This case was last updated from Putnam County New York Courts on 05/04/2023 at 13:12:16 (UTC).

AURORA LOAN SERVICES vs. LEUTHNER, JOHN

Case Summary

On 04/21/2009 AURORA LOAN SERVICES filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against LEUTHNER, JOHN. This case was filed in Putnam County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Columbia, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is PAUL I. MARX. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2009

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Putnam, New York

Judge Details

Judge

PAUL I. MARX

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AURORA LOAN SERVICES

Defendant

LEUTHNER, JOHN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STEVEN J. BAUM, P.C.

STEIN, WIENER & ROTH, L.L.P.

Defendant Attorney

HAROLD TEVELOWITZ, ESQ.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

01/05/2016

DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Supreme Trial; Outcome Type: OTHER FINAL DISP. PRE-NOTE; Justice Part: PAUL I. MARX PAUL I. MARX

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/05/2016

DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: MOTION DECIDED-OPEN APPEARANCE; Justice Part: PAUL I. MARX HON. VICTOR G. GROSSMAN; Remarks: DISCONTINUANCE NO APPEARANCES; Motion Seq: 3

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/02/2015

DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 3; Filed By: Plaintiff; Relief Sought: MISC. SPECIAL PROCEEDINGS; Answer Demanded: No; Status: Decided: 01/05/2016 MOTION GRANTED Before Justice: PAUL I. MARX; Decision: Plaintiff Long Form Order; Order Signed Date: 01/05/2016

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/07/2015

DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Supreme Trial; Outcome Type: REMOVE STAY; Justice Part: FRANCIS A. NICOLAI VICTOR G. GROSSMAN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/19/2010

DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Supreme Trial; Outcome Type: FSC - STAYED; Justice Part: FRANCIS A. NICOLAI FC SETTLEMENT CONF; Remarks: 2PM CONF JGT MOTION WITHDRAWN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/19/2010

DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: FULLY SUBMITTED - NO OPP; Justice Part: FRANCIS A. NICOLAI FRANCIS A. NICOLAI-MOTION PART; Motion Seq: 2

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/01/2010

DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 2; Filed By: Plaintiff; Relief Sought: JUDGMENT; Submit Date: 03/19/2010; Answer Demanded: No; Status: Decided: 03/19/2010 MOTION WITHDRAWN Before Justice: FRANCIS A. NICOLAI; Decision: Oral

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2009

DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Supreme Trial; Outcome Type: EX PARTE; Justice Part: ANDREW P. O'ROURKE ANDREW P. O'ROURKE; Remarks: SUB-PRIME CONF MOTION & ORDER 8/4

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2009

DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: FULLY SUBMITTED - NO OPP; Justice Part: ANDREW P. O'ROURKE ANDREW P. O'ROURKE (MOTIONS); Motion Seq: 1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2009

DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 1; Filed By: Plaintiff; Relief Sought: SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Submit Date: 08/04/2009; Answer Demanded: No; Status: Decided: 08/04/2009 MOTION GRANTED Before Justice: ANDREW P. O'ROURKE; Decision: Plaintiff Long Form Order; Order Signed Date: 08/04/2009

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/08/2009

DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Supreme Initial (first time on); Outcome Type: FORECLOSURE STLMNT CONF HELD; Justice Part: ANDREW P. O'ROURKE ANDREW P. O'ROURKE; Remarks: SUB-PRIME CONF REFERENCE ORDER 6/8

[+] Read More [-] Read Less