This case was last updated from Putnam County New York Courts on 05/04/2023 at 22:30:07 (UTC).

GARDNER, JEFFREY A, ANO vs. SOUTHEAST MGT GROUP, ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/29/2009 GARDNER, JEFFREY A, ANO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SOUTHEAST MGT GROUP,. This case was filed in Putnam County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Putnam, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is LAWRENCE H. ECKER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2009

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Putnam, New York

Judge Details

Judge

LAWRENCE H. ECKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GARDNER, JEFFREY A, ANO

Defendant

SOUTHEAST MGT GROUP, ET AL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHAUB, AHMUTY, CITRIN & SPRATT

Defendant Attorneys

LORI D. FISHMAN, ESQ.

WHITE, FLEISCHNER & FINO, LLP

KAUFMAN, BORGEEST & RYAN, LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

12/20/2010

DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Supreme Trial; Outcome Type: OTHER FINAL DISP. PRE-NOTE; Justice Part: LAWRENCE H. ECKER LAWRENCE H. ECKER; Remarks: CNF 9:30AM CR401 FILG STIP DISCON

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2010

DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Supreme Trial; Outcome Type: ADJOURNED; Justice Part: LAWRENCE H. ECKER LAWRENCE H. ECKER; Remarks: MOT 10/26 STATUS CR401 9:30AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2010

DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: FULLY SUBMITTED; Justice Part: FRANCIS A. NICOLAI LAWRENCE H. ECKER (MOTION); Remarks: ADJ FR 9/7 CNSNT; Motion Seq: 2

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2010

DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: FULLY SUBMITTED - NO OPP; Justice Part: LAWRENCE H. ECKER LAWRENCE H. ECKER (MOTION); Remarks: ADJ 9/7 ON CNSNT; Motion Seq: 3

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2010

DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Supreme Trial; Outcome Type: ADJOURNED; Justice Part: LAWRENCE H. ECKER LAWRENCE H. ECKER; Remarks: MOT 9/15 MOT/STATUS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2010

DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: ADJOURNED; Justice Part: FRANCIS A. NICOLAI LAWRENCE H. ECKER (MOTION); Remarks: ADJ FR 9/7 CNSNT; Motion Seq: 2

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2010

DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: ADJOURNED; Justice Part: LAWRENCE H. ECKER LAWRENCE H. ECKER (MOTION); Remarks: ADJ 9/7 ON CNSNT; Motion Seq: 3

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/03/2010

DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: FULLY SUBMITTED - NO OPP; Justice Part: FRANCIS A. NICOLAI LAWRENCE H. ECKER (MOTION); Motion Seq: 1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/16/2010

DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 3; Filed By: Defendant; Relief Sought: CROSS MOTION; Submit Date: 10/26/2010; Answer Demanded: No; Status: Decided: 12/17/2010 MOTION WITHDRAWN Before Justice: LAWRENCE H. ECKER; Decision: Oral

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2010

DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: ADJOURNED; Justice Part: FRANCIS A. NICOLAI FRANCIS A. NICOLAI-MOTION PART; Motion Seq: 2

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2010

DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: ADJOURNED; Justice Part: FRANCIS A. NICOLAI FRANCIS A. NICOLAI-MOTION PART; Motion Seq: 2

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/17/2010

DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Supreme Trial; Outcome Type: ADJOURNED; Justice Part: FRANCIS A. NICOLAI FRANCIS A. NICOLAI; Remarks: STATUS MOTIONS 6/17 & 7/7

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/17/2010

DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: ADJOURNED; Justice Part: FRANCIS A. NICOLAI FRANCIS A. NICOLAI-MOTION PART; Motion Seq: 1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2010

DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 2; Filed By: Defendant; Relief Sought: AMEND PLEADINGS; Submit Date: 10/26/2010; Answer Demanded: No; Status: Decided: 12/17/2010 MOTION WITHDRAWN Before Justice: LAWRENCE H. ECKER; Decision: Oral

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2010

DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 1; Filed By: Plaintiff; Relief Sought: DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Submit Date: 09/03/2010; Answer Demanded: No; Status: Decided: 09/03/2010 MOTION DENIED Before Justice: FRANCIS A. NICOLAI; Decision: Memo; Order Signed Date: 09/03/2010

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/20/2010

DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Supreme Trial; Outcome Type: STATUS CONFERENCE HELD; Justice Part: FRANCIS A. NICOLAI FRANCIS A. NICOLAI; Remarks: CONTROL 1/19

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/19/2010

DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Supreme Trial; Outcome Type: PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE HELD; Justice Part: FRANCIS A. NICOLAI FRANCIS A. NICOLAI; Remarks: PLC 11/9

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/09/2009

DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Supreme Initial (first time on); Outcome Type: ADJOURNED; Justice Part: ANDREW P. O'ROURKE ANDREW P. O'ROURKE; Remarks: PLC LETTER 9/29

[+] Read More [-] Read Less