This case was last updated from Oklahoma Supreme Court on 02/28/2022 at 18:27:35 (UTC).

Chardonnay Apartments, Plaintiff/Appellee, vs Cynthia Ortiz, Defendant/Appellant.

Case Summary

On 03/29/2021 Chardonnay Apartments, Plaintiff/Appellee filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against Cynthia Ortiz, Defendant/Appellant. This case was filed in Oklahoma Supreme Court, Oklahoma Supreme Court located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9439

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Statewide, Oklahoma

 

Party Details

Appellant

Ortiz, Cynthia

Appellee

Chardonnay Apartments

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

DECARLO, MICHAEL

5416 S Yale Ste 600

Tulsa, OK 74135

 

Court Documents

PAUPER AFFIDAVIT FOR ORTIZ, CYNTHIA

03/29/2021: PAUPER AFFIDAVIT FOR ORTIZ, CYNTHIA

PETITION IN ERROR FILED BY CYNTHIA ORTIZ-DEF/APLNT-PRO SE

03/29/2021: PETITION IN ERROR FILED BY CYNTHIA ORTIZ-DEF/APLNT-PRO SE

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE PRO SE BY CYNTHIA ORTIZ

03/29/2021: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE PRO SE BY CYNTHIA ORTIZ

JE: CT NOTE'S APLNT FILING OF A PET IN ERROR ATTACHING A COPY OF TRIAL CT'S ORDER W/NO TITLE ON INSTRUMENT. ETC. FOR TH/APPEAL TO PROCEED, APLNT MUST OBTAIN AN ORDER SIGNED BY TRIAL JUDGE, ETC. APLNT MUST TH/FILE CERT COPY OF SIGNED ORDER IN TH/CT NL

04/02/2021: JE: CT NOTE'S APLNT FILING OF A PET IN ERROR ATTACHING A COPY OF TRIAL CT'S ORDER W/NO TITLE ON INSTRUMENT. ETC. FOR TH/APPEAL TO PROCEED, APLNT MUST OBTAIN AN ORDER SIGNED BY TRIAL JUDGE, ETC. APLNT MUST TH/FILE CERT COPY OF SIGNED ORDER IN TH/CT NLT 4-16-21, OR TH/APPEAL MAY BE DSMD AS PREMATURE. OKLA SUP CT CLERK TO SEND COPY OF TH/ORDER TO TULSA CO DIST CT SPECIAL JUDGE LUDI LEITH. N/ATTYS DC JUDGE

JE: CT NOTES TH/APLNT H/NOT FILED A CERT COPY OF AN ORDER SIGNED BY TRIAL JUDGE ETC. UNLESS APLNT FILES AN AMENDED PET IN ERROR, NLT 5-12-21, ATTACHING A CERT COPY OF AN ORDER MEMORIALIZING TRIAL CT'S DECISION, TH/APPEAL W/BE SUBJECT TO DSML W/OUT FU

04/27/2021: JE: CT NOTES TH/APLNT H/NOT FILED A CERT COPY OF AN ORDER SIGNED BY TRIAL JUDGE ETC. UNLESS APLNT FILES AN AMENDED PET IN ERROR, NLT 5-12-21, ATTACHING A CERT COPY OF AN ORDER MEMORIALIZING TRIAL CT'S DECISION, TH/APPEAL W/BE SUBJECT TO DSML W/OUT FURTHER NOTICE. ETC. N/ATTYS

JE: APPEAL DSMD DUE TO APLNT'S FAILURE TO COMPLY W/CT'S ORDER ETC. C/ATTYS DC CLERK

06/07/2021: JE: APPEAL DSMD DUE TO APLNT'S FAILURE TO COMPLY W/CT'S ORDER ETC. C/ATTYS DC CLERK

MANDATE ISSUED

07/14/2021: MANDATE ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketCode: RCMD; Description: RECEIPT FOR MANDATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: MAND; Description: MANDATE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketCode: 5003; Description: DISMISSED (ORDER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: DISR; Description: JE: APPEAL DSMD DUE TO APLNT'S FAILURE TO COMPLY W/CT'S ORDER ETC. C/ATTYS DC CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JE: CT NOTES TH/APLNT H/NOT FILED A CERT COPY OF AN ORDER SIGNED BY TRIAL JUDGE ETC. UNLESS APLNT FILES AN AMENDED PET IN ERROR, NLT 5-12-21, ATTACHING A CERT COPY OF AN ORDER MEMORIALIZING TRIAL CT'S DECISION, TH/APPEAL W/BE SUBJECT TO DSML W/OUT FURTHER NOTICE. ETC. N/ATTYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JE: CT NOTE'S APLNT FILING OF A PET IN ERROR ATTACHING A COPY OF TRIAL CT'S ORDER W/NO TITLE ON INSTRUMENT. ETC. FOR TH/APPEAL TO PROCEED, APLNT MUST OBTAIN AN ORDER SIGNED BY TRIAL JUDGE, ETC. APLNT MUST TH/FILE CERT COPY OF SIGNED ORDER IN TH/CT NLT 4-16-21, OR TH/APPEAL MAY BE DSMD AS PREMATURE. OKLA SUP CT CLERK TO SEND COPY OF TH/ORDER TO TULSA CO DIST CT SPECIAL JUDGE LUDI LEITH. N/ATTYS DC JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE PRO SE BY CYNTHIA ORTIZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PETF; Description: PETITION IN ERROR FILED BY CYNTHIA ORTIZ-DEF/APLNT-PRO SE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketCode: PAY; Description: RECEIPT # 79994 ON 03/29/2021. PAYOR: CYNTHIA ORTIZ TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 0.00. LINE ITEMS: $0.00 ON DISTRICT COURT FINAL ORDER OR JUDGMENT INITIAL FILING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PAUP; Description: PAUPER AFFIDAVIT FOR ORTIZ, CYNTHIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketCode: CASE; Description: DISTRICT COURT FINAL ORDER OR JUDGMENT INITIAL FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCode: MAIL; Description: PETITION MAILED DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCode: DOOA; Description: DATE OF ORDER APPEALED

    Read MoreRead Less