This case was last updated from Richmond County New York Courts on 11/19/2021 at 05:35:38 (UTC).

WEISER, DEBBIE vs. CITY OF NEW YORK

Case Summary

On 12/07/2015 WEISER, DEBBIE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF NEW YORK. This case was filed in Richmond County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Orange, New York. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2015

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Richmond, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WEISER, DEBBIE

Defendants

CITY OF NEW YORK

Mathew, Asha Joy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Richmond County - District Attorney

Attorney at Richmond County - District Attorney

130 Stuyvesant Pl

Staten Island, NY 10301-1968

DEVITT SPELLMAN BARRETT, LLP

Attorney at DEVITT SPELLMAN BARRETT, LLP

50 Route 111 Ste 314

Smithtown, NY 11787-3700

ORIN J COHEN ESQ

Attorney at ORIN J COHEN ESQ

1162 Victory Blvd

Staten Island, NY 10301-3623

 

Court Documents

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY

--none--

STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI)

STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI); Filed By: Cohen, O.; Filed: 06/13/2019; Received: 06/13/2019

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #004)

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #004); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/06/2019; Received: 02/06/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #004) Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #004) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Cohen, O.; Filed: 02/05/2019; Received: 02/05/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #004) Transcript of Def Tehillah Levy

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #004) Transcript of Def Tehillah Levy; Filed By: Cohen, O.; Filed: 02/05/2019; Received: 02/05/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #004) Transcript of Def Shlomo Landesman

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #004) Transcript of Def Shlomo Landesman; Filed By: Cohen, O.; Filed: 02/05/2019; Received: 02/05/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #004) Motion for Summary Judgment Def Levy and Landesman

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #004) Motion for Summary Judgment Def Levy and Landesman; Filed By: Cohen, O.; Filed: 02/05/2019; Received: 02/05/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #004) Motion for Summary Judgment Def City

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #004) Motion for Summary Judgment Def City; Filed By: Cohen, O.; Filed: 02/05/2019; Received: 02/05/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #004) Order for SJ Motion

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #004) Order for SJ Motion; Filed By: Cohen, O.; Filed: 02/05/2019; Received: 02/05/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #004) Order for SJ Motion

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #004) Order for SJ Motion; Filed By: Cohen, O.; Filed: 02/05/2019; Received: 02/05/2019

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #004) Affidavit of Defendants Joy E. Matthew and Asha Joy Matthew

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #004) Affidavit of Defendants Joy E. Matthew and Asha Joy Matthew; Filed By: Cohen, O.; Filed: 02/05/2019; Received: 02/05/2019

AFFIRMATION (Motion #004)

AFFIRMATION (Motion #004); Filed By: Cohen, O.; Filed: 02/05/2019; Received: 02/05/2019

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - CONFORMED COPY (Motion #004)

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - CONFORMED COPY (Motion #004); Filed By: Cohen, O.; Filed: 02/05/2019; Received: 02/05/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #004) Deposition transcript of Deft. Tehillah Levy

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #004) Deposition transcript of Deft. Tehillah Levy; Filed By: Cohen, O.; Filed: 01/31/2019; Received: 01/31/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #004) Deposition Transcript of Deft Landesman

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #004) Deposition Transcript of Deft Landesman; Filed By: Cohen, O.; Filed: 01/31/2019; Received: 01/31/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #004) Defendants Homeowner's Motion for SJ

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #004) Defendants Homeowner's Motion for SJ; Filed By: Cohen, O.; Filed: 01/31/2019; Received: 01/31/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #004) Deft City's Motion for Summary Judgment

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #004) Deft City's Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed By: Cohen, O.; Filed: 01/31/2019; Received: 01/31/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #004) Decision of Summary Judgment

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #004) Decision of Summary Judgment; Filed By: Cohen, O.; Filed: 01/31/2019; Received: 01/31/2019

75 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Settled; Justice Part: City Trial Readiness Part,City Part 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Motion-Other; Outcome Type: Withdrawn; Justice Part: City Trial Readiness Part,City Part 2M; Motion Seq: 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Motion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: City Trial Readiness Part,City Part 2M; Motion Seq: 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 4; Relief Sought: Vacate - Decision/Order/Judgment/Award; Submit Date: 03/06/2019; Answer Demanded: No; Status: Decided: 03/06/2019 Withdrawn Before Justice: City Trial Readiness Part,; Decision: Oral; Order Signed Date: 03/06/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: Soos, Robert S9 Trial; Remarks: 10AM, INQUEST (Conversion)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:15 PM; Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Soos, Robert S9 Trial; Remarks: 2:15PM (Conversion)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Soos, Robert S9 Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Reassignment; Justice Part: City Trial Readiness Part,City Part 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: City Trial Readiness Part,City Part 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Motion-Other; Outcome Type: Signed; Justice Part: City Trial Readiness Part,City Part 2M; Motion Seq: 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 06/13/2017
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: City Trial Readiness Part,City Part 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: City Trial Readiness Part,City Part 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: City Trial Readiness Part,City Part 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: City Trial Readiness Part,City Part 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: City Trial Readiness Part,City Part 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: City Trial Readiness Part,City Part 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: City Trial Readiness Part,City Part 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: City Trial Readiness Part,City Part 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Motion-Other; Outcome Type: Decided; Justice Part: City Trial Readiness Part,City Part 2M; Motion Seq: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 1; Relief Sought: Judgment - Default; Submit Date: 01/13/2016; Answer Demanded: No; Status: Decided: 01/13/2016 Decided Before Justice: City Trial Readiness Part,; Decision: Oral; Order Signed Date: 04/18/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less