This case was last updated from Oklahoma Court of Criminal Appeals on 05/16/2022 at 03:44:10 (UTC).

Banetana Moore, Petitioner, v. STATE OF OKLAHOMA, Respondent,

Case Summary

On 09/29/2021 Banetana Moore, Petitioner filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against STATE OF OKLAHOMA, Respondent. This case was filed in Oklahoma Court of Criminal Appeals, Oklahoma Court of Criminal Appeals located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1021

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • County, State:

    Statewide, Oklahoma

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Moore, Banetana

Holdenville, OK 74848

Respondent

STATE OF OKLAHOMA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Moore, Banetana

#833418, 6888 E. 133Rd Rd

Holdenville, OK 74848

Respondent Attorney

Pontotoc County District Attorney

P.O. Box 146

Ada, OK 74820

 

Court Documents

PETITION IN ERROR

09/29/2021: PETITION IN ERROR

BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PETITION IN ERROR

09/29/2021: BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PETITION IN ERROR

NOTICE OF COMPLETION OF RECORD ON APPEAL

10/01/2021: NOTICE OF COMPLETION OF RECORD ON APPEAL

RECORD ORDERED FROM DISTRICT COURT

10/01/2021: RECORD ORDERED FROM DISTRICT COURT

JE: ORDER ROALAND PJ, HUDSON VPJ, LUMPKIN J, LEWIS J, COPIES TO ATTYS, DC CLERK, HON. STEVEN KESSINGER, ORDER AFFIRMING DENIAL OF POST CONVICTION RELIEF. THE CONVICTION IN THIS MATTER WAS FINAL BEFORE 7-9-20 DECISION IN MCGIRT AND THE USSC HOLDING IN

11/10/2021: JE: ORDER ROALAND PJ, HUDSON VPJ, LUMPKIN J, LEWIS J, COPIES TO ATTYS, DC CLERK, HON. STEVEN KESSINGER, ORDER AFFIRMING DENIAL OF POST CONVICTION RELIEF. THE CONVICTION IN THIS MATTER WAS FINAL BEFORE 7-9-20 DECISION IN MCGIRT AND THE USSC HOLDING IN MCGIRT DOES NOT APPLY

MANDATE ISSUED

11/10/2021: MANDATE ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketCode: RRCD; Description: RECORD RETURNED TO DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: MAND; Description: MANDATE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketCode: 1003; Description: AFFIRMED (ORDER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: OPIN; Description: JE: ORDER ROALAND PJ, HUDSON VPJ, LUMPKIN J, LEWIS J, COPIES TO ATTYS, DC CLERK, HON. STEVEN KESSINGER, ORDER AFFIRMING DENIAL OF POST CONVICTION RELIEF. THE CONVICTION IN THIS MATTER WAS FINAL BEFORE 7-9-20 DECISION IN MCGIRT AND THE USSC HOLDING IN MCGIRT DOES NOT APPLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketCode: RCCT; Description: RECORD TO COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketCode: ORGR; Description: ORIGINAL RECORD - 18 PAGES (COPY TO AG)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RODC; Description: RECORD ORDERED FROM DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NTCP; Description: NOTICE OF COMPLETION OF RECORD ON APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: BFSP; Description: BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PETITION IN ERROR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PETF; Description: PETITION IN ERROR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUED CERTIFICFICATE OF APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketCode: PAY; Description: RECEIPT # 81574 ON 09/29/2021. PAYOR: BANETANA MOORE TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 0.00. LINE ITEMS: $0.00 ON POST CONVICTION INITIAL FILING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketCode: PAUP; Description: PAUPER AFFIDAVIT FOR MOORE, BANETANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketCode: CASE; Description: POST CONVICTION INITIAL FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketCode: DOOA; Description: DATE OF ORDER APPEALED

    Read MoreRead Less