This case was last updated from Oklahoma Court of Criminal Appeals on 02/28/2022 at 20:47:15 (UTC).

Carl D. Myers, Petitioner, v. STATE OF OKLAHOMA, Respondent,

Case Summary

On 04/21/2021 Carl D Myers, Petitioner filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against STATE OF OKLAHOMA, Respondent. This case was filed in Oklahoma Court of Criminal Appeals, Oklahoma Court of Criminal Appeals located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-346

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • County, State:

    Statewide, Oklahoma

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Myers, Carl D.

Lawton, OK 73501

Respondent

STATE OF OKLAHOMA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Myers, Carl D.

449379, 8607 Se Flower Mound Rd

Lawton, OK 73501

Respondent Attorney

Oklahoma County District Attorney

505 County Office Bldg., 320 Robert S. Kerr Ave.

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

 

Court Documents

PETITION FOR AN APPEAL OUT OF TIME

04/21/2021: PETITION FOR AN APPEAL OUT OF TIME

JE: ORDER KUEHN PJ, RWLAND VPJ, LUMPKIN J, LEWIS J, HUDSON J, COPIES TO ATTYS, DC CLERK, HON. SUSAN STALLINGS, ORDER GRANTING POST CONVICTION APPEAL OUT OF TIME

07/14/2021: JE: ORDER KUEHN PJ, RWLAND VPJ, LUMPKIN J, LEWIS J, HUDSON J, COPIES TO ATTYS, DC CLERK, HON. SUSAN STALLINGS, ORDER GRANTING POST CONVICTION APPEAL OUT OF TIME

MANDATE ISSUED

07/14/2021: MANDATE ISSUED

RETURN OF COURT CLERK

07/16/2021: RETURN OF COURT CLERK

RECEIPT FOR MANDATE

07/16/2021: RECEIPT FOR MANDATE

POST CONVICTION NOTICE OF COMPLETION OF RECORD ON APPEAL

04/26/2021: POST CONVICTION NOTICE OF COMPLETION OF RECORD ON APPEAL

RECORD ORDERED FROM DISTRICT COURT

04/26/2021: RECORD ORDERED FROM DISTRICT COURT

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketCode: RRCD; Description: RECORD RETURNED TO DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RCMD; Description: RECEIPT FOR MANDATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RTCC; Description: RETURN OF COURT CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: MAND; Description: MANDATE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketCode: 9003; Description: GRANTED (ORDER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: OPIN; Description: JE: ORDER KUEHN PJ, RWLAND VPJ, LUMPKIN J, LEWIS J, HUDSON J, COPIES TO ATTYS, DC CLERK, HON. SUSAN STALLINGS, ORDER GRANTING POST CONVICTION APPEAL OUT OF TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketCode: RCCT; Description: RECORD TO COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketCode: ORGR; Description: ORIGINAL RECORD - 24 PAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RODC; Description: RECORD ORDERED FROM DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NTCP; Description: POST CONVICTION NOTICE OF COMPLETION OF RECORD ON APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PETF; Description: PETITION FOR AN APPEAL OUT OF TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUED CERTIFICATE OF APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketCode: PAY; Description: RECEIPT # 80236 ON 04/21/2021. PAYOR: CARL D. MYERS TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 0.00. LINE ITEMS: $0.00 ON POST CONVICTION INITIAL FILING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketCode: PAUP; Description: PAUPER AFFIDAVIT FOR MYERS, CARL D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketCode: CASE; Description: POST CONVICTION INITIAL FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketCode: DOOA; Description: DATE OF ORDER APPEALED

    Read MoreRead Less