This case was last updated from Oklahoma Court of Criminal Appeals on 05/16/2022 at 15:52:49 (UTC).

Charles Humbyrd, Petitioner, v. STATE OF OKLAHOMA, Respondent,

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 Charles Humbyrd, Petitioner filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against STATE OF OKLAHOMA, Respondent. This case was filed in Oklahoma Court of Criminal Appeals, Oklahoma Court of Criminal Appeals located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2-81

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • County, State:

    Statewide, Oklahoma

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Humbyrd, Charles

Helena, OK 73741

Respondent

STATE OF OKLAHOMA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Humbyrd, Charles

795569, 216 N. Murray St

Helena, OK 73741

Respondent Attorney

Wagoner County District Attorney

307 E. Cherokee St

Wagoner, OK 74467

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAL/PETITION IN ERROR

01/21/2022: NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAL/PETITION IN ERROR

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketCode: DISN; Description: JE: ORDER ROWLAND PJ, HUDSON VPJ, LUMPIKIN J, LEWIS J, MUSSEMAN J, COPIES TO ATTYS, DC CLERK, HON. DOUGLAS A. KIRKLEY, ORDER DECLINING JURISDICTION. PETITIONER FAILED TO TIMELY FILE PETITION IN ERROR WITH THE CLERK OF THIS COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ** RETURNED MAIL PLACED IN THE FILE **

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PETF; Description: NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAL/PETITION IN ERROR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUE CERTIFICATE OF APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: PAY; Description: RECEIPT # 82639 ON 01/21/2022. PAYOR: CHARLES HUMBYRD TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 0.00. LINE ITEMS: $0.00 ON POST CONVICTION INITIAL FILING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: PAUP; Description: PAUPER AFFIDAVIT FOR HUMBYRD, CHARLES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: CASE; Description: POST CONVICTION INITIAL FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketCode: DOOA; Description: DATE OF ORDER APPEALED

    Read MoreRead Less