This case was last updated from Putnam County New York Courts on 05/06/2023 at 01:52:28 (UTC).

U.S. BANK vs. WISSEL, PHILIP, ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/01/2010 U S BANK filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against WISSEL, PHILIP,. This case was filed in Putnam County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Columbia, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is FRANCIS A. NICOLAI. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2009

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Putnam, New York

Judge Details

Judge

FRANCIS A. NICOLAI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U.S. BANK

Defendants

WISSEL, PHILIP, ET AL

PHILIP & CHRISTINE WISSEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHAPIRO, DICARO & BARAK, LLC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

12/14/2010

DocketAppearance Information: Outcome Type: PD - SETTLED; Justice Part: FRANCIS A. NICOLAI FRANCIS A. NICOLAI

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/14/2010

DocketAppearance Information: Outcome Type: PD - FULLY SUBMITTED NO OPP; Justice Part: FRANCIS A. NICOLAI FRANCIS A. NICOLAI-MOTION PART; Motion Seq: 1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/16/2010

DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 1; Filed By: Plaintiff; Relief Sought: VACATE ORDER/JUDGMENT; Submit Date: 12/14/2010; Answer Demanded: No; Status: Decided: 12/14/2010 PD - MOTION GRANTED Before Justice: FRANCIS A. NICOLAI; Decision: Plaintiff Long Form Order; Order Signed Date: 12/14/2010

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/20/2010

DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Supreme Trial; Outcome Type: EX PARTE; Justice Part: FRANCIS A. NICOLAI CALENDAR CLERK DEPT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/19/2010

DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Supreme Initial (first time on); Outcome Type: FSC - NO APPEARANCE DEFENDANT; Justice Part: FRANCIS A. NICOLAI FC SETTLEMENT CONF; Remarks: 11:30 - CONF REFERENCE ORDER 4/19

[+] Read More [-] Read Less