This case was last updated from Oklahoma Court of Criminal Appeals on 07/06/2022 at 15:55:40 (UTC).

Darrin Lynn Pickens, Petitioner, v. STATE OF OKLAHOMA, Respondent,

Case Summary

On 01/18/2022 Darrin Lynn Pickens, Petitioner filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against STATE OF OKLAHOMA, Respondent. This case was filed in Oklahoma Court of Criminal Appeals, Oklahoma Court of Criminal Appeals located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2-66

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • County, State:

    Statewide, Oklahoma

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Pickens, Darrin Lynn

Hominy, OK 74035

Respondent

STATE OF OKLAHOMA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Pickens, Darrin Lynn

142619, 129 Conner Rd

Hominy, OK 74035

Respondent Attorney

Tulsa County District Attorney

500 S Denver Ave W#900

Tulsa, OK 74103

 

Court Documents

PETITION IN ERROR

01/18/2022: PETITION IN ERROR

NOTICE OF COMPLETION OF RECORD ON APPEAL

02/07/2022: NOTICE OF COMPLETION OF RECORD ON APPEAL

RECORD ORDERED FROM DISTRICT COURT

02/07/2022: RECORD ORDERED FROM DISTRICT COURT

JE: ORDER ROWLAND PJ, HUDSON VPJ, LUMPKIN J, LEWIS J, MUSSEMAN J, COPIE TO ATTYS, DC CLERK, HON. DAWN MOODY, ORDER AFFIRMING DENIAL OF POST CONVICTION RELIEF. THE CONVICTIN IN THIS MATTER WAS FINAL BEFORE THE 7-9-20 DECISION IN MCGIRT AND THE USSC HO

04/05/2022: JE: ORDER ROWLAND PJ, HUDSON VPJ, LUMPKIN J, LEWIS J, MUSSEMAN J, COPIE TO ATTYS, DC CLERK, HON. DAWN MOODY, ORDER AFFIRMING DENIAL OF POST CONVICTION RELIEF. THE CONVICTIN IN THIS MATTER WAS FINAL BEFORE THE 7-9-20 DECISION IN MCGIRT AND THE USSC HOLDING IN MCGIRT DOES NOT APPLY.

MANDATE ISSUED

04/05/2022: MANDATE ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketCode: RRCD; Description: RECORD RETURNED TO DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: MAND; Description: MANDATE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketCode: 1003; Description: AFFIRMED (ORDER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: OPIN; Description: JE: ORDER ROWLAND PJ, HUDSON VPJ, LUMPKIN J, LEWIS J, MUSSEMAN J, COPIE TO ATTYS, DC CLERK, HON. DAWN MOODY, ORDER AFFIRMING DENIAL OF POST CONVICTION RELIEF. THE CONVICTIN IN THIS MATTER WAS FINAL BEFORE THE 7-9-20 DECISION IN MCGIRT AND THE USSC HOLDING IN MCGIRT DOES NOT APPLY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketCode: RCCT; Description: RECORD TO COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketCode: ORGR; Description: ORIGINAL RECORD - 106 PAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RODC; Description: RECORD ORDERED FROM DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NTCP; Description: NOTICE OF COMPLETION OF RECORD ON APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PETF; Description: PETITION IN ERROR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUED CERTIFICATE OF APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: PAY; Description: RECEIPT # 82614 ON 01/18/2022. PAYOR: DARRIN LYNN PICKENS TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 0.00. LINE ITEMS: $0.00 ON POST CONVICTION INITIAL FILING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: PAUP; Description: PAUPER AFFIDAVIT FOR PICKENS, DARRIN LYNN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: CASE; Description: POST CONVICTION INITIAL FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketCode: DOOA; Description: DATE OF ORDER APPEALED

    Read MoreRead Less