This case was last updated from Oklahoma Supreme Court on 05/23/2022 at 16:38:48 (UTC).

In the Matter of the Guardianship of S.S., a minor child Tatyana Sturdy, Appellant, vs Jerry Sturdy and Mary Katherine Sturdy, Appellees.

Case Summary

On 05/13/2021 In the Matter of the Guardianship of S S , a minor child Tatyana Sturdy, Appellant filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against Jerry Sturdy and Mary Katherine Sturdy, Appellees. This case was filed in Oklahoma Supreme Court, Oklahoma Supreme Court located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9579

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Statewide, Oklahoma

 

Party Details

Appellant

Sturdy, Tatyana

Appellees

Sturdy, Jerry

Sturdy, Mary katherine

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Maxwell, Joy

P.O. Box 501

Keota, OK 74941

Appellee Attorney

Powell, Robert P

Attorney at SHEARS POWELL & HANNER

710 Cedar Lake Blvd., Suite 101

Oklahoma City, OK 73114

Other Attorneys

COOK-CAMPBELL, BRINKLEY

319 North 8Th Street

Fort Smith, AR 72901

WINDRIX, JANUARY

Po Box 41

Poteau, OK 74953

 

Court Documents

APPELLANT'S BRIEF IN CHIEF

09/20/2021: APPELLANT'S BRIEF IN CHIEF

APLEES' PETITION FOR CERTIORARI ($/OC) COA/TULSA

04/27/2022: APLEES' PETITION FOR CERTIORARI ($/OC) COA/TULSA

APLNT'S ANSWER TO APLEE'S PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI

05/13/2022: APLNT'S ANSWER TO APLEE'S PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: CERA; Description: APLNT'S ANSWER TO APLEE'S PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORGR RECEIVED FROM CCAT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: CERT; Description: APLEES' PETITION FOR CERTIORARI ($/OC) COA/TULSA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketCode: PAY; Description: RECEIPT # 83310 ON 04/27/2022. OVER THE COUNTER PAYOR: ROBERT P POWELL TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 100.00. LINE ITEMS: $100.00 ON PET FOR CERT #119579.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketCode: CRHD; Description: APLEE'S PET FOR REHE DENIED. CONCURS: HIXON, J. DISSENTS: FISCHER, CJ. C/ATTYS COA/TULSA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketCode: CREH; Description: APLEES' PETITION FOR REHEARING (OC) COA/TULSA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketCode: 3004; Description: REVERSED (OPINION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketCode: COPN; Description: JE: OPINION------------------------REVERSED---------------------BARNES, PJ. CONCURS: HIXON, J. FISCHER, CJ. DISSENTING ETC------------------------SUMMARY------------------------C/ATTYS DC JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketCode: CCAT; Description: ASSIGNED TO COURT OF CIVIL APPEALS, TULSA; N/ATTYS; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TRAN; Description: TRANSCRIPT 4/8/2021 - 27 PAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketCode: ATBC; Description: APPELLANT'S BRIEF IN CHIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketCode: NTCP; Description: NOTICE OF COMPLETION W/INDEX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketCode: RESP; Description: RESPONSE TO PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE BY ROBERT P. POWELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketCode: DSRC; Description: DESIGNATION OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketCode: PETF; Description: PETITION IN ERROR FILED BY MAXWELL FOR STURDY-APLNT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketCode: PAY; Description: RECEIPT # 80406 ON 05/13/2021. PAYOR: JOY MAXWELL TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 200.00. LINE ITEMS: $200.00 ON DISTRICT COURT FINAL ORDER OR JUDGMENT INITIAL FILING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketCode: CASE; Description: DISTRICT COURT FINAL ORDER OR JUDGMENT INITIAL FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketCode: MAIL; Description: PETITION MAILED DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketCode: DOOA; Description: DATE OF ORDER APPEALED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WINDRIX, JANUARY