This case was last updated from Oklahoma Court of Criminal Appeals on 07/06/2022 at 09:32:58 (UTC).

Christopher A Anderson, Petitioner, v. STATE OF OKLAHOMA, Respondent,

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 Christopher A Anderson, Petitioner filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against STATE OF OKLAHOMA, Respondent. This case was filed in Oklahoma Court of Criminal Appeals, Oklahoma Court of Criminal Appeals located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2-80

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • County, State:

    Statewide, Oklahoma

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Anderson, Christopher A

Helena, OK 73741

Respondent

STATE OF OKLAHOMA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Anderson, Christopher A

#665036, 216 N. Murray St

Helena, OK 73741

Respondent Attorney

Tulsa County District Attorney

500 S Denver Ave W#900

Tulsa, OK 74103

 

Court Documents

PETITION IN ERROR

01/21/2022: PETITION IN ERROR

BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PETITION IN ERROR

01/21/2022: BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PETITION IN ERROR

NOTICE OF COMPLETION OF RECORD ON APPEAL

01/31/2022: NOTICE OF COMPLETION OF RECORD ON APPEAL

RECORD ORDERED FROM DISTRICT COURT

01/31/2022: RECORD ORDERED FROM DISTRICT COURT

JE: ORDER ROWLAND PJ, HUDSON VPJ, LUMPKIN J,. LEWIS J, COPIES TO ATTYS, DC CLERK, HON. SHARON HOLMES, ORDER AFFIRMING DENIAL OF POST CONVICTION RELIEF. THE CONVICTIONS IN THIS MATTER WERE FINAL BEFORE 7-9-20 DECISION IN MCGIRT AND THE USSC HOLDING IN

02/28/2022: JE: ORDER ROWLAND PJ, HUDSON VPJ, LUMPKIN J,. LEWIS J, COPIES TO ATTYS, DC CLERK, HON. SHARON HOLMES, ORDER AFFIRMING DENIAL OF POST CONVICTION RELIEF. THE CONVICTIONS IN THIS MATTER WERE FINAL BEFORE 7-9-20 DECISION IN MCGIRT AND THE USSC HOLDING IN MCGIRT DOES NOT APPLY. WE DECLINE PETITINERS INVITATION TO REVISIT OUR HOLDING IN MATLOFF.

MANDATE ISSUED

02/28/2022: MANDATE ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketCode: RRCD; Description: RECORD RETURNED TO DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: MAND; Description: MANDATE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketCode: 1003; Description: AFFIRMED (ORDER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: OPIN; Description: JE: ORDER ROWLAND PJ, HUDSON VPJ, LUMPKIN J,. LEWIS J, COPIES TO ATTYS, DC CLERK, HON. SHARON HOLMES, ORDER AFFIRMING DENIAL OF POST CONVICTION RELIEF. THE CONVICTIONS IN THIS MATTER WERE FINAL BEFORE 7-9-20 DECISION IN MCGIRT AND THE USSC HOLDING IN MCGIRT DOES NOT APPLY. WE DECLINE PETITINERS INVITATION TO REVISIT OUR HOLDING IN MATLOFF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketCode: RCCT; Description: RECORD TO COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketCode: ORGR; Description: ORIGINAL RECORD - 96 PAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RODC; Description: RECORD ORDERED FROM DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NTCP; Description: NOTICE OF COMPLETION OF RECORD ON APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: BFSP; Description: BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PETITION IN ERROR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PETF; Description: PETITION IN ERROR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUE CERTIFICATE OF APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: PAY; Description: RECEIPT # 82638 ON 01/21/2022. PAYOR: CHRISTOPHER A ANDERSON TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 0.00. LINE ITEMS: $0.00 ON POST CONVICTION INITIAL FILING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: PAUP; Description: PAUPER AFFIDAVIT FOR ANDERSON, CHRISTOPHER A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: CASE; Description: POST CONVICTION INITIAL FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketCode: DOOA; Description: DATE OF ORDER APPEALED

    Read MoreRead Less