This case was last updated from Putnam County New York Courts on 05/04/2023 at 11:34:19 (UTC).

ROSENGARTEN, LILLIAN vs. FISHKILL ALLSPORT, ANO

Case Summary

On 05/05/2008 ROSENGARTEN, LILLIAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against FISHKILL ALLSPORT, ANO. This case was filed in Putnam County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Putnam, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is ANDREW P. O'ROURKE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2008

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Putnam, New York

Judge Details

Judge

ANDREW P. O'ROURKE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROSENGARTEN, LILLIAN

Defendant

FISHKILL ALLSPORT, ANO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALAN A TARZY

Defendant Attorney

GOERGEN, MANSON & MCCARTHY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

10/13/2009

DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Supreme Trial; Outcome Type: SETTLED BEFORE TRIAL; Justice Part: ANDREW P. O'ROURKE ANDREW P. O'ROURKE; Remarks: SELECT 8/5

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/05/2009

DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Supreme Trial; Outcome Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HELD; Justice Part: ANDREW P. O'ROURKE ANDREW P. O'ROURKE; Remarks: PTC (J) SELECT 10/13/09

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/11/2009

DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Supreme Trial; Outcome Type: COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE HELD; Justice Part: ANDREW P. O'ROURKE ANDREW P. O'ROURKE; Remarks: TRIAL READINESS 2/17

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/19/2009

DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Supreme Trial; Outcome Type: ADJOURNED; Justice Part: ANDREW P. O'ROURKE ANDREW P. O'ROURKE; Remarks: TRIAL READINESS 1/21

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/21/2009

DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Supreme Trial; Outcome Type: STATUS CONFERENCE HELD; Justice Part: ANDREW P. O'ROURKE ANDREW P. O'ROURKE; Remarks: TRIAL READINESS 10/28

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/28/2008

DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Supreme Trial; Outcome Type: STATUS CONFERENCE HELD; Justice Part: ANDREW P. O'ROURKE ANDREW P. O'ROURKE; Remarks: TRIAL READINESS 6/10

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/10/2008

DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Supreme Initial (first time on); Outcome Type: PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE HELD; Justice Part: ANDREW P. O'ROURKE ANDREW P. O'ROURKE; Remarks: PLC CONSENT 5/15

[+] Read More [-] Read Less