This case was last updated from Putnam County New York Courts on 05/04/2023 at 17:16:29 (UTC).

FRIEDERICH, PATRICIA A vs. BONDI, ROBERT, ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/07/2009 FRIEDERICH, PATRICIA A filed a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit against BONDI, ROBERT,. This case was filed in Putnam County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Putnam, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is ANDREW P. O'ROURKE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2009

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Putnam, New York

Judge Details

Judge

ANDREW P. O'ROURKE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FRIEDERICH, PATRICIA A

Defendant

BONDI, ROBERT, ET AL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

09/28/2009

DocketAppearance Information: Outcome Type: PD - SETTLED; Justice Part: ANDREW P. O'ROURKE CALENDAR CLERK DEPT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/24/2009

DocketAppearance Information: Outcome Type: PD - FULLY SUBMITTED NO OPP; Justice Part: ANDREW P. O'ROURKE ANDREW P. O'ROURKE (MOTIONS); Motion Seq: 2

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2009

DocketAppearance Information: Outcome Type: PD - ADJOURNED; Justice Part: ANDREW P. O'ROURKE ANDREW P. O'ROURKE (MOTIONS); Motion Seq: 2

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/31/2009

DocketAppearance Information: Outcome Type: PD - ADJOURNED; Justice Part: ANDREW P. O'ROURKE ANDREW P. O'ROURKE (MOTIONS); Motion Seq: 2

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/2009

DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 2; Filed By: Defendant; Relief Sought: JUDGMENT; Submit Date: 09/24/2009; Answer Demanded: No; Status: Decided: 09/28/2009 PD - MOTION GRANTED Before Justice: ANDREW P. O'ROURKE; Decision: Short Form Order; Order Signed Date: 09/28/2009

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/15/2009

DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Supreme Trial; Outcome Type: OTHER FINAL DISP. PRE-NOTE; Justice Part: ANDREW P. O'ROURKE CALENDAR CLERK DEPT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/24/2009

DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: FULLY SUBMITTED; Justice Part: ANDREW P. O'ROURKE ANDREW P. O'ROURKE (MOTIONS); Motion Seq: 1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/24/2009

DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Supreme Initial (first time on); Outcome Type: REMAND; Justice Part: ANDREW P. O'ROURKE ANDREW P. O'ROURKE; Remarks: CONTROL 4/13

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/13/2009

DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 1; Filed By: Plaintiff; Relief Sought: MISC. SPECIAL PROCEEDINGS; Submit Date: 04/24/2009; Answer Demanded: No; Status: Decided: 05/15/2009 MOTION DENIED Before Justice: ANDREW P. O'ROURKE; Decision: Short Form Order; Order Signed Date: 05/15/2009

[+] Read More [-] Read Less