This case was last updated from Oklahoma Supreme Court on 09/10/2021 at 17:00:30 (UTC).

Ellis, Doris, FIRST PRYORITY BANK Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/30/2021 Ellis, Doris, FIRST PRYORITY BANK was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Oklahoma Supreme Court, Oklahoma Supreme Court located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9755

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Statewide, Oklahoma

 

Party Details

Appellant

Ellis, Doris

Appellee

FIRST PRYORITY BANK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

MARTIN, SID

Attorney at SULLIVENT & FONTANEZ

616 S Boston Ave., Suite 300

Tulsa, OK 74119

Sullivant, Tom

616 So Boston Ave Ste 300

Tulsa, OK 74119

Appellee Attorneys

CASH, ADRIENNE

525 S. Main Street, Suite 800

Tulsa, OK 74103

Fears, Joe M

Attorney at Barber & Bartz

800 Park Centre, 525 South Main Street

Tulsa, OK 74103

 

Court Documents

PETITION IN ERROR FILED BY MARTIN FOR ELLIS - INTERVENORS/APLNT

07/30/2021: PETITION IN ERROR FILED BY MARTIN FOR ELLIS - INTERVENORS/APLNT

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE BY THOMAS J. SULLIVENT, JR AND SIDNEY A. MARTIN, II

07/30/2021: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE BY THOMAS J. SULLIVENT, JR AND SIDNEY A. MARTIN, II

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE BY JOE M. FEARS

08/11/2021: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE BY JOE M. FEARS

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE BY ADRIENNE N. CASH

08/11/2021: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE BY ADRIENNE N. CASH

RESPONSE TO PETITION

08/11/2021: RESPONSE TO PETITION

JE: CT NOTES TH/APLEE FILED 5 COPIES ONLY OF APLEE'S SUPP REC ETC. NONE OF 5 COPIES INCLUDE, APPENDED TO FRONT, AN ORIG CT CLERK'S CERT ETC. RECORDS SUBMITTED 8-11-21, ARE STRICKEN FR/REC. APLEE MAY CALL AND MAKE ARRANGEMENTS IN CT CLERK'S OFFICE TO

08/13/2021: JE: CT NOTES TH/APLEE FILED 5 COPIES ONLY OF APLEE'S SUPP REC ETC. NONE OF 5 COPIES INCLUDE, APPENDED TO FRONT, AN ORIG CT CLERK'S CERT ETC. RECORDS SUBMITTED 8-11-21, ARE STRICKEN FR/REC. APLEE MAY CALL AND MAKE ARRANGEMENTS IN CT CLERK'S OFFICE TO RETRIEVE ALL COPIES OF SUPP SUMMARY DISPO REC ETC, TO BE RESUBMITTED. APLEE TO RESUBMIT SUPP REC IN COMPLIANCE W/OKLA SUP CT RULE 1.36. SUPP REC CONSISTS OF 1 ORIG AND 4 SEP COPIES OF ORIG. REC MUST INCLUDE, APPENDED TO FRONT OF ORIG AND EACH OF COPIES, CT CLERK'S CERT IDENTIFYING EACH OF INCLUDED INSTRUMENTS AS A TRUE AND CORRECT COPY OF ORIG ON FILE IN CT CLERK'S OFFICE. ETC. ORIG REC ON ACCELERATED APPEAL, AND 4 SEP COPIES, SH/BE FILED NLT 8-31-21. FAILURE TO COMPLY W/ORDER MAY RESULT IN TH/APPEAL PROCEEDING W/OUT SUPP REC ON ACCELERATED APPEAL. C/ATTYS

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketCode: EREC; Description: APPELLEE'S RECORD-SUMMARY DISPOSITION PREVIOUSLY FILED 8-11-21 REFILED THIS DATE WITH COURT CLERK'S CERTIFICATION O+4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ALL COPIES OF THE APPELLEE'S RECORD FILED 8/11/2021 RETURNED TO APPELLEE'S COUNSEL PER SC ORDER 8/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JE: CT NOTES TH/APLEE FILED 5 COPIES ONLY OF APLEE'S SUPP REC ETC. NONE OF 5 COPIES INCLUDE, APPENDED TO FRONT, AN ORIG CT CLERK'S CERT ETC. RECORDS SUBMITTED 8-11-21, ARE STRICKEN FR/REC. APLEE MAY CALL AND MAKE ARRANGEMENTS IN CT CLERK'S OFFICE TO RETRIEVE ALL COPIES OF SUPP SUMMARY DISPO REC ETC, TO BE RESUBMITTED. APLEE TO RESUBMIT SUPP REC IN COMPLIANCE W/OKLA SUP CT RULE 1.36. SUPP REC CONSISTS OF 1 ORIG AND 4 SEP COPIES OF ORIG. REC MUST INCLUDE, APPENDED TO FRONT OF ORIG AND EACH OF COPIES, CT CLERK'S CERT IDENTIFYING EACH OF INCLUDED INSTRUMENTS AS A TRUE AND CORRECT COPY OF ORIG ON FILE IN CT CLERK'S OFFICE. ETC. ORIG REC ON ACCELERATED APPEAL, AND 4 SEP COPIES, SH/BE FILED NLT 8-31-21. FAILURE TO COMPLY W/ORDER MAY RESULT IN TH/APPEAL PROCEEDING W/OUT SUPP REC ON ACCELERATED APPEAL. C/ATTYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: APPELLEE'S RECORD-SUMMARY DISPOSITION 5 COPIES***********STRICKEN PER ORDER DATED 8-13-21***********

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RESP; Description: RESPONSE TO PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE BY ADRIENNE N. CASH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE BY JOE M. FEARS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TREC; Description: APPELLANT'S RECORD-SUMMARY DISPOSITION O+4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE BY THOMAS J. SULLIVENT, JR AND SIDNEY A. MARTIN, II

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PETF; Description: PETITION IN ERROR FILED BY MARTIN FOR ELLIS - INTERVENORS/APLNT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketCode: PAY; Description: RECEIPT # 81053 ON 07/30/2021. PAYOR: SID MARTIN TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 200.00. LINE ITEMS: $200.00 ON SUMMARY DISPOSITION INITIAL FILING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketCode: CASE; Description: SUMMARY DISPOSITION INITIAL FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketCode: MAIL; Description: PETITION MAILED DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketCode: DOOA; Description: DATE OF ORDER APPEALED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CASH, ADRIENNE