSTRUE ITS JUDGMENT TO RESOLVE CONTROVERSY OVER ITS MEANING AND EFFECT. ETC. APPEAL OF 4-22-21 ORDER DENYING APLNTS' MOT TO CLARIFY JUDGMENT SH/PROCEED. CONCUR: KANE, VCJ., KAUGER, WINCHESTER, EDMONDSON, COMBS, GURICH, ROWE, JJ. NOT VOTING: DARBY, CJ. C/ATTYS

RESPONSE TO PETITION

06/25/2021: RESPONSE TO PETITION

COUNTER DESIGNATION OF RECORD

06/25/2021: COUNTER DESIGNATION OF RECORD

AMENDED COUNTER DESIGNATION OF RECORD

06/28/2021: AMENDED COUNTER DESIGNATION OF RECORD

NOTICE OF COMPLETION W/INDEX

09/10/2021: NOTICE OF COMPLETION W/INDEX

APLNTS' MOTION TO DISMISS APPEAL

10/27/2021: APLNTS' MOTION TO DISMISS APPEAL

JE: CAUSE DSMD ON MOT OF APLNTS. N/ATTYS DC CLERK

10/28/2021: JE: CAUSE DSMD ON MOT OF APLNTS. N/ATTYS DC CLERK

MANDATE ISSUED

12/01/2021: MANDATE ISSUED

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketCode: RCMD; Description: RECEIPT FOR MANDATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: MAND; Description: MANDATE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketCode: 5003; Description: DISMISSED (ORDER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: DISN; Description: JE: CAUSE DSMD ON MOT OF APLNTS. N/ATTYS DC CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: APLNTS' MOTION TO DISMISS APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NTCP; Description: NOTICE OF COMPLETION W/INDEX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: DSRC; Description: AMENDED COUNTER DESIGNATION OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: DSRC; Description: COUNTER DESIGNATION OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RESP; Description: RESPONSE TO PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JE: APLEE'S MOT TO DSMS APPEAL DENIED. A DIST CT H/AUTHORITY TO CONSTRUE ITS JUDGMENT TO RESOLVE CONTROVERSY OVER ITS MEANING AND EFFECT. ETC. APPEAL OF 4-22-21 ORDER DENYING APLNTS' MOT TO CLARIFY JUDGMENT SH/PROCEED. CONCUR: KANE, VCJ., KAUGER, WINCHESTER, EDMONDSON, COMBS, GURICH, ROWE, JJ. NOT VOTING: DARBY, CJ. C/ATTYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: APPELLANTS' RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO APPELLEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JE: APLNTS TO RESP TO APLEE'S MOT TO DSMS ON OR BEFORE 6-2-21. N/ATTYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: APLEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE BY STUART D. CAMPBELL AND JON E. BRIGHTMIRE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketCode: DSRC; Description: DESIGNATION OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE BY RYAN A. PITTMAN AND DAVID P. LIMEKILLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PETF; Description: PETITION IN ERROR FILED BY PITTMAN FOR B&G FUTURES ET AL-DEFS/APLNTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketCode: PAY; Description: RECEIPT # 80320 ON 04/30/2021. OVER THE COUNTER PAYOR: RYAN A PITTMAN TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 200.00. LINE ITEMS: $200.00 ON DISTRICT COURT FINAL ORDER OR JUDGMENT INITIAL FILING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketCode: CASE; Description: DISTRICT COURT FINAL ORDER OR JUDGMENT INITIAL FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketCode: DOOA; Description: DATE OF ORDER APPEALED

    Read MoreRead Less