This case was last updated from Oklahoma Court of Criminal Appeals on 09/28/2022 at 19:02:26 (UTC).

DALE LAMONIAH ACKERSON, Appellant, v. STATE OF OKLAHOMA, Appellee,

Case Summary

On 05/19/2022 DALE LAMONIAH ACKERSON, Appellant filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against STATE OF OKLAHOMA, Appellee. This case was filed in Oklahoma Court of Criminal Appeals, Oklahoma Court of Criminal Appeals located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-470

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • County, State:

    Statewide, Oklahoma

 

Party Details

Appellant

ACKERSON, DALE LAMONIAH

Appellee

STATE OF OKLAHOMA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Echols, John David

624 S. Denver Ave Suite 201

Tulsa, OK 74119

Appellee Attorney

Mcknight, Marianna

500 S. Denver Ave, Suite 800

Tulsa, OK 74013

 

Court Documents

PETITION IN ERROR

05/19/2022: PETITION IN ERROR

BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PETITION IN ERROR SEEKIN AN APPEAL OUT OF TIME

05/19/2022: BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PETITION IN ERROR SEEKIN AN APPEAL OUT OF TIME

RECORD ORDERED FROM DISTRICT COURT

05/23/2022: RECORD ORDERED FROM DISTRICT COURT

NOTICE OF COMPLETION OF RECORD ON APPEAL

05/23/2022: NOTICE OF COMPLETION OF RECORD ON APPEAL

JE: ORDER ROWLAND PJ, HUDSON VPJ, LUMPKIN J, LEWIS J, MUSSEMAN J COPIES TO HON. DAWN MOODY, DIST COURT CLERK AND ATTORNEYS ORDER GRANTING POST-CONVICTION APPEAL OUT OF TIME PETITIONER IS DIRECTED TO LODGE THE APPEAL IN ACCORDANCE WITH RULES 2.1(E)(3)

06/01/2022: JE: ORDER ROWLAND PJ, HUDSON VPJ, LUMPKIN J, LEWIS J, MUSSEMAN J COPIES TO HON. DAWN MOODY, DIST COURT CLERK AND ATTORNEYS ORDER GRANTING POST-CONVICTION APPEAL OUT OF TIME PETITIONER IS DIRECTED TO LODGE THE APPEAL IN ACCORDANCE WITH RULES 2.1(E)(3). TIME PERIODS COMMENCE ON THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. ( SEE ORDER FOR OTHER INSTRUCTIONS)

MANDATE ISSUED

06/01/2022: MANDATE ISSUED

RETURN OF COURT CLERK

09/12/2022: RETURN OF COURT CLERK

RECEIPT FOR MANDATE

09/12/2022: RECEIPT FOR MANDATE

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RCMD; Description: RECEIPT FOR MANDATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RTCC; Description: RETURN OF COURT CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketCode: RRCD; Description: RECORD RETURNED TO DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: MAND; Description: MANDATE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketCode: 9003; Description: GRANTED (ORDER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: OPIN; Description: JE: ORDER; ROWLAND PJ, HUDSON VPJ, LUMPKIN J, LEWIS J, MUSSEMAN J; COPIES TO HON. DAWN MOODY, DIST COURT CLERK AND ATTORNEYS; ORDER GRANTING POST-CONVICTION APPEAL OUT OF TIME; PETITIONER IS DIRECTED TO LODGE THE APPEAL IN ACCORDANCE WITH RULES 2.1(E)(3). TIME PERIODS COMMENCE ON THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. ( SEE ORDER FOR OTHER INSTRUCTIONS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketCode: RCCT; Description: RECORD TO COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketCode: ORGR; Description: ORIGINAL RECORD - 42 PAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RODC; Description: RECORD ORDERED FROM DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NTCP; Description: NOTICE OF COMPLETION OF RECORD ON APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: BFSP; Description: BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PETITION IN ERROR SEEKIN AN APPEAL OUT OF TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PETF; Description: PETITION IN ERROR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUE CERTIFICATE OF APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketCode: PAY; Description: RECEIPT # 83498 ON 05/19/2022. PAYOR: JOHN DAVID ECHOLS TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 50.00. LINE ITEMS: $50.00 ON POST CONVICTION INITIAL FILING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketCode: CASE; Description: POST CONVICTION INITIAL FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketCode: DOOA; Description: DATE OF ORDER APPEALED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mcknight, Marianna