This case was last updated from Oklahoma Court of Criminal Appeals on 07/17/2022 at 20:43:23 (UTC).

BRANDON WADE NORDSTEDT, Petitioner, v. STATE OF OKLAHOMA, Respondent,

Case Summary

On 01/18/2022 BRANDON WADE NORDSTEDT, Petitioner filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against STATE OF OKLAHOMA, Respondent. This case was filed in Oklahoma Court of Criminal Appeals, Oklahoma Court of Criminal Appeals located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2-74

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • County, State:

    Statewide, Oklahoma

 

Party Details

Petitioner

NORDSTEDT, BRANDON WADE

Respondent

STATE OF OKLAHOMA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Hampton, Debra K

3126 S. Blvd #304

Edmond, OK 73013

Respondent Attorney

Tulsa County District Attorney

500 S Denver Ave W#900

Tulsa, OK 74103

 

Court Documents

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE DEBRA K. HAMPTON

01/18/2022: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE DEBRA K. HAMPTON

PETITION IN ERROR

01/18/2022: PETITION IN ERROR

PETITIONERS BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF POST CONVICRION RELIEF

01/18/2022: PETITIONERS BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF POST CONVICRION RELIEF

NOTICE OF COMPLETION OF RECORD OF APPEAL

01/24/2022: NOTICE OF COMPLETION OF RECORD OF APPEAL

RECORD ORDERED FROM DISTRICT COURT

01/24/2022: RECORD ORDERED FROM DISTRICT COURT

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketCode: RCCT; Description: RECORD TO COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketCode: ORGR; Description: 4 VOL. ORIGINAL RECORD - 835 PAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RODC; Description: RECORD ORDERED FROM DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NTCP; Description: NOTICE OF COMPLETION OF RECORD OF APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: BFSP; Description: PETITIONERS BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF POST CONVICTION RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PETF; Description: PETITION IN ERROR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE DEBRA K. HAMPTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUED CERTIFICATE OF APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: PAY; Description: RECEIPT # 82624 ON 01/18/2022. PAYOR: DEBRA K HAMPTON TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 50.00. LINE ITEMS: $50.00 ON POST CONVICTION INITIAL FILING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: CASE; Description: POST CONVICTION INITIAL FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketCode: DOOA; Description: DATE OF ORDER APPEALED

    Read MoreRead Less