This case was last updated from Putnam County New York Courts on 05/04/2023 at 22:04:53 (UTC).

STATE FARM & CASUALTY CO vs. COGNETTA, ALLYSON, ETAL

Case Summary

On 07/30/2008 STATE FARM CASUALTY CO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against COGNETTA, ALLYSON, ETAL. This case was filed in Putnam County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Putnam, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is ANDREW P. O'ROURKE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2008

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Putnam, New York

Judge Details

Judge

ANDREW P. O'ROURKE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM & CASUALTY CO

Defendant

COGNETTA, ALLYSON, ETAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CHRISTOPHER KONZELMAN, ESQ.

JOSEPH C BEVIS

Defendant Attorney

THOMAS J. JOHNSON, ESQ.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

04/20/2010

DocketAppearance Information: Outcome Type: PD - FULLY SUBMITTED NO OPP; Justice Part: FRANCIS A. NICOLAI FRANCIS A. NICOLAI-MOTION PART; Motion Seq: 6

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/29/2010

DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 6; Filed By: Plaintiff; Relief Sought: REARGUE/RENEW/RESETTLE/RECONSI; Submit Date: 04/20/2010; Answer Demanded: No; Status: Decided: 04/22/2010 PD - MOTION DENIED Before Justice: FRANCIS A. NICOLAI; Decision: Short Form Order; Order Signed Date: 04/22/2010

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/17/2010

DocketAppearance Information: Outcome Type: PD - SETTLED; Justice Part: FRANCIS A. NICOLAI CALENDAR CLERK DEPT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/01/2010

DocketAppearance Information: Outcome Type: PD - FULLY SUBMITTED; Justice Part: FRANCIS A. NICOLAI ANDREW P. O'ROURKE (MOTIONS); Motion Seq: 5

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/01/2010

DocketAppearance Information: Outcome Type: PD - FULLY SUBMITTED; Justice Part: FRANCIS A. NICOLAI FRANCIS A. NICOLAI-MOTION PART; Motion Seq: 4

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/15/2010

DocketAppearance Information: Outcome Type: PD - ADJOURNED; Justice Part: FRANCIS A. NICOLAI FRANCIS A. NICOLAI-MOTION PART; Motion Seq: 5

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/15/2010

DocketAppearance Information: Outcome Type: PD - ADJOURNED; Justice Part: FRANCIS A. NICOLAI FRANCIS A. NICOLAI-MOTION PART; Motion Seq: 4

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/14/2010

DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 5; Filed By: Plaintiff; Relief Sought: CROSS MOTION; Submit Date: 02/01/2010; Answer Demanded: No; Status: Decided: 02/17/2010 PD - MOTION DENIED Before Justice: FRANCIS A. NICOLAI; Decision: Short Form Order; Order Signed Date: 02/17/2010

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/18/2009

DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 4; Filed By: Defendant; Relief Sought: MISC. SPECIAL PROCEEDINGS; Submit Date: 02/01/2010; Answer Demanded: No; Status: Decided: 02/17/2010 PD - MOTION GRANTED Before Justice: FRANCIS A. NICOLAI; Decision: Short Form Order; Order Signed Date: 02/17/2010

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/19/2009

DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Supreme Initial (first time on); Outcome Type: EX PARTE; Justice Part: ANDREW P. O'ROURKE ANDREW P. O'ROURKE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/19/2009

DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: FULLY SUBMITTED - NO OPP; Justice Part: ANDREW P. O'ROURKE ANDREW P. O'ROURKE (MOTIONS); Motion Seq: 3

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/19/2009

DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: FULLY SUBMITTED; Justice Part: ANDREW P. O'ROURKE ANDREW P. O'ROURKE (MOTIONS); Motion Seq: 2

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2009

DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 2; Filed By: Plaintiff; Relief Sought: PRECLUDE; Submit Date: 06/19/2009; Answer Demanded: No; Status: Decided: 06/19/2009 MOTION DENIED Before Justice: ANDREW P. O'ROURKE; Decision: Short Form Order; Order Signed Date: 06/19/2009

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2009

DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 3; Filed By: Plaintiff; Relief Sought: DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Submit Date: 06/19/2009; Answer Demanded: No; Status: Decided: 06/19/2009 MOTION GRANTED Before Justice: ANDREW P. O'ROURKE; Decision: Plaintiff Long Form Order; Order Signed Date: 06/19/2009

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2008

DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: FULLY SUBMITTED - NO OPP; Justice Part: ANDREW P. O'ROURKE ANDREW P. O'ROURKE (MOTIONS); Remarks: PRO HAC VICE; Motion Seq: 1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/30/2008

DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 1; Filed By: Plaintiff; Relief Sought: MISC. SPECIAL PROCEEDINGS; Submit Date: 08/08/2008; Answer Demanded: No; Status: Decided: 08/11/2008 MOTION GRANTED Before Justice: ANDREW P. O'ROURKE; Decision: Short Form Order; Order Signed Date: 08/11/2008

[+] Read More [-] Read Less